CONFORTI v. HANLON et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE CONFORTI, ARATI KREIBICH, KEVIN MCMILLAN, ZINOVIA SPEZAKIS, MICO LUCIDE, JOSEPH MARCHICA and NEW JERSEY WORKING FAMILIES ALLIANCE, INC.
Defendant: SCOTT M. COLABELLA, CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON, PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO, JOHN S HOGAN, EDWARD P MCGETTIGAN, E. JUNIOR MALDONADO and Office of the Burlington County Clerk
Amicus Curiae: LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY and Salvation and Social Justice
Intervenor: OFFICE OF THE BERGEN COUTY CLERK, GURBIR S GREWAL, HONORABLE JAMES HOGAN, Camden County Democrat Committee, Regular Democratic Organization of Union County, Inc., MORRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN COMMITTEE, WARREN COUNTY REGULAR REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATION, INC., REPUBLICAN COMMITTEE OF UNION COUNTY and CUMBERLAND REGULAR REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATION, INC.
Intervenor Defendant: Middlesex County Democratic Organization
Case Number: 3:2020cv08267
Filed: July 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Trenton Office
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
2 Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 NOTICE of Appearance by ALYSSA LOTT on behalf of Camden County Democrat Committee (LOTT, ALYSSA)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CUMBERLAND REGULAR REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATION, INC., MORRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN COMMITTEE OF UNION COUNTY, WARREN COUNTY REGULAR REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATION, INC. re #151 MOTION to Intervene , #150 MOTION to Intervene , #152 MOTION to Intervene , #153 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PALATUCCI, WILLIAM)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #151 MOTION to Intervene , #150 MOTION to Intervene , #152 MOTION to Intervene , #153 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PUGACH, BRETT)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Letter from Edward J. Florio, Esq. regarding pending Motions to Intervene re #151 MOTION to Intervene , #140 First MOTION to Intervene , #150 MOTION to Intervene , #152 MOTION to Intervene , #138 MOTION to Intervene , #153 MOTION to Intervene . (FLORIO, EDWARD)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 NOTICE of Appearance by CYNTHIA MCNUTT on behalf of PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO (MCNUTT, CYNTHIA)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK M. MAKHAIL on behalf of CUMBERLAND REGULAR REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATION, INC. (MAKHAIL, MARK)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK M. MAKHAIL on behalf of REPUBLICAN COMMITTEE OF UNION COUNTY (MAKHAIL, MARK)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK M. MAKHAIL on behalf of WARREN COUNTY REGULAR REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATION, INC. (MAKHAIL, MARK)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance by MARK M. MAKHAIL on behalf of MORRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN COMMITTEE (MAKHAIL, MARK)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #150 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 10/3/2022 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #151 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 10/3/2022 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #152 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 10/3/2022 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #153 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 10/3/2022 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION to Intervene by CUMBERLAND REGULAR REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of William J. Palatucci in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PALATUCCI, WILLIAM)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION to Intervene by REPUBLICAN COMMITTEE OF UNION COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of William J. Palatucci in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PALATUCCI, WILLIAM)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MOTION to Intervene by WARREN COUNTY REGULAR REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of William J. Palatucci in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PALATUCCI, WILLIAM)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MOTION to Intervene by MORRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of William J. Palatucci in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PALATUCCI, WILLIAM)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by Middlesex County Democratic Organization re #138 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: #1 Certification of William W. Northgrave, #2 Exhibit A to Northgrave Certification, #3 Exhibit B to Northgrave Certification)(MCGUIRE, GRANT)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by Office of the Burlington County Clerk re #140 First MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(NATALE, MARK)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 Letter from Angelo J. Genova, Esq. on behalf of defendant Hon. Paula Sollami Covello, in her capacity as Mercer County Clerk regarding pending Motions to Intervene filed