FAILLA v. GEORGE'S FOODS, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JOSEPH FAILLA
Defendant: GEORGE'S FAMILY FARMS, LLC, TRACY L. BROWN and GEORGE'S FOODS, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv07109
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEORGE'S FAMILY FARMS, LLC, GEORGE'S FOODS, LLC identifying George's Foods, LLC and George's Family Farms LLC as Corporate Parent.. (DALY, PAUL)
July 23, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #7 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan submitted by Paul Daly, Esq. on 7/23/2020 must be executed by a Judicial Officer before filing. Please forward to the appropriate Judicial Officer in accordance with the instructions outlined in the #5 Order Scheduling Conference. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jem)
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 Joint Discovery Plan by All Defendants.(DALY, PAUL)
July 15, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jem)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (DALY, PAUL)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/14/2020. (jem)
July 14, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #4 Answer to Complaint submitted by Paul Daly on 7/14/2020 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Paul Daly). This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jem)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by All Defendants.(DALY, PAUL)
July 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JOSEPH FAILLA. TRACY L. BROWN served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; GEORGE'S FAMILY FARMS, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020; GEORGE'S FOODS, LLC served on 6/18/2020, answer due 7/9/2020. (SIROTKIN, DAVID)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to TRACY L. BROWN, GEORGE'S FAMILY FARMS, LLC, GEORGE'S FOODS, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
June 11, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (abr )
June 11, 2020 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TRACY L. BROWN, GEORGE'S FAMILY FARMS, LLC, GEORGE'S FOODS, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10928846) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JOSEPH FAILLA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SIROTKIN, DAVID)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAILLA v. GEORGE'S FOODS, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE'S FAMILY FARMS, LLC
Represented By: PAUL DALY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACY L. BROWN
Represented By: PAUL DALY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE'S FOODS, LLC
Represented By: PAUL DALY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH FAILLA
Represented By: DAVID T. SIROTKIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?