KILLENBECK v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Plaintiff: ANGEL KILLENBECK
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL, COSMETIC TOILETRY AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION, JOHNSON & JOHNSON and JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.
In Re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2020cv10707
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT)
September 14, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN)
September 11, 2020 Filing 16 Short Form Complaint by ANGEL KILLENBECK. (O'DELL, PATRICIA)
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICIA LEIGH O'DELL on behalf of ANGEL KILLENBECK (O'DELL, PATRICIA)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (eh, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS T. LOCKE on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (LOCKE, THOMAS)
August 19, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (abr)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT)
August 18, 2020 Filing 11 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:20-cv-02011. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 EMAIL from the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey requesting the transfer of the original file to be sent using the extract civil case feature of CM/ECF. (ztnr)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-223) dated 8/17/2020 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing the transfer to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Freda L. Wolfson for coordinated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407.(MDL 2738) (ztnr)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Coots, John)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JOHNSON & JOHNSON (Coots, John)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Elberg Affidavit, #2 Exhibit B - Son Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Coots, John)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE pursuant to R.P.J.P.M.L. 4.1(b) by JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (ztth)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Tobias Locke on behalf of PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL (Locke, Thomas)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, )
July 24, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, )
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by ANGEL KILLENBECK. Case related to Case No. 1:20-cv-1715 and MDL No. 3:16-md-2738. (Parfitt, Michelle)
July 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7378478) filed by ANGEL KILLENBECK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Johnson & Johnson, #3 Summons Johnson & Johnson Consumer, Inc., #4 Summons Personal Care Products Council)(Parfitt, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KILLENBECK v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Represented By: John Chadwick Coots
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PERSONAL CARE PRODUCTS COUNCIL
Represented By: Thomas Tobias Locke
Represented By: THOMAS T. LOCKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COSMETIC TOILETRY AND FRAGRANCE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Thomas Tobias Locke
Represented By: THOMAS T. LOCKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: John Chadwick Coots
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.
Represented By: John Chadwick Coots
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGEL KILLENBECK
Represented By: MICHELLE A. PARFITT
Represented By: PATRICIA LEIGH O'DELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?