DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. et al v. MURPHY et al
Plaintiff: REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, NEW JERSEY REPUBLICAN STATE COMMITTEE and Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.
Defendant: PHILIP D. MURPHY and TAHESHA WAY
Intervenor Defendant: DCCC, LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY and NAACP NEW JERSEY STATE CONFERENCE
Intervenor: Atlantic County Democratic Committee
Amicus Curiae: National Lawyers Guild Labor and Employment and International Committees
Case Number: 3:2020cv10753
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2020 Filing 82 BRIEF in Support filed by Atlantic County Democratic Committee re #71 MOTION for Order to Show Cause to Dismiss the Amended Complaint on an Expedited Basis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhs 1-12, #2 Certificate of Service)(HERMAN, ROBERT)
October 12, 2020 Filing 81 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DCCC re #71 MOTION for Order to Show Cause to Dismiss the Amended Complaint on an Expedited Basis (Attachments: #1 Certification of Rajiv D. Parikh in Further Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Certificate of Service)(PARIKH, RAJIV)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant-Intervenor DCCC's October 12, 2020 correspondence requesting permission to file an overlength reply brief (ECF No. #79 ). Defendant-Intervenor's request is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/12/2020. (gxh)
October 12, 2020 Filing 79 Letter from be Letter from Rajiv D. Parikh requesting Leave to File an Overlength Brief. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
October 9, 2020 Filing 78 RESPONSE in Support filed by TAHESHA WAY re #71 MOTION for Order to Show Cause to Dismiss the Amended Complaint on an Expedited Basis (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LYNCH, MATTHEW)
October 9, 2020 Filing 77 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., NEW JERSEY REPUBLICAN STATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE re #71 MOTION for Order to Show Cause to Dismiss the Amended Complaint on an Expedited Basis (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas J. Steinhardt, #2 Certificate of Service)(TESTA, MICHAEL)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying #35 MOTION for Order to Show Cause and request for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/06/2020. (jdb)
October 6, 2020 Filing 75 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/06/2020. (jdb)
October 6, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #71 MOTION for Order to Show Cause to Dismiss the Amended Complaint on an Expedited Basis. Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
October 6, 2020 Filing 74 Letter from Defenant Way Re Supreme Court stay Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Supreme Court Order)(LYNCH, MATTHEW)
October 6, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #73 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae and for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae. Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae and for Leave to File a Brief as Amicus Curiae. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(jdb) Modified on 10/6/2020 (eaj, ).
October 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 TEXT ORDER: The following briefing schedule shall apply to Intervenor-Defendant DCCC's Motion for Order to Show Cause (ECF No. #71 ) relating to the dismissal of Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (ECF No. #33 ): any and all opposition or response shall be filed by October 9, 2020 and Intervenor-Defendant DCCC may reply no later than October 12, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/3/2020. (gxh)
October 2, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION for Order to Show Cause to Dismiss the Amended Complaint on an Expedited Basis by DCCC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Order to Show Cause to Dismiss the Amended Complaint (Expedited Review sought), #2 Text of Proposed Order Dismissing Amended Complaint, #3 Certificate of Service)(PARIKH, RAJIV)
October 2, 2020 Filing 70 Letter from B. John Pendleton, Jr., re: Briefing Schedule. (PENDLETON, B.)
