AMEC FOSTER WHEELER USA CORP. et al v. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON et al
Plaintiff: AMEC FOSTER WHEELER LIMITED, AMEC FOSTER WHEELER PLC and AMEC FOSTER WHEELER USA CORP.
Defendant: EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, CHUBB LIMITED, STARR INTERNATIONAL COMPANY INC., AXA GROUP, MARKEL CORPORATION, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., JOHN DOES 1-100, CHUBB CORPORATION, BRITISH COLUMBIA INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, PRESERVATION CAPITAL PARTNERS, BLACKWOOD BIDCO LIMITED, STARR INSURANCE HOLDINGS, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON, ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY SE, THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP INC., APOLLO GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, LLC. and QATAR INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2020cv08516
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT ORDER STAYING CASE until no earlier that 14 days after a final ruling by the English Court, or by an agreement between the Defendant Insurers and AMEC Foster to dissolve or continue the ASI. Upon the lifting of the Stay, the Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference to reschedule the filing and hearing dates set forth in the Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 7/23/2020. (jmh)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Order on Consent by All Plaintiffs. (BARTELL, ANTHONY)
July 13, 2020 Filing 3 Letter from Anthony Bartell. (BARTELL, ANTHONY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
July 9, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - PAUL R. KOEPFF has designated as confidential materials and restricted access to the #2 Exhibit to the Notice of Removal filed on 7/9/2020. This document does not appear to be the subject of a motion or order. Please submit a certification stating that this document is to be marked Confidential Material or that this document's access was restricted in error. Please be advised, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3, you must file a motion for leave to have a document sealed. (mg)
July 9, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal,, Verified Complaint by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON, EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., MARKEL CORPORATION, STARR INSURANCE HOLDINGS, THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP INC.. (KOEPFF, PAUL)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
July 9, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: No state court documents have been provided . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., STARR INSURANCE HOLDINGS, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON, Chubb Limited, CHUBB CORPORATION, EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP INC., MARKEL CORPORATION from Superior Court of New Jersey, Hunterdon County, case number HNT-235-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11049631), filed by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., STARR INSURANCE HOLDINGS, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON, Chubb Limited, CHUBB CORPORATION, EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY, THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP INC., MARKEL CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service)(KOEPFF, PAUL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMEC FOSTER WHEELER USA CORP. et al v. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMEC FOSTER WHEELER LIMITED
Represented By: ANTHONY BARTELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMEC FOSTER WHEELER PLC
Represented By: ANTHONY BARTELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMEC FOSTER WHEELER USA CORP.
Represented By: ANTHONY BARTELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EVANSTON INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: PAUL R. KOEPFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUBB LIMITED
Represented By: PAUL R. KOEPFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARR INTERNATIONAL COMPANY INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AXA GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARKEL CORPORATION
Represented By: PAUL R. KOEPFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: PAUL R. KOEPFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUBB CORPORATION
Represented By: PAUL R. KOEPFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITISH COLUMBIA INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, PRESERVATION CAPITAL PARTNERS, BLACKWOOD BIDCO LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARR INSURANCE HOLDINGS
Represented By: PAUL R. KOEPFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S LONDON
Represented By: PAUL R. KOEPFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANZ GLOBAL CORPORATE & SPECIALTY SE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HARTFORD FINANCIAL SERVICES GROUP INC.
Represented By: PAUL R. KOEPFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APOLLO GLOBAL MANAGEMENT, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QATAR INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?