AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. v. SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. et al
Plaintiff: AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE and SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Case Number: 3:2020cv19805
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Georgette Castner
2 Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 TEXT ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer in a good faith effort to resolve the issues discussed with the Court during the conference on 6/9/22 and to submit a joint status report to the Court by 6/16/22. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/9/2022. (eh, )
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Bhanu K. Sadasivan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/8/2022. (jdg)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 6/9/2022. (eh, )
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Letter from Aurinia Pharmaceuticals Inc. to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert re #96 Letter,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Aurinia's Letter to Judge Arpert, #2 Exhibit 2 to Aurinia's Letter to Judge Arpert, #3 Exhibit 3 to Aurinia's Letter to Judge Arpert, #4 Exhibit 4 to Aurinia's Letter to Judge Arpert)(GROSSBERG, LESLEY)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Letter from Aurinia Pharmaceuticals Inc. to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert re #94 Letter. (GROSSBERG, LESLEY)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Letter from Sun to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(MILLER, GREGORY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 TEXT ORDER A telephone status conference has been set before Magistrate Judge Douglas Arpert on June 9, 2022 at 2:00pm. Counsel for Plaintiff is to initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 06/03/2022. (JB)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Letter from Sun to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re #90 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(MILLER, GREGORY)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #93 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bhanu K. Sadasivan. Motion set for 7/5/2022 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bhanu K. Sadasivan by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification of Carlos F. Ortiz, #3 Certification of Bhanu K. Sadasivan)(ORTIZ, CARLOS)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. re #78 MOTION to Amend/Correct #23 Answer to Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, GREGORY)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Jeremy T. Saks: $ 150, receipt number TRE126753 (jdg)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION to Seal by SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu of Brief, #2 Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #4 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, GREGORY)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Letter from Aurinia Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Letter to Judge Arpert, #2 Exhibit 2 to Letter to Judge Arpert, #3 Exhibit 3 to Letter to Judge Arpert)(GROSSBERG, LESLEY)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 BRIEF in Opposition filed by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #78 MOTION to Amend/Correct #23 Answer to Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William G. Gaede, III, #2 Exhibit 1 to Gaede Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Gaede Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Gaede Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Gaede Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 (part 1) to Gaede Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 (part 2) to Gaede Declaration, #8 Exhibit 5 (part 3) to Gaede Declaration, #9 Exhibit 6 to Gaede Declaration, #10 Exhibit 7 to Gaede Declaration, #11 Exhibit 8 to Gaede Declaration)(ORTIZ, CARLOS)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Jeremy T. Saks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/19/2022. (jal, ) Modified on 5/23/2022 (jmh).
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 APPLICATION/PETITION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jeremy T. Saks for by SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #2 Declaration of Jeremy T. Saks, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, GREGORY)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct oral argument as to #47 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions filed by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC., and #78 MOTION to Amend/Correct #23 Answer to Amended Complaint filed by SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. on 6/14/2022 at 11:00 AM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. The parties will be provided dial-in information in advance of hearing. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/16/2022. (eh, )
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #80 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Meng Xu, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/13/2022. (jal, )
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying #48 Motion to Seal Document #48 MOTION to Seal Document #47 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions (Exhibit 1 to Gaede Declaration) The renewed motion to seal is to be filed within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/13/2022. (jal, )
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 Letter from Aurinia Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re Response to Sun's 5-11-22 Letter re #79 Letter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(GROSSBERG, LESLEY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #70 Motion to Seal Document #70 MOTION to Seal Document #64 Markman Response Brief,, #52 Markman Opening Brief . Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 5/12/2022. (jal, )
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #80 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Meng Xu, Esq.. Motion set for 6/6/2022 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 80 Consent MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Meng Xu, Esq. by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Carlos F. Ortiz, Esq., #2 Certification of Meng Xu, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order Admitting Meng Xu, Esq., Pro Hac Vice)(ORTIZ, CARLOS)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Georgette Castner: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/11/2022. (Court Reporter, Frank Gable (856-889-4761)) (adi, )
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 79 Letter from Sun to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re #77 Letter. (MILLER, GREGORY)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #78 MOTION to Amend/Correct #23 Answer to Amended Complaint . Motion set for 6/6/2022 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 5/9/2022. (eh, )