October 2, 2020 Filing 69 Letter from Michael L. Testa, Jr. re #68 Letter. (TESTA, MICHAEL)
October 2, 2020 Filing 68 Letter from Rajiv D. Parikh, Esq.. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
October 1, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #67 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae Supporting Dismissal of the Republican National Committee and Trump Re-Election Committee's Lawsuit Challenging Vote By Mail Efforts in New Jersey. Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr )
September 30, 2020 Filing 67 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae Supporting Dismissal of the Republican National Committee and Trump Re-Election Committee's Lawsuit Challenging Vote By Mail Efforts in New Jersey by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Brief)(VENETIS, PENNY)
September 30, 2020 Pro Hac Vice feeas to Kevin J. Hamilton: $ 150, receipt number TRE114387 (mg)
September 30, 2020 Filing 66 Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by PENNY VENETIS on behalf of All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(VENETIS, PENNY)
September 29, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae . Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 65 Letter from Defendant Wat regarding consent to extend time for responsive pleading. (LYNCH, MATTHEW)
September 29, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to Appear Amicus Curiae by National Lawyers Guild Labor and Employment and International Committees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief of Amici, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MCCARTHY, RYAN)
September 28, 2020 Filing 63 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., NEW JERSEY REPUBLICAN STATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE re #35 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas Steinhardt, #2 Declaration of David Huguenel, #3 Declaration of Elissa Voccola, #4 Certificate of Service)(TESTA, MICHAEL)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiffs' request to file an overlength reply brief up to 20 pages to respond to the three oppositions. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 09/28/2020. (jdb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 61 Letter from Plaintiffs requesting leave to file overlength reply brief. (TESTA, MICHAEL)
September 25, 2020 Filing 60 Exhibit to #58 Brief in Opposition to Motion, by PHILIP D. MURPHY. (jdb)
September 25, 2020 Filing 59 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DCCC re #35 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue (Attachments: #1 Certification of Rajiv D. Parikh in Opposition to #35 , #2 Exhibit s 1 through 6, #3 Certificate of Service)(PARIKH, RAJIV)
September 25, 2020 Filing 58 BRIEF in Opposition filed by TAHESHA WAY re #35 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Lynch, #2 Exhibit 1-7, #3 Exhibit 8-13, #4 Exhibit 14, #5 Exhibit 15-19, #6 Declaration of Robert Giles, #7 Declaration of Kimberly Campisi, #8 Exhibit 1-3, #9 Declaration of Beth McGuckin, #10 Exhibit, #11 Declaration of Linda Von Nessi, #12 Exhibit, #13 Certificate of Service)(LYNCH, MATTHEW)
September 25, 2020 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, NAACP NEW JERSEY STATE CONFERENCE re #35 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certificate of Service Certification of B. John Pendleton, Jr., ESQ. in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Order to Show Cause why a Preliminary Injunction should not issue)(PENDLETON, B.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 56 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Atlantic County Democratic Committee re #35 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Robert D. Herman, Esq., #2 Exhibit Combined Exhs. 1-16)(HERMAN, ROBERT)
September 24, 2020 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Telephone Conference held on 9/24/2020. (Court Reporter: CATHY FORD.) (gxh)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's request for leave to file an overlength brief of up to 50 pages in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunctive relief. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/24/2020. (jmh)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 LETTER ORDER consenting to Defendant's request to file and overlength brief of up to 50 pages. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/24/2020. (mg)
September 24, 2020 Filing 52 Letter from Defendant Way requesting leave for overlength brief. (LYNCH, MATTHEW)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 9/24/2020 at 1:00 PM before Judge Michael A. Shipp. The Court will provide counsel with dial-in information. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/23/2020. (gxh)
September 23, 2020 Filing 50 Letter from Defendant Way. (LYNCH, MATTHEW)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin J. Hamilton, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 09/23/2020. (jdb)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice at to Danielle M. Lang, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 09/23/2020. (jdb)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Molly E. Danahy, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 09/23/2020. (jdb)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 09/23/2020. (jdb)
September 23, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr)
September 22, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by DCCC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Kevin J. Hamilton, #2 Certification Rajiv. D. Parikh, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(PARIKH, RAJIV)
September 22, 2020 Filing 44 Letter. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
September 21, 2020 Filing 43 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., NEW JERSEY REPUBLICAN STATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE re #15 MOTION to Intervene (Attachments: #1 District of Montana Decision)(TESTA, MICHAEL)
