MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. v. AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. et al
Plaintiff: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC., AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD. and AUROMEDICS PHARMA LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv10444
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
2 Judge: Brian R Martinotti
3 Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Patent - Abbreviated New Drug Application(ANDA)
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, STEVEN J. MOORE and JAMES E. NEALON, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdb)
September 17, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice James E. Nealon, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11368879.) (YOUNGELSON, MARC)
September 17, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Steven J. Moore, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11368798.) (YOUNGELSON, MARC)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Steven J. Moore, Esq. and James E. Nealon, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/10/2020. (jmh)
September 9, 2020 Filing 17 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Steven J. Moore, Esq. and James Nealon, Esq. for by AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC., AUROMEDICS PHARMA LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James Nealon, Esq., #2 Certification of Steven J. Moore, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order)(YOUNGELSON, MARC)
August 31, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, PHILIP J. SPEAR and ASHBEY MORGAN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jmh)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ashbey Morgan to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11286398.) (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Philip J. Spear to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11286266.) (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONSENT ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Philip J. Spear and Ashbey Morgan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/31/2020. (jmh)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admissions for by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John E. Flaherty, #2 Certification of Philip J. Spear, #3 Certification of Ashbey Morgan, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(FLAHERTY, JOHN)
August 26, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, MARK N. REITER and TRACEY B. DAVIES, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jmh)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Mark N. Reiter to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11263393.) (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Tracey B. Davies to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11263337.) (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Tracey B. Davies and Mark N. Reiter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/26/2020. (jmh)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION/PETITION for Pro Hac Vice Admissions of Tracey B. Davies and Mark N. Reiter for by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of John E. Flaherty, #2 Certification of Tracey B. Davies, #3 Certification of Mark N. Reiter, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(FLAHERTY, JOHN)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert for all further proceedings. Judge Brian R. Martinotti, Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 8/18/2020. (jjc, )
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC D. YOUNGELSON on behalf of All Defendants (YOUNGELSON, MARC)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD. waiver sent on 8/14/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. waiver sent on 8/14/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; AUROMEDICS PHARMA LLC waiver sent on 8/14/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (BETZ, CYNTHIA)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC., AUROMEDICS PHARMA LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 AO120 Patent Form filed. (mg)
August 13, 2020 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
August 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CYNTHIA STENCEL BETZ on behalf of MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. (BETZ, CYNTHIA)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (FLAHERTY, JOHN)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD., AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC., AUROMEDICS PHARMA LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11205513), filed by MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(FLAHERTY, JOHN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP. v. AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA USA INC.
Represented By: MARC D. YOUNGELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROBINDO PHARMA LTD.
Represented By: MARC D. YOUNGELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AUROMEDICS PHARMA LLC
Represented By: MARC D. YOUNGELSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MERCK SHARP & DOHME CORP.
Represented By: CYNTHIA STENCEL BETZ
Represented By: JOHN EDMUND FLAHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?