MEJIAS et al v. GOYA FOODS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JERRY FULLER, ANIBAL MEJIAS, DENNIS MINTER and JOSE PENA
Defendant: PETER UNANUE, REBECCA RODRIGUEZ, CARLOS ORTIZ, JOSEPH PEREZ, FRANCISCO UNANUE, MICHAEL LUGO, ROBERT UNANUE, CONRAD COLON, GOYA FOODS, INC., DAVID KINKELA, CARLOS G. ORITZ, FRANCISCO R. UNANUE, JOHN DOES 1-10, MIGUEL A. LUGO, JR., ROBERT I. UNANUE and ABC COMPANIES 1-10
Case Number: 3:2020cv12365
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, KEVIN HISHTA and MARGARET SANTEN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdb)
October 29, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Margaret Santen, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11578166.) (WARDEN, RYAN)
October 29, 2020 Filing 25 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kevin P. Hishta, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11578141.) (WARDEN, RYAN)
October 28, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel (ECF Nos. #20 , #21 ) submitted by Ryan Warden on 10/28/2020 cannot be processed until pro hac counsel has been admitted and the application fee paid. Please review the Electronic Notification for Pro Hac Vice instructions on our website. Counsel is advised to resubmit the Request for Electronic Notification of Pro Hac Vice Counsel once payment has been recorded. This message is for informational purposes only. (jdb)
October 28, 2020 Filing 24 Certificate of Good Standing of PRO HAC Margaret Santen, Esq.. (WARDEN, RYAN)
October 28, 2020 Filing 23 Certificate of Good Standing of PRO HAC Kevin P. Hishta, Esq.. (WARDEN, RYAN)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiff's request to stay the briefing on Defendants' MJOP until the Court reviews and rules upon Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/28/2020. (jmh)
October 28, 2020 Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Margaret Santen, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WARDEN, RYAN)
October 28, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kevin P. Hishta, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (WARDEN, RYAN)
October 27, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #18 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Remand this Matter to the Superior Court of New Jersey. Motion set for 12/7/2020 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
October 26, 2020 Filing 19 Letter from Alexandra K. Piazza re #18 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Remand this Matter to the Superior Court of New Jersey. (PIAZZA, ALEXANDRA)
October 26, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint and Remand this Matter to the Superior Court of New Jersey by JERRY FULLER, ANIBAL MEJIAS, DENNIS MINTER, JOSE PENA. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A (Proposed Second Amended Class Action Complaint), #3 Exhibit B (Declaration of Alexandra K. Piazza), #4 Text of Proposed Order)(PIAZZA, ALEXANDRA)
October 20, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, SHANON J. CARSON, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdb)
October 20, 2020 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Shanon J. Carson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11529130.) (PIAZZA, ALEXANDRA)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Margaret Santen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/20/2020. (jmh)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Shanon J. Carson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/20/2020. (jmh)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin P. Hishta. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/20/2020. (jmh)
October 13, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion reset for 11/16/2020 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (KOFMAN-DELGADO, YELENA)
October 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by YELENA KOFMAN-DELGADO on behalf of All Plaintiffs (KOFMAN-DELGADO, YELENA)
October 7, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER- The Initial rule 16 conference scheduled for October 27, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni is adjourned with no new date. Parties are to notify the Court upon decision of the pending motion for judgment on the pleadings. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by CONRAD COLON, GOYA FOODS, INC., DAVID KINKELA, MIGUEL A. LUGO, JR, CARLOS G. ORITZ, JOSEPH PEREZ, REBECCA RODRIGUEZ, FRANCISCO R. UNANUE, PETER UNANUE, ROBERT I. UNANUE. Responses due by 10/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Reconsideration, #2 Certification of Ryan T. Warden, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(WARDEN, RYAN)
October 1, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Margaret Santen, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin P. Hishta. Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
October 1, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Margaret Santen by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Margaret Santen, #2 Declaration of Ryan T. Warden, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(WARDEN, RYAN)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kevin P. Hishta by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kevin P. Hishta, #2 Declaration of Ryan T. Warden, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(WARDEN, RYAN)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2020 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 9/25/2020. (jmh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(WARDEN, RYAN)
September 18, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shanon J. Carson. Motion set for 10/19/2020 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shanon J. Carson by JERRY FULLER, ANIBAL MEJIAS, DENNIS MINTER, JOSE PENA. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Shanon J. Carson, #2 Certification of Alexandra K. Piazza, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(PIAZZA, ALEXANDRA)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDRA KOROPEY PIAZZA on behalf of JERRY FULLER, ANIBAL MEJIAS, DENNIS MINTER, JOSE PENA (PIAZZA, ALEXANDRA)
September 10, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by DAVID KINKELA, FRANCISCO R. UNANUE, REBECCA RODRIGUEZ, MIGUEL A. LUGO, JR, ROBERT I. UNANUE, CARLOS G. ORITZ, GOYA FOODS, INC., JOSEPH PEREZ, CONRAD COLON, PETER UNANUE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 9/25/2020. (abr)
September 8, 2020 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants. Attorney RYAN TODD WARDEN for CONRAD COLON,RYAN TODD WARDEN for GOYA FOODS, INC.,RYAN TODD WARDEN for DAVID KINKELA,RYAN TODD WARDEN for MICHAEL LUGO,RYAN TODD WARDEN for CARLOS ORTIZ,RYAN TODD WARDEN for JOSEPH PEREZ,RYAN TODD WARDEN for REBECCA RODRIGUEZ,RYAN TODD WARDEN for FRANCISCO UNANUE,RYAN TODD WARDEN for PETER UNANUE,RYAN TODD WARDEN for ROBERT UNANUE added. (WARDEN, RYAN)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GOYA FOODS, INC.. (WARDEN, RYAN)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GOYA FOODS, INC. from Superior Court of Mercer County, NJ, case number MER-L-1401-19. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11314272), filed by GOYA FOODS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Declaration Declaration of Margaret Santen, #6 Declaration Declaration of Marie Reed, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Marie Reed)(WARDEN, RYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEJIAS et al v. GOYA FOODS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER UNANUE
Represented By: RYAN TODD WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: RYAN TODD WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLOS ORTIZ
Represented By: RYAN TODD WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH PEREZ
Represented By: RYAN TODD WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCISCO UNANUE
Represented By: RYAN TODD WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL LUGO
Represented By: RYAN TODD WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT UNANUE
Represented By: RYAN TODD WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONRAD COLON
Represented By: RYAN TODD WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOYA FOODS, INC.
Represented By: RYAN TODD WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID KINKELA
Represented By: RYAN TODD WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARLOS G. ORITZ
Represented By: RYAN TODD WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCISCO R. UNANUE
Represented By: RYAN TODD WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIGUEL A. LUGO, JR.
Represented By: RYAN TODD WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT I. UNANUE
Represented By: RYAN TODD WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC COMPANIES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERRY FULLER
Represented By: DAVID E. CASSIDY
Represented By: ALEXANDRA KOROPEY PIAZZA
Represented By: YELENA KOFMAN-DELGADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANIBAL MEJIAS
Represented By: DAVID E. CASSIDY
Represented By: ALEXANDRA KOROPEY PIAZZA
Represented By: YELENA KOFMAN-DELGADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS MINTER
Represented By: DAVID E. CASSIDY
Represented By: ALEXANDRA KOROPEY PIAZZA
Represented By: YELENA KOFMAN-DELGADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE PENA
Represented By: DAVID E. CASSIDY
Represented By: ALEXANDRA KOROPEY PIAZZA
Represented By: YELENA KOFMAN-DELGADO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?