KLICK et al v. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD. et al
Plaintiff: JULIE KLICK and PAUL KLICK
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., CHATTEM, INC., THE BOEING COMPANY, ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD., THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY, JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50, PNEUMO ABEX, LLC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON, PRATT & WHITNEY POWER SYSTEMS, INC., CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION INDIVIDUALLY AND doing business as AMERICAN TALC COMPANY doing business as METROPOLITAN TALC COMPANY doing business as METROPOLITAN TALC CO., INC. doing business as CHARLES MATHIEU, INC., THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO., GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC, IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. and ALLIED SIGNAL, INC.
Cross Defendant: CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2020cv16654
Filed: November 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by PENELOPE M. TAYLOR on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (TAYLOR, PENELOPE)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by PENELOPE M. TAYLOR on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON (TAYLOR, PENELOPE)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. GARDE on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (GARDE, JOHN)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN C. GARDE on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON (GARDE, JOHN)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's request to adjourn the #28 Motion to Dismiss return date to 3/1/2021. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/8/2021. (jmh)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Letter from Syed K. (Zim) Rizvi, Esq. Requesting Adjournment of re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (RIZVI, SYED)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 3/1/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDRA CARUSO on behalf of METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CARUSO, ALEXANDRA)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(BOYLE, ERIN)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's request to adjourn the #28 Motion to Dismiss return date to 2/1/2021 Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/22/2020. (jmh)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's request to adjourning the #28 Motion to Dismiss return date to 2/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/22/2020. (jmh)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 2/1/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 1/19/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by PNEUMO ABEX, LLC. Responses due by 1/5/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Brief, #3 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit Initial Fact Sheet, #5 Exhibit Affidavit of Indelicato, #6 Exhibit Decision in Travelers Cas. & Sur. Co. v. Skrabonja, #7 Exhibit Decision in Jacobs v. Syndicat De. Corproprietaires Chateau Beauvallon, #8 Exhibit Transcript of Motion Hearing in Bell, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Certificate of Service)(VIOLA, ROY)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Letter from Syed K. (Zim) Rizvi, Esq. re #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (RIZVI, SYED)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification in Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Service Certification of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint)(BOYLE, ERIN)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #35 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Motion set for 1/19/2021 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb, )
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE in Support filed by THE BOEING COMPANY re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. AA = Declaration of N. Leatherman in Kruse, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(O'MALLEY, AUSTIN)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. identifying MetLife, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PICINI, RICHARD)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B pt 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B pt 2, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B pt 3, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B pt 4, #7 Exhibit Exhibit B pt 5, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B pt 6, #9 Exhibit Exhibit B pt 7, #10 Exhibit Exhibit B pt 8, #11 Exhibit Exhibit B pt 9, #12 Exhibit Exhibit B pt 10, #13 Exhibit Exhibit B pt 11, #14 Exhibit Exhibit B pt 12, #15 Exhibit Exhibit B pt 13, #16 Exhibit Exhibit B pt 14, #17 Exhibit Exhibit C, #18 Exhibit Exhibit D, #19 Exhibit Exhibit E, #20 Exhibit Exhibit F, #21 Exhibit Exhibit G, #22 Exhibit Exhibit H, #23 Exhibit Exhibit I, #24 Exhibit Exhibit J, #25 Exhibit Exhibit K, #26 Exhibit Exhibit L, #27 Exhibit Exhibit M, #28 Exhibit Exhibit N, #29 Exhibit Exhibit O, #30 Exhibit Exhibit P, #31 Exhibit Exhibit Q)(GOLDSTEIN, SEBASTIAN)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI on behalf of METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(PICINI, RICHARD)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.'s ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO..(PICINI, RICHARD)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GRIFFITH, SCOTT)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 1/4/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC. Responses due by 12/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memoradum of Law, #2 Exhibit A- Plainiff's Summons and Complaint (redacted), #3 Exhibit B- Notice of Removal (Redacted), #4 Exhibit C- Affidavit of Justin Huang, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(RIZVI, SYED)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT DORRANCE BROWN, JR on behalf of CHATTEM, INC. (BROWN, ROBERT)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CHATTEM, INC. identifying Aventis Pharma S.A. Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (BROWN, ROBERT)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Chattem, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by CHATTEM, INC..