SHUKLA v. DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP et al
Plaintiff: ASHU SHUKLA
Defendant: US ATTORNEY FOR NEW JERSEY, DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP, DIRECTOR, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS (FBI) and ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES
Case Number: 3:2020cv09274
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 8/10/2020. (jmh)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Refiled for Signature Purposes) filed by ASHU SHUKLA (jmh)
August 6, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Seal. Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
August 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal Documents filed by ASHU SHUKLA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(jmh)
August 6, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal submitted by Ashu Shukla on 8/6/2020 contains an improper signature. Pro Se Litigants are not permitted to submit documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A HAND SIGNATURE OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jmh)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by ASHU SHUKLA (jmh)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Plaintiff's pending wrongful termination employment suit in the Southern District of New York by ASHU SHUKLA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(jmh)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Plaintiff is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
July 27, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. Motion set for 9/8/2020 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by ASHU SHUKLA. (jmh)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 Pro se Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically filed by ASHU SHUKLA (jmh)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES, DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP, DIRECTOR, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS (FBI), US ATTORNEY FOR NEW JERSEY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jjc, )
July 24, 2020 COMPLAINT FILED. See docket entry #1 for complaint documents.(jjc, )
July 24, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number TRE112947 (jjc, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(abr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHUKLA v. DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US ATTORNEY FOR NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELOITTE CONSULTING LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTOR, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATIONS (FBI)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF THE UNITED STATES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHU SHUKLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?