REID v. RCN TELECOM SERVICES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN REID
Defendant: RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF ILLINOIS, LLC, PATRIOT MEDIA CONSULTING, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES, LLC, RCN MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, RCN ISP, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF MASSACHUSETTS, LLC, RCN CAPITAL CORP., RCN TELECOM SERVICES (LEHIGH), LLC and RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF NEW YORK, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2020cv12571
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
2 Judge: Brian R Martinotti
3 Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2020 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/05/2020. (jdb)
November 4, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 12/7/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
November 4, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by PATRIOT MEDIA CONSULTING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SELLINGER, PHILIP)
November 4, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by RCN TELECOM SERVICES (LEHIGH), LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES, LLC.(SELLINGER, PHILIP)
November 3, 2020 Filing 17 Certification of Daniel M. Hattis, Esq on behalf of CHRISTIAN REID Re #14 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear. (DENITTIS, STEPHEN)
November 2, 2020 Pro Hac Vice counsel, DANIEL M. HATTIS, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mg)
November 2, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel M. Hattis, Esquire to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11596305.) (DENITTIS, STEPHEN)
October 21, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against PATRIOT MEDIA CONSULTING, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES (LEHIGH), LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES, LLC, filed by CHRISTIAN REID.(DENITTIS, STEPHEN)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel M. Hattis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/20/2020. (mg)
October 9, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
October 9, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by CHRISTIAN REID. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief, #2 Certification Cert of DeNittis, #3 Certification Cert of Hattis, #4 Proposed Order)(DENITTIS, STEPHEN)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: The Initial rule 16 conference scheduled for October 13, 2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert is adjourned with no new date. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/15/2020. (eh, )
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: Granting request of all Defendants for an extension of time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 10/21/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni.(mm)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni for all further proceedings. Judge Brian R. Martinotti, Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/15/2020. (jjc, )
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from David E. Sellinger. (SELLINGER, DAVID)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from David E. Sellinger. (SELLINGER, DAVID)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID E. SELLINGER on behalf of PATRIOT MEDIA CONSULTING, LLC, RCN CAPITAL CORP., RCN ISP, LLC, RCN MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, RCN TELECOM SERVICES (LEHIGH), LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF ILLINOIS, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF MASSACHUSETTS, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF NEW YORK, L.P., RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES, LLC (SELLINGER, DAVID)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by TODD LAWRENCE SCHLEIFSTEIN on behalf of PATRIOT MEDIA CONSULTING, LLC, RCN CAPITAL CORP., RCN ISP, LLC, RCN MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, RCN TELECOM SERVICES (LEHIGH), LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF ILLINOIS, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF MASSACHUSETTS, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF NEW YORK, L.P., RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES, LLC (SCHLEIFSTEIN, TODD)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by PHILIP R. SELLINGER on behalf of PATRIOT MEDIA CONSULTING, LLC, RCN CAPITAL CORP., RCN ISP, LLC, RCN MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, RCN TELECOM SERVICES (LEHIGH), LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF ILLINOIS, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF MASSACHUSETTS, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF NEW YORK, L.P., RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES, LLC (SELLINGER, PHILIP)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Ordered Initial Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 10:30 AM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/11/2020. (eh, )
September 11, 2020 Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr, )
September 11, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 3 Certification of Service on behalf of PATRIOT MEDIA CONSULTING, LLC, RCN CAPITAL CORP., RCN ISP, LLC, RCN MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, RCN TELECOM SERVICES (LEHIGH), LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF ILLINOIS, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF MASSACHUSETTS, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF NEW YORK, L.P., RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES, LLC Re #1 Notice of Removal,,,. (SELLINGER, PHILIP)
September 11, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PATRIOT MEDIA CONSULTING, LLC, RCN CAPITAL CORP., RCN ISP, LLC, RCN MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, RCN TELECOM SERVICES (LEHIGH), LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF ILLINOIS, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF MASSACHUSETTS, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF NEW YORK, L.P., RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES, LLC. (SELLINGER, PHILIP)
September 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by RCN TELECOM SERVICES (LEHIGH), LLC, RCN ISP, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF NEW YORK, L.P., RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF ILLINOIS, LLC, PATRIOT MEDIA CONSULTING, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES, LLC, RCN MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF MASSACHUSETTS, LLC, RCN CAPITAL CORP. from Mercer County Superior Court, case number MER-L-1432-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11343121), filed by RCN TELECOM SERVICES (LEHIGH), LLC, RCN ISP, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF NEW YORK, L.P., RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF ILLINOIS, LLC, PATRIOT MEDIA CONSULTING, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC, RCN TELECOM SERVICES, LLC, RCN MANAGEMENT CORPORATION, RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF MASSACHUSETTS, LLC, RCN CAPITAL CORP.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(SELLINGER, PHILIP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REID v. RCN TELECOM SERVICES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF ILLINOIS, LLC
Represented By: PHILIP R. SELLINGER
Represented By: DAVID E. SELLINGER
Represented By: TODD LAWRENCE SCHLEIFSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRIOT MEDIA CONSULTING, LLC
Represented By: PHILIP R. SELLINGER
Represented By: DAVID E. SELLINGER
Represented By: TODD LAWRENCE SCHLEIFSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCN TELECOM SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: PHILIP R. SELLINGER
Represented By: DAVID E. SELLINGER
Represented By: TODD LAWRENCE SCHLEIFSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCN MANAGEMENT CORPORATION
Represented By: PHILIP R. SELLINGER
Represented By: DAVID E. SELLINGER
Represented By: TODD LAWRENCE SCHLEIFSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCN ISP, LLC
Represented By: PHILIP R. SELLINGER
Represented By: DAVID E. SELLINGER
Represented By: TODD LAWRENCE SCHLEIFSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF PHILADELPHIA, LLC
Represented By: PHILIP R. SELLINGER
Represented By: DAVID E. SELLINGER
Represented By: TODD LAWRENCE SCHLEIFSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF MASSACHUSETTS, LLC
Represented By: PHILIP R. SELLINGER
Represented By: DAVID E. SELLINGER
Represented By: TODD LAWRENCE SCHLEIFSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCN CAPITAL CORP.
Represented By: PHILIP R. SELLINGER
Represented By: DAVID E. SELLINGER
Represented By: TODD LAWRENCE SCHLEIFSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCN TELECOM SERVICES (LEHIGH), LLC
Represented By: PHILIP R. SELLINGER
Represented By: DAVID E. SELLINGER
Represented By: TODD LAWRENCE SCHLEIFSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCN TELECOM SERVICES OF NEW YORK, L.P.
Represented By: PHILIP R. SELLINGER
Represented By: DAVID E. SELLINGER
Represented By: TODD LAWRENCE SCHLEIFSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTIAN REID
Represented By: STEPHEN PATRICK DENITTIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?