MARTOCCI v. THE HOME DEPOT et al
Plaintiff: DEBORAH MARTOCCI
Defendant: ABC COMPANY 1-10 (FICTITIOUS NAMES, TRUE NAMES UNKNOWN AT THIS TIME) A BUSINESS ENTITY AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, JANE DOE 1-10 (FICTITIOUS NAMES TRUE NAMES UNKNOWN AS THIS TIME), JOHN DOE 1-10 (FICTITIOUS NAMES TRUE NAMES UNKNOWN AT THIS TIME), THE HOME DEPOT, ABC COMPANY 1-10, JOHN DOE 1-10 and JANE DOE 1-10
Case Number: 3:2020cv10617
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 12/16/2020 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert; Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate call. Amended Pleadings due by 3/9/2021. Discovery due by 3/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/6/2020. (mg)
October 1, 2020 TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/1/2020 via telephone. (eh, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Ordered Initial Conference set for 10/1/2020 at 11:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/11/2020. (eh, )
August 18, 2020 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (abr)
August 18, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CARLA THOMASINA ELIAS NAVA on behalf of THE HOME DEPOT (ELIAS NAVA, CARLA)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE HOME DEPOT identifying The Home Depot, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (GIACOPELLI, MICHAEL)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE HOME DEPOT from Superior Court of New Jersey/Ocean County, case number OCN-L-000742-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11218374), filed by THE HOME DEPOT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Proof of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Home Depot's Answer with Jury Demand, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Email from Plaintiff's Counsel, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(GIACOPELLI, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARTOCCI v. THE HOME DEPOT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANY 1-10 (FICTITIOUS NAMES, TRUE NAMES UNKNOWN AT THIS TIME) A BUSINESS ENTITY AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 1-10 (FICTITIOUS NAMES TRUE NAMES UNKNOWN AS THIS TIME)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-10 (FICTITIOUS NAMES TRUE NAMES UNKNOWN AT THIS TIME)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HOME DEPOT
Represented By: MICHAEL N. GIACOPELLI
Represented By: CARLA THOMASINA ELIAS NAVA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANY 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH MARTOCCI
Represented By: KEVIN M. STANKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?