by the Camden County Democrat Committee. (GENOVA, ANGELO)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Camden County Democrat Committee re #126 MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.24 (TAMBUSSI, WILLIAM)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 BRIEF in Support filed by Regular Democratic Organization of Union County, Inc. re #128 First MOTION to Intervene Robert F. Renaud (Attachments: #1 Certification of Robert F. Renaud)(RENAUD, ROBERT)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 TEXT ORDER that, upon review of the docket for this matter, the Court finds that the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings #56 filed by Defendant Edward P. McGettigan is moot in light of the Court's Order #112 denying his Motion to Dismiss #63 . So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 08/25/2022. (Gonzalez, P)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting withdrawal of pro hac vice counsel Andrea McChristian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/25/2022. (jal, )
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, Salvation and Social Justice Withdrawal of Counsel and Notices of Electronic Filing for McChristian, Andrea (PATEL, HENAL)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #128 First MOTION to Intervene Robert F. Renaud, #140 First MOTION to Intervene , #126 MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.24, #138 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert of Service of Opposition to Motions for Intervention)(PUGACH, BRETT)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #140 First MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 9/6/2022 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
August 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 First MOTION to Intervene by Office of the Burlington County Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Certification Certification of Burlington County Clerk, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(NATALE, MARK)
August 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by KEITH MICHAEL MENSCHER on behalf of Middlesex County Democratic Organization (MENSCHER, KEITH)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #138 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 9/6/2022 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MOTION to Intervene by Middlesex County Democratic Organization. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(NORTHGRAVE, WILLIAM)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #126 MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.24. Motion set for 9/6/2022 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 CONSENT ORDER granting Plaintiff's request to adjourn the CCDC's #126 Motion to Intervene one motion cycle to 9/6/2022; Plaintiff's Omnibus Opposition Brief shall be filed by 8/23/2022, Reply Briefs, if any, shall be filed by 8/30/2022; Granting Plaintiffs' request to submit an omnibus response to both the CCDC and RDOUC's Motions to Intervene in a single opposition brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 8/1/2022. (jal, ) Modified on 8/2/2022 (jmh).
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Proposed Order re Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Intervene by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order re Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Intervene)(PUGACH, BRETT)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON.(ANDERSON, ERIK)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by E. JUNIOR MALDONADO.(FLORIO, EDWARD)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by SCOTT M. COLABELLA. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(THOMPSON, MATHEW)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by JOHN S HOGAN.(PLACEK, JAIME)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO.(BOREK, JENNIFER)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ANSWER to Complaint by GURBIR S GREWAL. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, GEORGE)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by EDWARD P MCGETTIGAN.(COHEN, ALAN)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #128 First MOTION to Intervene Robert F. Renaud. Motion set for 9/6/2022 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 First MOTION to Intervene Robert F. Renaud by Regular Democratic Organization of Union County, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(RENAUD, ROBERT)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT F. RENAUD on behalf of Regular Democratic Organization of Union County, Inc. (RENAUD, ROBERT)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #126 MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.24. Motion set for 8/15/2022 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MOTION to Intervene Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.24 by Camden County Democrat Committee. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief on behalf of Intervenor, #2 Certificate of Service Certification of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(TAMBUSSI, WILLIAM)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 CONSENT ORDER granting #123 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer By July 28, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/29/2022. (jal, ) Modified on 7/8/2022 (jal, ).
