PACZKOWSKI v. HYATT CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: ROBIN PACZKOWSKI
Defendant: HYATT ZIVA CANCUN, HYATT CORPORATION, ABC COMPANY (1-10) and JOHN DOE (1-10)
Case Number: 3:2020cv10821
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/7/2020. No later than 11/25/2020, the Defendant shall answer or, in lieu of an answer, file a dispositive motion. (mm)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Initial Conference scheduled for October 6, 2020 is hereby RESCHEDULED for October 7, 2020 at 3:00 p.m. The parties are to submit a joint discovery plan to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than September 30, 2020. Kindly, use the same dial-in information as previously provided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER: The Initial Conference scheduled for September 22, 2020 is hereby RESCHEDULED for October 6, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The parties are to submit a joint discovery plan to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than September 30, 2020. Kindly, use the same dial-in information as previously provided. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Andrew S. Turkish, Esq.. (TURKISH, ANDREW)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2020 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 08/19/2020. (jdb)
August 19, 2020 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr )
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HYATT CORPORATION, HYATT ZIVA CANCUN. (TURKISH, ANDREW)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HYATT ZIVA CANCUN, HYATT CORPORATION from Superior Court of New Jersey, Ocean County, case number OCN-L-1452-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11231325), filed by HYATT ZIVA CANCUN, HYATT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(TURKISH, ANDREW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PACZKOWSKI v. HYATT CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBIN PACZKOWSKI
Represented By: KEVIN M. STANKOWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYATT ZIVA CANCUN
Represented By: ANDREW S. TURKISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HYATT CORPORATION
Represented By: ANDREW S. TURKISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANY (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?