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION to Amend/Correct #23 Answer to Amended Complaint by SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #4 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #5 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #6 Exhibit D to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #7 Text of Proposed Order, #8 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, GREGORY)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 77 Letter from Aurinia Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J.. (GROSSBERG, LESLEY)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Letter from Aurinia Pharmaceuticals, Inc. to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re withdrawal of Ralph E. Gaskins. (GROSSBERG, LESLEY)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (GROSSBERG, LESLEY)
April 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 LETTER ORDER granting request for an extension to the deadline to amend pleadings; The deadline is now 5/6/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/29/2022. (jal)
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TEXT ORDER: A telephone Status Conference is set for 5/11/2022 at 03:30 PM before Judge Georgette Castner. Parties are to submit to the Court a joint status report one week prior to the conference.. So Ordered by Judge Georgette Castner on 4/28/2022. (adi, )
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Letter from Sun to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. (MILLER, GREGORY)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Georgette Castner for all further proceedings. Judge Zahid N. Quraishi no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/11/2022. (gxh)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #70 MOTION to Seal Document #64 Markman Response Brief,, #52 Markman Opening Brief,,,, . Motion set for 5/2/2022 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION to Seal Document #64 Markman Response Brief,, #52 Markman Opening Brief,,,, by SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Statement in Lieu Brief, #2 Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #3 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #4 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, GREGORY)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 NOTICE of Appearance by LESLEY MCCALL GROSSBERG on behalf of All Plaintiffs (GROSSBERG, LESLEY)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Letter from Aurinia to the Hon. Zahid N. Quraishi, U.S.D.J. and the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. in response to motion for leave re #66 Letter. (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Letter from the Parties re: Joint Proposed Markman Schedule. (MILLER, GREGORY)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 66 Letter from Sun to the Hon. Zahid N. Quraishi, U.S.D.J. and the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re: motion seeking leave. (MILLER, GREGORY)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MARKMAN RESPONSE BRIEF re #52 Markman Opening Brief,,,, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Julian Eastoe, #2 Declaration of William Gaede, #3 Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit 13)(ORTIZ, CARLOS)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MARKMAN RESPONSE BRIEF re #51 Markman Opening Brief,, (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan E. Morrison, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 11)(MILLER, GREGORY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Change of Address by CARLOS FRANCISCO ORTIZ (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER granting extensions to current deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/14/2022. (mg)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference on 5/9/2022 1at 1:30 AM. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers 609-989-2144. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/14/2022. (eh, )
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/14/2022. (eh, )
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION re #28 Scheduling Order, Stipulation and Consent Order Regarding Claim Construction Deadlines by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Letter from Aurinia Pharmaceuticals, Inc. re #57 Letter,,. (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/8/2022. (mg)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Letter from Sun to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re: Request for Leave to File Sur-Reply re #55 Reply to Response to Motion, #47 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(MILLER, GREGORY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION [Proposed] Stipulation & Order Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #47 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions for U.S. Patent Nos. 10,265,375 and 10,973,871 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Reply Gaede Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(ORTIZ, CARLOS)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Exhibit to #53 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Exhibit Q) by SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.. (MILLER, GREGORY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. re #47 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan E. Morrison, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit R)(MILLER, GREGORY)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MARKMAN OPENING BRIEF (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Susan E. Morrison, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Susan E. Morrison, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Susan E. Morrison, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Declaration of Susan E. Morrison, #5 Exhibit 4 to the Declaration of Susan E. Morrison, #6 Exhibit 5 to the Declaration of Susan E. Morrison, #7 Exhibit 6 to the Declaration of Susan E. Morrison, #8 Declaration of Thorsteinn Loftsson, #9 Exhibit A-D to the Declaration of Thorsteinn Loftsson, #10 Declaration of Gerald Fuller, #11 Exhibit A-S to the Declaration of Gerald Fuller)(MILLER, GREGORY)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MARKMAN OPENING BRIEF Aurinia Pharmaceutical Inc.'s Opening Markman Brief Under L. Pat. R. 4.5 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Julian Eastoe, #2 Exhibit Eastoe Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Eastoe Exhibit B, #4 Declaration William Gaede, III, #5 Exhibit Gaede Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Gaede Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Gaede Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit Gaede Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit Gaede Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit Gaede Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit Gaede Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit Gaede Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit Gaede Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit Gaede Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit Gaede Exhibit 11)(ORTIZ, CARLOS)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #48 MOTION to Seal Document #47 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions (Exhibit 1 to Gaede Declaration), #47 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions. Motion set for 2/7/2022 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb, )
