GARCIA v. WALMART, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BLANCA GARCIA
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10, WALMART, INC. and ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Case Number: 3:2020cv09032
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 12/14/2020 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Counsel for Plaintiff is directed to initiate the call. Any motion to amend the pleadings or to join new parties, whether by amended or third party complaint, must be filed by December 31, 2020. All fact discovery, including any third party depositions, is to be complete by March 1, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 08/27/2020. (jdb)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, JOHN DOES 1-10 by WALMART, INC..(MCFADDEN, CHRISTOPHER)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Initial Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert will be held via telephone. Attached are the call-in instructions for the call. Counsel are directed to call in at the scheduled time. (Attachment: Instructions and call in information). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/21/2020. (Attachments: # 1 JDP Instructions)(mm)
July 17, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WALMART, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 08/07/2020. (jdb)
July 17, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Walmart, Inc.. Attorney CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL MCFADDEN for WALMART, INC. added. (MCFADDEN, CHRISTOPHER)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART, INC. identifying WALMART, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (MCFADDEN, CHRISTOPHER)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART, INC. from Superior Court of Middlesex County, case number MID-L-3620-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11088823), filed by WALMART, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(MCFADDEN, CHRISTOPHER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARCIA v. WALMART, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALMART, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL MCFADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLANCA GARCIA
Represented By: JOSEPH RICIGLIANO, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?