ZLOTKY v. THE TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY et al
Plaintiff: REID ZLOTKY
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, THE TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY doing business as PRINCETON UNIVERSITY and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 3:2020cv16622
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/04/2020. (jdb)
December 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by REID ZLOTKY (KOCHER, CHARLES)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
November 19, 2020 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1 through 10, THE TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11687536) with JURY DEMAND, filed by REID ZLOTKY.(KOCHER, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ZLOTKY v. THE TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TRUSTEES OF PRINCETON UNIVERSITY doing business as PRINCETON UNIVERSITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REID ZLOTKY
Represented By: CHARLES JOSEPH KOCHER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?