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 LETTER ORDER granting request for a 30 day extension of time to answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/29/2022. (jal, )
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #123 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer By July 28, 2022. Motion set for 8/1/2022 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer By July 28, 2022 by GURBIR S GREWAL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Statement, #4 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, GEORGE)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #121 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by JOHN S HOGAN has been DENIED. (jal, )
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney MICHAEL L. DERMODY terminated. Attorney EDWARD J. FLORIO for E. JUNIOR MALDONADO added.. (DE PIERRO, ALBERICO)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant John S. Hogan, in his Official Capacity as Bergen County Clerk.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Clerk Extension Application)(PLACEK, JAIME)
June 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #120 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/28/2022. (jal, )
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Christine Hanlon.. (ANDERSON, ERIK)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #115 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/28/2022. (abr, )
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #117 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by SCOTT M. COLABELLA has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/28/2022. (abr, )
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #116 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer filed by Erik Anderson on 6/13/2022 was submitted incorrectly as a Proposed Order. PLEASE RESUBMIT USING Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/ Proposed Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (abr, )
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #114 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by Matthew J. Platkin, Acting Attorney General of New Jersey has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/28/2022. (abr, )
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #119 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by EDWARD P MCGETTIGAN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/28/2022. (abr, )
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to extension of time to answer first amended Complaint. Attorney ALAN J. COHEN for EDWARD P MCGETTIGAN added. (COHEN, ALAN)
June 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JAMES T. DUGAN terminated. Attorney ALAN J. COHEN for EDWARD P MCGETTIGAN added.. (COHEN, ALAN)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Scott M. Colabella, in his offical capacity as Ocean County Clerk. Attorney MATHEW BRADY THOMPSON for SCOTT M. COLABELLA added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(THOMPSON, MATHEW)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Proposed Order Extend Time to Answer by CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON. (ANDERSON, ERIK)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney JENNIFER BOREK for PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO added. (BOREK, JENNIFER)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, GEORGE)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney RAFAEL JAUME CORBALAN terminated. (CORBALAN, RAFAEL)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER denying #57 , #59 , #58 , #60 , and #63 Motions to Dismiss; Granting in part and denying in part #53 and #55 Motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 5/31/2022. (abr, )).
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 5/31/2022. (abr, )
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, Salvation and Social Justice WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL FORD, JADE (PATEL, HENAL)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Letter from Plaintiffs and All Parties re Pending Dispositive Motions. (PUGACH, BRETT)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 TEXT ORDER that, consistent with the consent order entered with respect to amicus briefing #80 , the Motion for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae #70 filed by the League of Women Voters of New Jersey is hereby GRANTED; in light of the multitude of motions and briefing regarding the pending dispositive motions, counsel for the parties are to confer and file a joint letter identifying the motions presently before the Court and the briefs associated with those motions; the joint letter should be filed by 10/29/2021. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/22/2021. (kas)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 LETTER ORDER granting the parties request to withdraw submissions. The #99 and #100 Briefs in Opposition filed by James Hogan are hereby withdrawn. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/31/2021. (jmh)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Letter from Carbone and Faasse. (CARBONE, JOHN)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 TEXT ORDER INSTRUCTING Intervenor's Counsel to clarify its Letter submission #104 requesting a withdrawal of its Brief in Opposition #100 . Counsel is hereby instructed to clarify whether it is requesting to withdraw both its Brief in Opposition filed by John S. Hogan #99 and Brief in Opposition filed by James Hogan #100 . So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi.(kas)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Letter. (CARBONE, JOHN)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Letter from Plaintiffs re Opinion in Mazo v. Way. (PUGACH, BRETT)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Telephone Conference held on 7/15/2021. (kas)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 TEXT ORDER: Conference call is hereby scheduled for 7/15/2021 at 11:00 a.m. Counsel for the Plaintiffs shall initiate the call to our chambers line. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 7/7/2021. (kas)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Letter from Plaintiffs to Court re Inappropriate Filing of Gloucester County Clerk re #99 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #100 Brief in Opposition to Motion,. (PUGACH, BRETT)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 WITHDRAWN - BRIEF in Opposition filed by JAMES HOGAN re #56 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #59 MOTION to Dismiss , #57 Cross MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), #55 MOTION to Dismiss , #60 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #58 MOTION to Dismiss , #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (CARBONE, JOHN) Modified on 8/31/2021 (jmh).
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 WITHDRAWN - BRIEF in Opposition filed by JOHN S HOGAN re #56 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #59 MOTION to Dismiss , #57 Cross MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), #55 MOTION to Dismiss , #60 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #58 MOTION to Dismiss , #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (CARBONE, JOHN) Modified on 8/31/2021 (jmh).
