AFFILIATED ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PA v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: AFFILIATED ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PA
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2020cv18518
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AFFILIATED ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PA. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY served on 12/10/2020, answer due 12/31/2020. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
December 8, 2020 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
December 8, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AFFILIATED ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PA identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11784207), filed by AFFILIATED ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(GOTTLIEB, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AFFILIATED ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PA v. UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED HEALTHCARE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AFFILIATED ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, PA
Represented By: MICHAEL GOTTLIEB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?