(BROWN, ROBERT)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT GRIFFITH on behalf of HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(GRIFFITH, SCOTT)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D)(BOYLE, ERIN)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Exhibit to #20 Response to Motion, by All Plaintiffs. (BOYLE, ERIN)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Certification on behalf of All Plaintiffs Re #20 Response to Motion,. (BOYLE, ERIN)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Personal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J)(BOYLE, ERIN)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY identifying goodrich corporation as Corporate Parent.. (DEZII, DAWN)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY identifying goodrich corporation as Corporate Parent.. (DEZII, DAWN)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by SYED KAZIM RIZVI on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC (RIZVI, SYED)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 LETTER ORDER granting Glaxosmithkline LLC's request for a 14 day extension of time until 12/10/2020 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/3/2020. (jmh)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT ANTHONY SCHAEFER, JR on behalf of GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC (SCHAEFER, ROBERT)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Letter from Syed K. (Zim) Rizvi. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Defendant GlaxoSmithKline, LLC's Time to Answer the Complaint)(SCHAEFER, ROBERT)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY. (CAMP, TERENCE)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI for METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. added. (PICINI, RICHARD)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #12 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/14/2020. (jdb)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by CHATTEM, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/10/2020. (jdb)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Chattem, Inc.. Attorney ROBERT DORRANCE BROWN, JR for CHATTEM, INC. added. (BROWN, ROBERT)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION identifying Cyprus Amax Minerals Company as Corporate Parent.. (GOLDSTEIN, SEBASTIAN)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION. Responses due by 12/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C)(GOLDSTEIN, SEBASTIAN)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. identifying Colfax Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH IRA FONTAK on behalf of IMO INDUSTRIES, INC. (FONTAK, JOSEPH)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by TERENCE W. CAMP on behalf of THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY (CAMP, TERENCE)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 12/21/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE BOEING COMPANY. (O'MALLEY, AUSTIN)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by THE BOEING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of ADO in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex. A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. B - Initial Fact Sheet, #4 Exhibit Ex. C - Declaration of KC in Support, #5 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support)(O'MALLEY, AUSTIN)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Clerk's Letter: Attorney CODY M. GREENS is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address: 220 Lake Drice East, Suite 210, Cherry Hill, NJ 08002. (mg)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 12/21/2020 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet by THE BOEING COMPANY. (O'MALLEY, AUSTIN)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by THE BOEING COMPANY from New Jersey Superior Court, Middlesex County, case number MID-L-007305-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11688545), filed by THE BOEING COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Index Ex. A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Initial Fact Sheet, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Notice to State Court of Removal to Federal Court)(O'MALLEY, AUSTIN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLICK et al v. ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: SCOTT F. GRIFFITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHATTEM, INC.
Represented By: ROBERT DORRANCE BROWN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY
Represented By: AUSTIN DAVID O'MALLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASBESTOS CORPORATION LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY
Represented By: TERENCE W. CAMP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE CORPORATIONS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX, LLC
Represented By: ROY VIOLA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON
Represented By: PENELOPE M. TAYLOR
Represented By: JOHN C. GARDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRATT & WHITNEY POWER SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION INDIVIDUALLY AND doing business as AMERICAN TALC COMPANY doing business as METROPOLITAN TALC COMPANY doing business as METROPOLITAN TALC CO., INC. doing business as CHARLES MATHIEU, INC.
Represented By: SEBASTIAN A. GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE B.F. GOODRICH COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Represented By: PENELOPE M. TAYLOR
Represented By: JOHN C. GARDE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: RICHARD DOMINICK PICINI
Represented By: ALEXANDRA CARUSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLAXOSMITHKLINE, LLC
Represented By: ROBERT ANTHONY SCHAEFER, JR.
Represented By: SYED KAZIM RIZVI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: JOSEPH IRA FONTAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED SIGNAL, INC.
Represented By: SCOTT F. GRIFFITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIE KLICK
Represented By: ERIN M BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL KLICK
Represented By: ERIN M BOYLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: CYPRUS MINES CORPORATION
Represented By: SEBASTIAN A. GOLDSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?