September 21, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #35 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue. Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ORDER: The following briefing schedule shall apply to Plaintiffs' Order to Show Cause (ECF No. #35 ). Defendants' opposition is due no later than September 25, 2020 and Plaintiffs' reply is due no later than September 28, 2020. The Court is in receipt of the Proposed Defendant-Intervenors' ("Proposed Intervenors") correspondence (ECF No. #40 ). Given the concerns set forth therein, Proposed Intervenors may file opposition to the Motion for Order to Show Cause (ECF No. #35 ) by no later than September 25, 2020. The Court, however, will reserve consideration of the arguments set forth by the Proposed Intervenors pending a decision on the pending Motion to Intervene (ECF No. #15 ). So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/18/2020. (gxh)
September 17, 2020 Filing 41 Letter from Rajiv D. Parikh, Esq. regarding briefing schedule and requesting telephone conference. re #38 Letter, 39 Order, #37 Letter. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
September 17, 2020 Filing 40 Letter from B. John Pendleton, Jr., on behalf of Proposed Defendant-Intervenors the League of Women Voters of New Jersey and NAACP New Jersey. (PENDLETON, B.)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' proposed briefing schedule (ECF No. #37 ). Defendants and Intervenors are directed to submit their counterproposals no later than 5:00 pm, Thursday, September 17, 2020. The Court will issue a scheduling order on Friday, September 18, 2020. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/16/2020. (gxh)
September 16, 2020 Filing 38 Letter from Defendant proposing briefing schedule. (LYNCH, MATTHEW)
September 16, 2020 Filing 37 Letter from Michael L. Testa Jr. re 34 Order, #36 Letter. (TESTA, MICHAEL)
September 16, 2020 Filing 36 Letter from Rajiv D. Parikh, Esq. requesting extension re 34 Order,. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
September 16, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., NEW JERSEY REPUBLICAN STATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Bryan Weir, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Text of Proposed Order, #30 Certificate of Service)(TESTA, MICHAEL)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer regarding a briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (ECF No. #33 ). Counsel shall e-file joint correspondence with their proposed briefing schedule by no later than 09/16/2020. Applications for emergency relief shall conform to Local Civil Rule 65.1. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/14/2020. (gxh)
September 11, 2020 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT against TAHESHA WAY, filed by NEW JERSEY REPUBLICAN STATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC..(TESTA, MICHAEL)
September 9, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Danielle M. Lang, Esq.). Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Danielle M. Lang, Esq.) by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, NAACP NEW JERSEY STATE CONFERENCE. (Attachments: #1 Certification of B. John Pendleton, Jr., #2 Certification of Danielle M. Lang, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PENDLETON, B.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Telephone Conference held on 9/8/2020. (Court Reporter: CATHY FORD.) (gxh)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 9/8/2020 at 1:00 PM before Judge Michael A. Shipp. The Court will provide counsel with dial-in information. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 9/8/2020. (gxh)
September 4, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #28 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PHILIP D. MURPHY, TAHESHA WAY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 09/28/2020. (jdb)
September 4, 2020 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NEW JERSEY REPUBLICAN STATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE, DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC.. PHILIP D. MURPHY served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020; TAHESHA WAY served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (TESTA, MICHAEL)
September 4, 2020 Filing 28 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Complaint. Attorney MATTHEW JON LYNCH for PHILIP D. MURPHY,MATTHEW JON LYNCH for TAHESHA WAY added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(LYNCH, MATTHEW)
September 3, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELO JOSEPH GENOVA on behalf of DCCC (GENOVA, ANGELO)
September 2, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, EMILY R. BRAILEY, MARY R. BEALL, MARC E. ELIAS and SARAH R. GONSKI, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdb)
September 2, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sarah R. Gonski to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
September 2, 2020 Filing 25 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Marc E. Elias to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
September 2, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Mary R. Beall to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
September 2, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Emily R. Brailey to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
September 2, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee as to Marc E. Elias, Sarah R. Gonski, Emily R. Brailey, Mary N. Beall, $ 600, receipt number TRE113729 (jal, ).
September 1, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Molly E. Danahy, Esq.). Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
September 1, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Molly E. Danahy, Esq.) by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, NAACP NEW JERSEY STATE CONFERENCE. (Attachments: #1 Certification of B. John Pendleton, Jr., #2 Certification Molly E. Danahy, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PENDLETON, B.)
