DALY v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SIANEAD DALY
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. and KOLMAR LABORATORIES, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv09084
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 7W before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/25/2020. (jmh)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant KOLMAR LABORATORIES, INC. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 8/25/2020. (jmh)
August 24, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC..(GARDE, JOHN)
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by KOLMAR LABORATORIES, INC.. (FEGAN, JEFFREY)
August 21, 2020 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice by KOLMAR LABORATORIES, INC.. (FEGAN, JEFFREY)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by PENELOPE M. TAYLOR on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC. (TAYLOR, PENELOPE)
August 9, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Judge Anne E. Thompson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by KOLMAR LABORATORIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Robert Edmonds, #2 Declaration Of Jeffrey Fegan, #3 Exhibit Swedlow Order, #4 Exhibit Jatras Order, #5 Exhibit Preicado Order, #6 Exhibit Trimble Order, #7 Exhibit Pulido order, #8 Exhibit Blankschaen Order, #9 Brief Memorandum of Law)(FEGAN, JEFFREY)
August 3, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/24/2020. (jmh)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., Johnson & Johnson International, Inc.. Attorney JOHN C. GARDE for JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.,JOHN C. GARDE for JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC.,JOHN C. GARDE for JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC. added. (GARDE, JOHN)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIANEAD DALY. KOLMAR LABORATORIES, INC. served on 7/28/2020, answer due 8/18/2020. (WOODARD, DANIEL)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIANEAD DALY. JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (WOODARD, DANIEL)
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIANEAD DALY. JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (WOODARD, DANIEL)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SIANEAD DALY. JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC. served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (WOODARD, DANIEL)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet and Complaint served on Johnson & Johnson International, Inc. on July 20, 2020, filed by SIANEAD DALY. (WOODARD, DANIEL)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC., KOLMAR LABORATORIES, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr)
July 20, 2020 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by SIANEAD DALY as Executor of AMANDA JANE POWELL. (WOODARD, DANIEL)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC., KOLMAR LABORATORIES, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11091563) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SIANEAD DALY as Executor of AMANDA JANE POWELL.(WOODARD, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DALY v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: JOHN C. GARDE
Represented By: PENELOPE M. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Represented By: JOHN C. GARDE
Represented By: PENELOPE M. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC.
Represented By: JOHN C. GARDE
Represented By: PENELOPE M. TAYLOR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOLMAR LABORATORIES, INC.
Represented By: JEFFREY FEGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIANEAD DALY
Represented By: DANIEL WOODARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?