BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY v. LUPIN INC. et al
Plaintiff: BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Defendant: LUPIN INC., LUPIN LIMITED and LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv07810
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ASHLEY ROSS, JEANNA M. WACKER and LEORA BEN-AMI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mg)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, Scheduling Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 3:30 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/19/2020. (abr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 28 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ashley Ross to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11231597.) (WALSH, LIZA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 27 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeanna M. Wacker to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11231588.) (WALSH, LIZA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Leora Ben-Ami to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11231575.) (WALSH, LIZA)
August 19, 2020 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY by LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., LUPIN INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, JEFFREY)
August 19, 2020 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LUPIN INC., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (COHEN, JEFFREY)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Leora Ben-Ami, Jeanna M. Wacker, and Ashley Ross. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/17/2020. (mg)
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 Letter from Liza M. Walsh to the Hon. Tonianne J. Bongiovanni, U.S.M.J. re: Pro Hac Vice Application on Consent. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Leora BenAmi, #2 Certification of Jeanna M. Wacker, #3 Certification of Ashley Ross, #4 Supporting Certification of Liza M. Walsh, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(WALSH, LIZA)
July 31, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - #20 Initial Scheduling Conference filed by the Clerk's office on 7/31/2020 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (abr)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing Lupin Limited without prejudice and amending caption to reflect same. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/30/2020. (abr )
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 9/22/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to initiate the calls. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/30/2020. (abr)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and Order Dismissing Lupin Limited Without Prejudice and Amending Caption to Reflect Same by LUPIN INC., LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (COHEN, JEFFREY)
July 27, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, REW E. MORRELL, JEREMIAH HELM, WILLIAM R. ZIMMERMAN and CAROL PITZEL CRUZ, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (abr)
July 24, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrew E. Morrell to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11118529.) (COHEN, JEFFREY)
July 24, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeremiah Helm to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11118515.) (COHEN, JEFFREY)
July 24, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice William R. Zimmerman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11118499.) (COHEN, JEFFREY)
July 24, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Carol Pitzel Cruz to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11118488.) (COHEN, JEFFREY)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting pro hac vice admission of William R. Zimmerman, Carol Pitzel Cruz, Jeremiah Helm and Andrew Morrell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/24/2020. (abr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW LEMBO on behalf of BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (LEMBO, MATTHEW)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER TURCHIK JAGOE on behalf of BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (JAGOE, CHRISTOPHER)
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY A. COHEN on behalf of LUPIN INC., LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, JEFFREY)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY. LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. waiver sent on 7/1/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (WALSH, LIZA)
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY. LUPIN LIMITED waiver sent on 7/1/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (WALSH, LIZA)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY. LUPIN INC. waiver sent on 7/1/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. (WALSH, LIZA)
July 2, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Text Minute Entry of 7/2/2020 was docketed in error as this case is related to Civil Action No. 19-18686 (MAS). Please disregard. (gxh)
July 2, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Pursuant to Local Patent Rule 1.5 Patent Pilot Project, case shall be reassigned to a designated patent judge. (gxh)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, (Exhibit 1) by BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(WALSH, LIZA)
June 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR on behalf of BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (WALSH, WILLIAM)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON on behalf of BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (GANNON, CHRISTINE)
June 29, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to LUPIN INC., LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 AO120 Patent Form filed. (mg)
June 25, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY identifying Bristol-Myers Squibb Company as Corporate Parent.. (WALSH, LIZA)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LUPIN INC., LUPIN LIMITED, LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10993416), filed by BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit AO120 Form)(WALSH, LIZA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY v. LUPIN INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY A. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN LIMITED
Represented By: JEFFREY A. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY A. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER TURCHIK JAGOE
Represented By: CHRISTINE INTROMASSO GANNON
Represented By: WILLIAM T. WALSH, JR
Represented By: MATTHEW LEMBO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?