DROGUERIA BETANCES v. PFIZER, INC. et al
Plaintiff: DROGUERIA BETANCES
Defendant: RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, PFIZER, INC., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY, PFIZER MANUFACTURING IRELAND, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. and RANBAXY, INC.
In Re: LIPITOR ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2020cv10824
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 16 Letter confirming that the Materials served to Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals has been completed from Kimberley Hennings. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Envelope)(jmh)
September 18, 2020 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PFIZER MANUFACTURING IRELAND, PFIZER, INC., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY. (WALSH, LIZA)
September 18, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by PFIZER MANUFACTURING IRELAND, PFIZER, INC., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY.(WALSH, LIZA)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service sent via Federal Express to Pfizer Ireland Pharmaceuticals. (jmh)
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Service sent via Federal Express to Pfizer Manufacturing Ireland. (jmh)
September 9, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Warner-Lambert Company. c/o The Corporation Trust Company, Sean O'Hara, Authorized Agent on 8/28/2020, filed by DROGUERIA BETANCES. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Pfizer, Inc. c/o The Corporation Trust Company, Sean O'Hara, Authorized Agent on 8/28/2020, filed by DROGUERIA BETANCES. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
September 8, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID F. SORENSEN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdb)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David F. Sorensen to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
September 3, 2020 Member Case Direct File on 8/19/2020, for MDL 2332 Party LIPITOR ANTITRUST LITIGATION added. (mg)
September 2, 2020 Pro Hac Vice fee as to David F. Sorensen: $ 150, receipt number TRE113725 (mg)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DROGUERIA BETANCES. RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED waiver sent on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DROGUERIA BETANCES. RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. waiver sent on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DROGUERIA BETANCES. RANBAXY, INC. waiver sent on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David F. Sorensen, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/26/2020. (jmh)
August 25, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice DAVID F. SORENSEN. Motion set for 9/21/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice DAVID F. SORENSEN by DROGUERIA BETANCES. (Attachments: #1 Certification David F. Sorensen, #2 Certification Peter S. Pearlman, #3 Statement Statement, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(PEARLMAN, PETER)
August 21, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Member Case Direct File filed by the Clerk's office on 8/21/2020 was docketed in error. Please disregard. (mg)
August 21, 2020 Member Case Direct File on 8/19/2020, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (mg)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DROGUERIA BETANCES. (PEARLMAN, PETER)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to PFIZER MANUFACTURING IRELAND, PFIZER, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY, INC., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
August 19, 2020 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PFIZER MANUFACTURING IRELAND, PFIZER, INC., RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED, RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., RANBAXY, INC., WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11231402) with JURY DEMAND, filed by DROGUERIA BETANCES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certification 11.2 Certification, #4 Certification 201.1 Certification)(PEARLMAN, PETER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DROGUERIA BETANCES v. PFIZER, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANBAXY LABORATORIES LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER, INC.
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER MANUFACTURING IRELAND
Represented By: LIZA M. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANBAXY PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANBAXY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DROGUERIA BETANCES
Represented By: PETER S. PEARLMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: LIPITOR ANTITRUST LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?