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 CONSENT ORDER allowing Defendant, Paula Sollami Covello to file an over length omnibus reply brief of 19 pages in length. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 6/29/2021. (jmh)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 CONSENT ORDER allowing Intervenor Attorney General of New Jersey to file an over length omnibus reply brief of 25 pages in length. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 6/29/2021. (jmh)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO re #58 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GENOVA, ANGELO)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 Proposed Order by Consent to File Overlength Reply Brief by PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO re #80 Order,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter Encl. Proposed Consent Order)(BOREK, JENNIFER)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EDWARD P MCGETTIGAN re #56 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (DUGAN, JAMES)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Letter from DANIEL J. DeSALVO, ESQ.. (DERMODY, MICHAEL)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JOHN S HOGAN re #60 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PLACEK, JAIME)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by SCOTT M. COLABELLA re #55 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(THOMPSON, MATHEW)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Certification of George N. Cohen on behalf of GURBIR S GREWAL Re #89 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion. (COHEN, GEORGE)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by GURBIR S GREWAL re #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (COHEN, GEORGE)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Proposed Order Consent Order to File Overlenth Reply Brief by GURBIR S GREWAL. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Cover letter to Court)(COHEN, GEORGE)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON re #59 MOTION to Dismiss (ANDERSON, ERIK)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Zahid N. Quraishi for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/24/2021. (abr, )
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Andrea McChristian, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12536532.) (PATEL, HENAL)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, ANDREA MCCHRISTIAN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee as to Robert Weiner, Jade Ford, Aseem Mulji: $ 450, receipt number TRE119803 (mg)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #75 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Aseem Mulji, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/9/2021. (jmh)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #76 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jade Ford, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/9/2021. (jmh)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Weiner, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/9/2021. (jmh)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #73 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrea McChristian, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/9/2021. (jmh)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 CONSENT ORDER: (1) Any applications to appear amici curiae by those supporting Plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to dismiss shall be filed by 6/7/2021, and Defendants will not oppose any such motions. (2) Each Defendant and Intervenor shall submit any omnibus reply brief/response to amici submissions by 6/28/2021. (3) Plaintiffs consent to any reasonable applications to file an over length reply brief filed by any Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/7/2021. (jmh)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Letter from Jennifer Borek, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BOREK, JENNIFER)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #70 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae . Motion set for 7/6/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN PAUL HAYGOOD on behalf of Salvation and Social Justice (HAYGOOD, RYAN)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN PAUL HAYGOOD on behalf of LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY (HAYGOOD, RYAN)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jade Ford, Esq. by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, Salvation and Social Justice. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Henal Patel, #2 Certification Certification of Jade Ford, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PATEL, HENAL)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Aseem Mulji, Esq. by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, Salvation and Social Justice. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Henal Patel, #2 Certification Certification of Aseem Mulji, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PATEL, HENAL)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert Weiner, Esq. by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, Salvation and Social Justice. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Henal Patel, #2 Certification Certification of Robert Weiner, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PATEL, HENAL)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrea McChristian, Esq. by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, Salvation and Social Justice. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Henal Patel, #2 Certification Certification of Andrea McChristian, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PATEL, HENAL)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AMENDED DOCUMENT by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, Salvation and Social Justice. Amendment to #70 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae CORRECTED Ex. A - Amicus Brief. (PATEL, HENAL)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by HENAL PATEL on behalf of LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, Salvation and Social Justice (PATEL, HENAL)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, Salvation and Social Justice. (Attachments: #1 Brief Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief, #2 Exhibit Exh. A to Motion - Amicus Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PATEL, HENAL)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #70 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae . Motion set for 7/6/2021 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #74 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Robert Weiner, Esq., #73 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Andrea McChristian, Esq., #75 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Aseem Mulji, Esq.. Motion set for 7/6/2021 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #76 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jade Ford, Esq.. Motion set for 7/6/2021 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #56 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #59 MOTION to Dismiss , #57 Cross MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), #55 MOTION to Dismiss , #60 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, #58 MOTION to Dismiss , #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint - Brief in Opposition to All Defendants and Intervenor's Motions to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service by F. Komuves)(BROMBERG, YAEL)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER permitting Plaintiff's to file a 110 page omnibus brief in opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/20/2021. (jmh)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 APPLICATION/PETITION for Leave to File Omnibus Overlength Brief for by All Plaintiffs. (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 CONSENT ORDER that Plaintiffs' opposition to the Motions to Dismiss shall be filed on or before 5/24/2021, and Defendants reply briefs are due by 6/7/2021 Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/27/2021. (jmh)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Letter from Plaintiffs Requesting Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motions to Dismiss and Enter Proposed Scheduling Order with Consent of Parties. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order re Scheduling of Opposition and Reply Briefs for Motions to Dismiss)(PUGACH, BRETT)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by FLAVIO L. KOMUVES on behalf of All Plaintiffs (KOMUVES, FLAVIO)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 REFILED FOR SIGNATURE PURPOSES - MOTION to Dismiss by EDWARD P MCGETTIGAN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DUGAN, JAMES) (Modified on 3/30/2021)(jmh)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/30/2021. (jmh)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to Intervene by James Hogan. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(CARBONE, JOHN)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by OFFICE OF THE BERGEN COUTY CLERK. Responses due by 5/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief Legal Brief, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CORBALAN, RAFAEL)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #59 MOTION to Dismiss , #58 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 5/3/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #61 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 5/3/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #60 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion set for 5/3/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION to Dismiss by CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON. Responses due by 5/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Brief, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ANDERSON, ERIK)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION to Dismiss by PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO. Responses due by 5/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification Certification of Service)(BOREK, JENNIFER)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Cross MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by E. JUNIOR MALDONADO. (Attachments: #1 Certification DeSalvo, #2 Exhibit Exh. A-D (DeSalvo/Maldonado, #3 Brief, #4 Certificate of Service)(DERMODY, MICHAEL)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by EDWARD P MCGETTIGAN. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DUGAN, JAMES)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss by SCOTT M. COLABELLA. Responses due by 5/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(THOMPSON, MATHEW)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting the State of New Jersey's #52 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 3/29/2021. (jmh)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by GURBIR S GREWAL. Responses due by 5/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(COHEN, GEORGE)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION to Intervene by GURBIR S GREWAL. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of DAG George Cohen, #2 Statement Statement in Lieu of Brief, #3 Certificate of Service)(COHEN, GEORGE)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #52 MOTION to Intervene , #53 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Motion set for 5/3/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #55 MOTION to Dismiss , #56 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #57 Cross MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6). Motion set for 5/3/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #56 Judgment on the Pleadings submitted by James Dugan on 3/29/2021 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jmh)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 CONSENT ORDER that Defendants shall file their Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by 3/29/2021. Plaintiffs' opposition will be due 5/3/2021 and Defendants reply briefs due by 5/17/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/17/2021. (jmh)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL L. DERMODY on behalf of E. JUNIOR MALDONADO (DERMODY, MICHAEL)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please review the #50 Notice of Appearance submitted by Michael Dermody on 3/11/2021. If this document was attached in error, PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CORRECT DOCUMENT. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jmh)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Proposed Order Scheduling Motions to Dismiss and Opposition and Reply Briefs by CHRISTINE CONFORTI, ARATI KREIBICH, MICO LUCIDE, JOSEPH MARCHICA, KEVIN MCMILLAN, NEW JERSEY WORKING FAMILIES ALLIANCE, INC., ZINOVIA SPEZAKIS. (PUGACH, BRETT)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by GEORGE N. COHEN on behalf of GURBIR S GREWAL (COHEN, GEORGE)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by KEVIN MCMILLAN, NEW JERSEY WORKING FAMILIES ALLIANCE, INC., MICO LUCIDE, JOSEPH MARCHICA, ARATI KREIBICH, CHRISTINE CONFORTI, ZINOVIA SPEZAKIS. (Attachments: #1 Summons McGettigan Summons)(PUGACH, BRETT)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Letter from DAG George N. Cohen. (COHEN, GEORGE)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by KEVIN MCMILLAN, NEW JERSEY WORKING FAMILIES ALLIANCE, INC., MICO LUCIDE, JOSEPH MARCHICA, ARATI KREIBICH, CHRISTINE CONFORTI, ZINOVIA SPEZAKIS. (Attachments: #1 Summons Maldonado Summons)(PUGACH, BRETT)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by KEVIN MCMILLAN, NEW JERSEY WORKING FAMILIES ALLIANCE, INC., MICO LUCIDE, JOSEPH MARCHICA, ARATI KREIBICH, CHRISTINE CONFORTI, ZINOVIA SPEZAKIS. E. JUNIOR MALDONADO served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Maldonado Summons)(PUGACH, BRETT)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by KEVIN MCMILLAN, NEW JERSEY WORKING FAMILIES ALLIANCE, INC., MICO LUCIDE, JOSEPH MARCHICA, ARATI KREIBICH, CHRISTINE CONFORTI, ZINOVIA SPEZAKIS. EDWARD P MCGETTIGAN served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons McGettigan Summons)(PUGACH, BRETT)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #44 Acknowledgment of Service submitted by Brett Pugach on 2/10/2021 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. A Notice of Appearance must be filed on behalf of E. Junior Maldonado by a registered E-Filer. Daniel DeSalvo does not appear to be a registered e-filer with this Court. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE or register for mandatory e-filing. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jmh)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #43 Acknowledgment of Service submitted by Brett Pugach on 2/10/2021 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jmh)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson: Status Conference Call held on 2/8/2021. (Court Reporter/Recorder Carol Farrell.) (jmm, )
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER setting telephone conference call via zoom for February 8, 2021 at 1:30 P.M. Zoom invite to be sent. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 2/4/2021. (jmm, )
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Letter from Yael Bromberg, Esq.. (BROMBERG, YAEL)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that it is Certified to the New Jersey Attorney General that a constitutional question has been raised in this action and the New Jersey Attorney General has until 3/27/2021 to intervene in this action. (Order sent to NJ Attorney General on 2/1/2021) Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/1/2021. (jmh)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SUMMONS ISSUED as to E. JUNIOR MALDONADO, EDWARD P MCGETTIGAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Request for Summons to be Issued by KEVIN MCMILLAN, NEW JERSEY WORKING FAMILIES ALLIANCE, INC., MICO LUCIDE, JOSEPH MARCHICA, ARATI KREIBICH, CHRISTINE CONFORTI, ZINOVIA SPEZAKIS as to E. JUNIOR MALDONADO, EDWARD P MCGETTIGAN. (PUGACH, BRETT)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Letter from Plaintiffs re Rule 24.1(b). (PUGACH, BRETT)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NEW JERSEY WORKING FAMILIES ALLIANCE, INC.. (PUGACH, BRETT)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by YAEL BROMBERG on behalf of All Plaintiffs (BROMBERG, YAEL)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT By Christine Conforti et al. against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by ARATI KREIBICH, KEVIN MCMILLAN, ZINOVIA SPEZAKIS, MICO LUCIDE, JOSEPH MARCHICA, NEW JERSEY WORKING FAMILIES ALLIANCE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A (Ballots by County), #2 Exhibit Exhibit B (Executive Summary), #3 Certificate of Service Certification of Service)(PUGACH, BRETT)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney CHRISTOPHER ALI KHATAMI terminated. Attorney MATHEW BRADY THOMPSON for SCOTT M. COLABELLA added.. (THOMPSON, MATHEW)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 CONSENT ORDER that the Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motions #26 , #27 ,and #28 ; Plaintiff shall file Amended Complaint by 1/25/2021; Defendants shall file their Motions to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by 2/16/2021; Plaintiff's opposition due 3/08/2021; Defendants reply briefs due 3/22/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 1/05/2021. (jem)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Letter from B. Pugach re Proposed Scheduling Consent Order for Leave to file Amended Complaint and Motions to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Consent Order for Amended Complaint and Motions to Dismiss)(PUGACH, BRETT)
