AMERICAN CENTER FOR CIVIL JUSTICE, INC. v. ENGELBERG
Appellee: MICHAEL ENGELBERG
Appellant: AMERICAN CENTER FOR CIVIL JUSTICE, INC.
Case Number: 3:2020cv12843
Filed: September 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #5 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellee's Counter Designation of Record and Counter Statement of Issues on Appeal. Motion set for 12/7/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER that Appellee's counter Designation of Record on Appeal and counter Statement of Issues on Appeal are due by 12/12/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 11/04/2020. (jdb)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellee's Counter Designation of Record and Counter Statement of Issues on Appeal by AMERICAN CENTER FOR CIVIL JUSTICE, INC.. (NEUMANN, TIMOTHY)
October 14, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellee's Counter Designation of Record and Counter Statement of Issues. Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 LETTER ORDER granting Appellant's request for an extension of time for filing the Appellees' counter Designation of Record on Appeal. Appellee's counter Designation of Record on Appeal and counter Statement of Issues on Appeal are due by 11/12/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 10/09/2020. (jdb)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Appellee's Counter Designation of Record and Counter Statement of Issues by AMERICAN CENTER FOR CIVIL JUSTICE, INC.. (NEUMANN, TIMOTHY)
September 29, 2020 Set Hearings: Bankruptcy Appeal set for 1/19/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. The appeal will be decided on the papers. No appearance is required unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (jdb)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by AMERICAN CENTER FOR CIVIL JUSTICE, INC. re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Parties wishing to review the actual documents listed on the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s docket sheet should refer to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court`s records. At the direction of this Court, counsel for the appellant must furnish paper copies of these documents directly to the Chambers of the Honorable Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson, U.S. District Judge. These courtesy copies should be clearly marked as `Courtesy Copies` and should contain the U.S. District Court civil docket number. Pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 8018 (a), unless otherwise ordered, the appellant must serve and file a brief within 30 days after the docketing of the notice that the record has been transmitted or is available electronically; the appellee must serve and file a brief within 30 days of service of the appellant`s brief; the appellant may serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the appellee`s brief. Appellant Brief due by 10/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal)(jdb)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-15691(CMG), filed by AMERICAN CENTER FOR CIVIL JUSTICE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Order Being Appealed, #2 Transmittal, # 3 Transcript, #4 Certificate of Service)Transcript has been received and submitted to Chambers.(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN CENTER FOR CIVIL JUSTICE, INC. v. ENGELBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MICHAEL ENGELBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: AMERICAN CENTER FOR CIVIL JUSTICE, INC.
Represented By: TIMOTHY P. NEUMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?