RIZNYK v. FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION
Plaintiff: BRIAN RIZNYK
Defendant: FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2020cv10729
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION identifying FFC Holding Corp., WEI Sales, LLC, Wells Enterprises, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HANAN, MICHAEL)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC INITIAL CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2020 at 2:30 PM, initiated by Plaintiffs counsel before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/02/2020. (jem)
October 1, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (jem)
October 1, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION.(HANAN, MICHAEL)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by MAXINE J. NICHOLAS on behalf of FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION (NICHOLAS, MAXINE)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL S. HANAN on behalf of FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION (HANAN, MICHAEL)
September 16, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/01/2020. (jem)
September 15, 2020 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (HANAN, MICHAEL)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by BRIAN RIZNYK. FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. (DION, SAMUEL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr, )
August 19, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11225589) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BRIAN RIZNYK. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DION, SAMUEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIZNYK v. FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN RIZNYK
Represented By: SAMUEL A. DION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIELDBROOKS FOOD CORPORATION
Represented By: MAXINE J. NICHOLAS
Represented By: MICHAEL S. HANAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?