December 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #28 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #27 MOTION to Dismiss , #26 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 1/18/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by CHRISTINE CONFORTI re #27 MOTION to Dismiss , #28 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #26 MOTION to Dismiss (PUGACH, BRETT)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #28 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #27 MOTION to Dismiss , #26 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 1/4/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by SCOTT M. COLABELLA. Responses due by 12/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(KHATAMI, CHRISTOPHER)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss by PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO. Responses due by 12/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(BOREK, JENNIFER)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss by CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON. Responses due by 12/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 (complaint), #4 Exhibit 2 (Hanlon Cert), #5 Exhibit 3 (Monmouth Ballot), #6 Exhibit 4 (Ocean Ballot), #7 Exhibit 4 (Mercer Ballot), #8 Exhibit 5 (results), #9 Exhibit 6 (results))(ANDERSON, ERIK)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONSENT ORDER extending the time for Defendants to answer or otherwise respond until 12/07/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/16/2020. (jem)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CONSENT ORDER extending time to answer or otherwise respond to 11/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/30/2020. (abr, )
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by RAFAEL JAUME CORBALAN on behalf of OFFICE OF THE BERGEN COUTY CLERK (CORBALAN, RAFAEL)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that the Office of the Bergen County Clerk, shall be and is hereby permitted to intervene as a party of interest to this action and shall have Intervenor/ Party Interest status in this action upon filing a Notice of Appearance by legal counsel; This order terminates #7 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/22/2020. (abr, )
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion filed by CHRISTINE CONFORTI re #7 MOTION to Intervene (PUGACH, BRETT)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Christine Giordano Hanlon.. (ANDERSON, ERIK)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK ANDERSON on behalf of CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON (ANDERSON, ERIK)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #20 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/2/2020. (jmh)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Scott M. Colabella, in his official capacity as Ocean County Clerk. Attorney CHRISTOPHER ALI KHATAMI for SCOTT M. COLABELLA added. (KHATAMI, CHRISTOPHER)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRSTOPHER ZAMLOUT on behalf of PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO (ZAMLOUT, CHRSTOPHER)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Paula Sollami Covello.. (BOREK, JENNIFER)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELO JOSEPH GENOVA on behalf of PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO (GENOVA, ANGELO)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER BOREK on behalf of PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO (BOREK, JENNIFER)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #16 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/2/2020. (jmh)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #18 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SCOTT M. COLABELLA has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/30/2020. (jmh)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRSTOPHER ZAMLOUT on behalf of PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO (ZAMLOUT, CHRSTOPHER)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRSTOPHER ZAMLOUT on behalf of PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO (ZAMLOUT, CHRSTOPHER)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRSTOPHER ZAMLOUT on behalf of PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO (ZAMLOUT, CHRSTOPHER)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. SAHRADNIK on behalf of SCOTT M. COLABELLA (SAHRADNIK, JOHN)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTOPHER ALI KHATAMI on behalf of SCOTT M. COLABELLA (KHATAMI, CHRISTOPHER)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by RAFAEL JAUME CORBALAN on behalf of Office of the Bergen County Clerk (CORBALAN, RAFAEL)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene by Office of the Bergen County Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Certification Memorandum/Certification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Appearance, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(CORBALAN, RAFAEL)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the #7 Motion to intervene filed on 10/1/2020 contains an improper signature by Jaime Placek, Esq. It appears that a Notice of Appearance has been attached to this Motion, however, the Notice is not signed, and was filed improperly. Please resubmit the Notice of Appearance using the event - Notice of Appearance - that can be found under - Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents. When the Notice of Appearance is refiled, the #7 Motion to Intervene will be set according to the Court's motion calendar. (jmh, )
