JAMAR DEVELOPMENT LLC v. MODERATE INCOME MANAGEMENT COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: JAMAR DEVELOPMENT LLC
Defendant: MODERATE INCOME MANAGEMENT COMPANY, CHRIS RZECZKOWSKI and KINGSBURY CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2020cv14358
Filed: October 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by KINGSBURY CORPORATION, MODERATE INCOME MANAGEMENT COMPANY re #19 First MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim (Attachments: #1 Certification of Plaintiff from NJ court)(GREENBERG, ADAM)
December 7, 2020 Filing 24 BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Plaintiffs re #19 First MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jan Smiarowski, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(FAUSTO, NICHOLAS)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/24/2020. (mg)
November 23, 2020 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #22 Stipulation to extend time for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Nicholas Fausto on 11/23/2020 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference, when using the event motion, you must file a Notice of Motion along with the other documents required by the rules of this Court. The Clerks office has terminated the calendar event created by this filing and will forward this request to chambers. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jem)
November 23, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 First MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by All Plaintiffs. (FAUSTO, NICHOLAS)
November 9, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #19 First MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim. Motion reset for 12/7/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
November 9, 2020 Filing 21 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by JAMAR DEVELOPMENT LLC re #19 First MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim (FAUSTO, NICHOLAS)
November 9, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS M. FAUSTO on behalf of All Plaintiffs (FAUSTO, NICHOLAS)
October 22, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #19 First MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim. Motion set for 11/16/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 19 First MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by KINGSBURY CORPORATION, MODERATE INCOME MANAGEMENT COMPANY. Responses due by 11/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support, #2 Exhibit A State court complaint, #3 Exhibit B state court motion, #4 Exhibit C state court order, #5 Exhibit D state court order, #6 Exhibit E Transcript, #7 Exhibit F PA complaint, #8 Exhibit G EDPA transfer order, #9 Certificate of Service, #10 Brief, #11 Text of Proposed Order)(GREENBERG, ADAM)
October 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM D. GREENBERG on behalf of KINGSBURY CORPORATION, MODERATE INCOME MANAGEMENT COMPANY (GREENBERG, ADAM)
October 14, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (mg)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-03783. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (sg, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE TO THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY IS GRANTED. THIS ACTION SHALL BE TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THE CASE FILE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY AND CLOSE THIS MATTER FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/11/20. 9/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/11/20. 9/14/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Transfer Venue to District of New Jersey filed by KINGSBURY CORPORATION, MODERATE INCOME MANAGEMENT COMPANY. (SHAPIRO, STEPHEN) Modified on 9/14/2020 (tjd).
September 10, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by KINGSBURY CORPORATION, MODERATE INCOME MANAGEMENT COMPANY. (SHAPIRO, STEPHEN)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Transfer Venue to District of New Jersey filed by JAMAR DEVELOPMENT LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(FAUSTO, NICHOLAS)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JAMAR DEVELOPMENT LLC. (FAUSTO, NICHOLAS)
September 2, 2020 PAPER #9 MAILED TO THE UNREP (JL )
September 1, 2020 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by JAMAR DEVELOPMENT LLC. **(REFILED USING CORRECT EVENT, SEE DOCUMENT #7 FOR ORIGINAL FILING AND PDF)**(tjd)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED UNTIL 9/8/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 9/1/20. 9/1/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREP.(fdc)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by JAMAR DEVELOPMENT LLC.**(FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY, COPY FORWARDED TO JUDGE FOR APPROVAL)**.(FAUSTO, NICHOLAS) Modified on 9/1/2020 (tjd).
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by JAMAR DEVELOPMENT LLC DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (FAUSTO, NICHOLAS)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by NICHOLAS M. FAUSTO on behalf of JAMAR DEVELOPMENT LLC with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(FAUSTO, NICHOLAS)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by KINGSBURY CORPORATION, MODERATE INCOME MANAGEMENT COMPANY. Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Jamar v. MIMC et al., #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jonathan Gershen, #3 Exhibit B - Order Dismissing NJ Complaint)(EBOSE, OSAZENORIUWA) Modified on 8/11/2020 (tjd).
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDERED THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE LINDA K. CARACAPPA. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/6/20. 8/6/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including THE GERSHEN GROUP, LLC by MODERATE INCOME MANAGEMENT COMPANY.(SHAPIRO, STEPHEN)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by KINGSBURY CORPORATION.(SHAPIRO, STEPHEN)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by KINGSBURY CORPORATION, MODERATE INCOME MANAGEMENT COMPANY , Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia, case number 200601148, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14469265), filed by KINGSBURY CORPORATION, MODERATE INCOME MANAGEMENT COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Consent to Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Designation Form, #6 Case Management Track Form)(SHAPIRO, STEPHEN) Modified on 8/5/2020 (tjd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAMAR DEVELOPMENT LLC v. MODERATE INCOME MANAGEMENT COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MODERATE INCOME MANAGEMENT COMPANY
Represented By: ADAM D. GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS RZECZKOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KINGSBURY CORPORATION
Represented By: ADAM D. GREENBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMAR DEVELOPMENT LLC
Represented By: NICHOLAS M. FAUSTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?