SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION et al v. UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff: NEC ORANGE EMERGENCY : CENTER, LP, NEC HARLINGEN EMERGENCY CENTER, LP, NEC BEAUMONT EMERGENCY CENTER, LP, NEC MCALLEN : EMERGENCY CENTER, LP, NEC PORT ARTHUR EMERGENCY ENTER LP, NEC LUBBOCK EMERGENCY CENTER, LP, NC BROWNSVILLE EMERGENCY : CENTER, LP and SM HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Defendant: KEMPER HEALTH, A DIVISION OF RESERVE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, WEBTPA, AN AMWINS GROUP COMPANY, CLAIMS MANAGEMENT INC., THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY, THE LOOMS COMPANY, SUPERIOR HEALTHPLAN, SPECIAL INSURANCE SERVICES, INC, UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC., TASB RISK MANAGEMENT FUND, USABLE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, QUANTUM ALLIANCE, THE HEALTH PLAN; UNUM GROUP, PHCS SAVILITV, A DIVISION OF MULTIPLAN, INC, TEXAS CHILDRENS HEALTH PLAN, WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY, REGIONAL INSURANCE SERVICES COMPANY, LLC, NATIVE HEALTH CARE, SHEET METAL WORKERS INT. ASSOCIATION, SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, LYNDON SOUTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY, OLYMPUS MANAGED HEALTH CARE doing business as GLOBAL EXCEL, SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC and PHCS SAVILITY
Case Number: 3:2020cv13685
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446. Motion set for 1/4/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CONSENT ORDER extending time to respond to the #19 Motion to Remand; Opposition is due 12/21/2020; Reply brief due 12/28/2020; and the motion day is 01/04/2021. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/24/2020. (jmh)
November 23, 2020 Filing 25 Letter from Francis X. Manning re #19 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MANNING, FRANCIS)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant, WEBTPA, AN AMWINS GROUP COMPANY. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/19/2020. (jmh)
November 5, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Defendant, WebTPA, an Amwins Group Company by SM HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
November 2, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446. Motion reset for 12/21/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
November 2, 2020 Filing 22 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #19 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446 . (MANNING, FRANCIS)
October 30, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED DOCUMENT by SM HOLDINGS CORPORATION. Amendment to #20 Amended Document, #19 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446 . (MITNICK, STEVEN)
October 30, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED DOCUMENT by SM HOLDINGS CORPORATION. Amendment to #19 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446 . (MITNICK, STEVEN)
October 30, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #19 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446. Motion set for 12/7/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
October 29, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1446 by SM HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(MITNICK, STEVEN)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant, Unum Group. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/28/2020. (jmh)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice as to defendant, Kemper Health, a Division of Reserve National Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/28/2020. (jmh)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant, Claims Management Inc. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/28/2020. (jmh)
October 27, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant, Claims Management, Inc., only by SM HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
October 27, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice as to Defendant, Unum Group, only by SM HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
October 27, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant, Kemper Health, a Division of Reserve National Insurance Company, only by SM HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CONSENT ORDER that the date by which United must answer, plead, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including 30 days from the date of this Order. All discovery deadlines and other requirements established by the 10/1/2020 Scheduling Order and Court rules for all parties are stayed pending the ruling on the Motion to Remand and the 11/4/2020 Scheduling Conference is adjourned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/15/2020. (jmh)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant, THE HEALTH PLAN, UNUM GROUP. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/09/2020.(jem)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant, PHCS SAVILITY, A DIVISION OF MULTIPLAN, INC. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/09/2020. (jem) Modified on 10/20/2020 (eaj, ).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice as to Defendant, WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/09/2020. (jem)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant, PHCS Savility, A Division of Multiplan, Inc., only by SM HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant, Windhaven Insurance Company, only by SM HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant, The Health Plan, only by SM HOLDINGS CORPORATION. (MITNICK, STEVEN)
October 5, 2020 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/22/2020. (jdb)
October 5, 2020 Filing 5 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to United Healthcare Services, Inc... (MANNING, FRANCIS)
October 5, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #4 Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer filed by Francis Manning on 10/05/2020 was submitted incorrectly as an Application. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order USING Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jdb, )
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Reply for by UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2020 at 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 10/1/2020. (jmh)
October 1, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (abr, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, (Exhibit B) by UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. (MANNING, FRANCIS)
October 1, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: When entering parties make sure to add ALL plaintiffs and defendants as listed on the caption of the state court complaint . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF NJ HUNTERDON COUNTY, case number HNT-000282-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11437295), filed by UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A)(MANNING, FRANCIS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SM MEDICAL HOLDINGS CORPORATION et al v. UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEMPER HEALTH, A DIVISION OF RESERVE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEBTPA, AN AMWINS GROUP COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAIMS MANAGEMENT INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TRAVELERS INDEMNITY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LOOMS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUPERIOR HEALTHPLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPECIAL INSURANCE SERVICES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: FRANCIS X. MANNING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TASB RISK MANAGEMENT FUND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USABLE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUANTUM ALLIANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HEALTH PLAN; UNUM GROUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHCS SAVILITV, A DIVISION OF MULTIPLAN, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEXAS CHILDRENS HEALTH PLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINDHAVEN INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGIONAL INSURANCE SERVICES COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIVE HEALTH CARE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHEET METAL WORKERS INT. ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYMETRA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYNDON SOUTHERN INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLYMPUS MANAGED HEALTH CARE doing business as GLOBAL EXCEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHCS SAVILITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEC ORANGE EMERGENCY : CENTER, LP
Represented By: STEVEN J. MITNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEC HARLINGEN EMERGENCY CENTER, LP
Represented By: STEVEN J. MITNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEC BEAUMONT EMERGENCY CENTER, LP
Represented By: STEVEN J. MITNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEC MCALLEN : EMERGENCY CENTER, LP
Represented By: STEVEN J. MITNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEC PORT ARTHUR EMERGENCY ENTER LP
Represented By: STEVEN J. MITNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEC LUBBOCK EMERGENCY CENTER, LP
Represented By: STEVEN J. MITNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NC BROWNSVILLE EMERGENCY : CENTER, LP
Represented By: STEVEN J. MITNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SM HOLDINGS CORPORATION
Represented By: STEVEN J. MITNICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?