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTINE CONFORTI. SCOTT M. COLABELLA waiver sent on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (PUGACH, BRETT)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTINE CONFORTI. CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON waiver sent on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (PUGACH, BRETT)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTINE CONFORTI. PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO waiver sent on 8/17/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (PUGACH, BRETT)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Letter from Brett M. Pugach to the Court to Provide Notification under Loc. Civ. R. 24.1. (PUGACH, BRETT)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SCOTT M. COLABELLA, PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO, CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11033553), filed by Christine Conforti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(PUGACH, BRETT)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS. In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button. Do not enter address information to the docket. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party information should be entered as it appears on the caption of the complaint. Therefore, "in her official capacity as Monmouth County Clerk" should be entered in the party text and the same should have been done for the other defendants. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONFORTI v. HANLON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT M. COLABELLA
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER ALI KHATAMI
Represented By: JOHN C. SAHRADNIK
Represented By: MATHEW BRADY THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE GIORDANO HANLON
Represented By: ERIK ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAULA SOLLAMI COVELLO
Represented By: ANGELO JOSEPH GENOVA
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER ZAMLOUT
Represented By: JENNIFER BOREK
Represented By: CYNTHIA MCNUTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN S HOGAN
Represented By: JAIME RICHARD PLACEK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDWARD P MCGETTIGAN
Represented By: JAMES T. DUGAN
Represented By: ALAN J. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. JUNIOR MALDONADO
Represented By: MICHAEL L. DERMODY
Represented By: EDWARD J. FLORIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Burlington County Clerk
Represented By: MARK ROBERT NATALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINE CONFORTI
Represented By: BRETT M. PUGACH
Represented By: FLAVIO L. KOMUVES
Represented By: YAEL BROMBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARATI KREIBICH
Represented By: FLAVIO L. KOMUVES
Represented By: YAEL BROMBERG
Represented By: BRETT M. PUGACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN MCMILLAN
Represented By: FLAVIO L. KOMUVES
Represented By: YAEL BROMBERG
Represented By: BRETT M. PUGACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZINOVIA SPEZAKIS
Represented By: FLAVIO L. KOMUVES
Represented By: YAEL BROMBERG
Represented By: BRETT M. PUGACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICO LUCIDE
Represented By: FLAVIO L. KOMUVES
Represented By: YAEL BROMBERG
Represented By: BRETT M. PUGACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH MARCHICA
Represented By: FLAVIO L. KOMUVES
Represented By: YAEL BROMBERG
Represented By: BRETT M. PUGACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY WORKING FAMILIES ALLIANCE, INC.
Represented By: FLAVIO L. KOMUVES
Represented By: YAEL BROMBERG
Represented By: BRETT M. PUGACH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: HENAL PATEL
Represented By: RYAN PAUL HAYGOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Salvation and Social Justice
Represented By: HENAL PATEL
Represented By: RYAN PAUL HAYGOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: OFFICE OF THE BERGEN COUTY CLERK
Represented By: JAIME RICHARD PLACEK
Represented By: RAFAEL JAUME CORBALAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: GURBIR S GREWAL
Represented By: GEORGE N. COHEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: HONORABLE JAMES HOGAN
Represented By: JOHN M. CARBONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Camden County Democrat Committee
Represented By: ALYSSA LOTT
Represented By: WILLIAM M. TAMBUSSI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Regular Democratic Organization of Union County, Inc.
Represented By: ROBERT F. RENAUD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: MORRIS COUNTY REPUBLICAN COMMITTEE
Represented By: WILLIAM J PALATUCCI
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: WARREN COUNTY REGULAR REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATION, INC.
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: WILLIAM J PALATUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: REPUBLICAN COMMITTEE OF UNION COUNTY
Represented By: WILLIAM J PALATUCCI
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: CUMBERLAND REGULAR REPUBLICAN ORGANIZATION, INC.
Represented By: MARK M. MAKHAIL
Represented By: WILLIAM J PALATUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Middlesex County Democratic Organization
Represented By: WILLIAM W. NORTHGRAVE
Represented By: KEITH MICHAEL MENSCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?