September 1, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by RYAN PAUL HAYGOOD on behalf of LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, NAACP NEW JERSEY STATE CONFERENCE (HAYGOOD, RYAN)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Intervene. DCCC is permitted to intervene is this matter as a Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 09/01/2020. (jdb)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #9 Proposed Intervenor Atlantic County Democratic Committee's Motion to Intervene and granting Proposed Intervenor Atlantic County Democratic Committee's alternate requested relief to submit a brief as amicus curiae. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 09/01/2020. (jdb)
September 1, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by HENAL PATEL on behalf of LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, NAACP NEW JERSEY STATE CONFERENCE (PATEL, HENAL)
September 1, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
August 31, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Atlantic County Democratic Committee re #10 MOTION to Intervene , #9 MOTION to Intervene and in the Alternative to Submit a Brief as Amicus Curiae (HERMAN, ROBERT)
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 Letter from Rajiv D. Parikh, Esq. in Further Support of DCCC Motion to Intervene re #10 MOTION to Intervene , #14 Response to Motion,. (PARIKH, RAJIV)
August 31, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene by LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY, NAACP NEW JERSEY STATE CONFERENCE. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Certification of B. John Pendleton, Jr., in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Exhibit 1 - Voting Advocates - Elections Recommendations Sign On Letter, #4 Exhibit 2 - November Election Recommendations, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - US_DIS_PAWD_2_20cv966_MEMORANDUM_ORDER_granting_83_Motion_to_Intervene_g, #6 Exhibit 4 - PROPOSED Answer of Intervenor, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(PENDLETON, B.)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion filed by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., NEW JERSEY REPUBLICAN STATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE re #10 MOTION to Intervene , #9 MOTION to Intervene and in the Alternative to Submit a Brief as Amicus Curiae (TESTA, MICHAEL)
August 26, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee of $450 received as to Bryan Weir, Thomas R. McCarthy, and Cameron T. Norris, receipt number TRE113573. (jem)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting application to appear pro hac as to Marc E. Elias, Esq., Sarah R. Gonski, Esq., Emily R. Brailey, Esq., and Mary N. Beall, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 08/26/2020. (jdb)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from Rajiv D. Parikh. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Rajiv D. Parikh, Esq., #2 Certification of Marc E. Elias, Esq., #3 Affidavit of Emily R. Brailey, Esq., #4 Affidavit of Mary N. Beall, Esq., #5 Affidavit of Sarah R. Gonski, Esq., #6 Text of Proposed Order)(PARIKH, RAJIV)
August 24, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Order by DCCC re #10 MOTION to Intervene . (PARIKH, RAJIV)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene by DCCC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of Motion to Intervene, #2 Certification of Rajiv D. Parikh, Esq. in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Exhibit A - Proposed Answer of Intervenor DCCC)(PARIKH, RAJIV)
August 21, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Intervene and in the Alternative to Submit a Brief as Amicus Curiae. Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Intervene and in the Alternative to Submit a Brief as Amicus Curiae by Atlantic County Democratic Committee. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification M. Suleiman in Support of Motion, #2 Brief Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Intervene, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(HERMAN, ROBERT)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to CAMERON T. NORRIS, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 08/20/2020. (jdb)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Bryan Weir. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 08/20/2020. (jdb)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Thomas R. McCarthy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 08/20/2020. (jdb)
August 19, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Cameron T. Norris, #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bryan Weir, #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas R. McCarthy. Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Cameron T. Norris by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., NEW JERSEY REPUBLICAN STATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Michael L. Testa, Jr., #2 Statement of Cameron T. Norris, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TESTA, MICHAEL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bryan Weir by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., NEW JERSEY REPUBLICAN STATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Michael L. Testa, Jr., #2 Statement of Bryan Weir, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TESTA, MICHAEL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas R. McCarthy by DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC., NEW JERSEY REPUBLICAN STATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Michael L. Testa, Jr., #2 Statement of Thomas R. McCarthy, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(TESTA, MICHAEL)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PHILIP D. MURPHY, TAHESHA WAY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr, )
August 19, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (abr)
August 19, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHILIP D. MURPHY, TAHESHA WAY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11226671), filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., NEW JERSEY REPUBLICAN STATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(TESTA, MICHAEL)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHILIP D. MURPHY, TAHESHA WAY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11226671), filed by Donald J. Trump for President, Inc., NEW JERSEY REPUBLICAN STATE COMMITTEE, REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(TESTA, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DONALD J. TRUMP FOR PRESIDENT, INC. et al v. MURPHY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REPUBLICAN NATIONAL COMMITTEE
Represented By: MICHAEL L. TESTA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEW JERSEY REPUBLICAN STATE COMMITTEE
Represented By: MICHAEL L. TESTA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald J. Trump for President, Inc.
Represented By: MICHAEL L. TESTA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP D. MURPHY
Represented By: MATTHEW JON LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAHESHA WAY
Represented By: MATTHEW JON LYNCH
Represented By: PENNY VENETIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: DCCC
Represented By: ANGELO JOSEPH GENOVA
Represented By: RAJIV D. PARIKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: LEAGUE OF WOMEN VOTERS OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: HENAL PATEL
Represented By: B. JOHN PENDLETON, JR.
Represented By: RYAN PAUL HAYGOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: NAACP NEW JERSEY STATE CONFERENCE
Represented By: HENAL PATEL
Represented By: B. JOHN PENDLETON, JR.
Represented By: RYAN PAUL HAYGOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Atlantic County Democratic Committee
Represented By: ROBERT D. HERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Lawyers Guild Labor and Employment and International Committees
Represented By: RYAN PATRICK MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?