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. re #48 MOTION to Seal Document #47 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions (Exhibit 1 to Gaede Declaration), #49 Exhibit (to Document),, #47 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Exhibit to #48 Motion to Seal Document, #47 Motion to Amend/Correct, [Confidential Exhibit 1 to Declaration of William G. Gaede, III] by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (ORTIZ, CARLOS)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION to Seal Document #47 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions (Exhibit 1 to Gaede Declaration) by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Statement)(ORTIZ, CARLOS)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiff's Infringement Contentions by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of William Gaede, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Text of Proposed Order)(ORTIZ, CARLOS)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Letter from Carlos F. Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement)(ORTIZ, CARLOS)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ORDER: The Court will conduct a Telephone Status Conference on 2/14/2022 at 10:30 AM. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers 609-989-2144. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/16/2021. (eh, )
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/10/2021. (eh, )
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TEXT ORDER: The Telephone Status Conference previously set for 11/4/2021 has been adjourned to 11/10/2021 at 12:00pm. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers 609-989-2144. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/2/2021. (eh, )
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 LETTER ORDER granting Sun's request for a five (5) day extension of the deadline to serve its non-infringement and invalidity contentions deadline from 09/10/2021 to 09/15/2021. Aurinia's deadline to serve its response to Sun's invalidity contentions is extended from 09/24/2021 to 09/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 09/28/2021. (jdb)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ralph E. Gaskins, Jr. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12786271.) (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, RALPH E. GASKINS, JR., has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdb, )
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Letter from Sun to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re #28 Scheduling Order,. (MILLER, GREGORY)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 DISCOVERY CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 08/27/2021. (jdb)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that the Court will enter the Discovery Confidentiality Order in the form proposed by Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 08/27/2021. (jdb)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ralph E. Gaskins, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 08/19/2021. (jdb)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Letter from Sun to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J. re: DCO dispute re #36 Letter. (MILLER, GREGORY)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Letter from Carlos F. Ortiz for Aurinia Pharmaceuticals Inc. re #34 Letter, #35 Letter. (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Letter from Sun to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B)(MILLER, GREGORY)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Letter from Carlos F. Ortiz, Counsel for Aurinia Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(ORTIZ, CARLOS)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 LETTER ORDER granting a two-week extension, until 08/05/2021, to submit the Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 07/26/2021. (jdb)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Betty Chen, Susan E. Morrison, Roger A. Denning, and Timothy H. Kratz: $ 600, receipt number TRE120735 (abr, )
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Letter from the Parties to the Hon. Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J.. (MILLER, GREGORY)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of Address by CARLOS FRANCISCO ORTIZ (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting pro hac admission as to Betty Chen, Susan E. Morrison, Roger A. Denning, and Timothy H. Kratz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 07/15/2021. (jdb)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 APPLICATION/PETITION for the Pro Hac Vice Admission of Betty Chen, Susan E. Morrison, Roger A. Denning, and Timothy H. Kratz for by SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory D. Miller, #2 Declaration of Betty Chen, #3 Declaration of Susan E. Morrison, #4 Declaration of Roger A. Denning, #5 Declaration of Timothy H. Kratz, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, GREGORY)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/4/2021 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Fact discovery is to close on 06/29/2022. The deadline to file dispositive motions is 12/01/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 07/01/2021. (jdb)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Ralph E. Gaskins, Jr.] by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Carlos F. Ortiz, #2 Certification of Ralph E. Gaskins, #3 Proposed Order)(ORTIZ, CARLOS)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #27 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice [Ralph E. Gaskins, Jr.]. Motion set for 8/2/2021 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb, )
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/29/2021, via telephone. (eh, )
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Zahid N. Quraishi for all further proceedings. Judge Brian R. Martinotti no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/28/2021. (jmh)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Ordered the Initial Conference is set for 6/29/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/8/2021. (eh, )
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. identifying Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (MILLER, GREGORY)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD..(MILLER, GREGORY)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #22 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 06/02/2021. (jdb)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the Clerk`s Text Order filed by the Clerk's office on 05/07/2021 was docketed in error. The incorrect date was attached to the docket entry. Please disregard. (jdb)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., and Sun Pharma FZE.. (MILLER, GREGORY)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #22 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 05/19/2021. (jdb, )
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - USP 10,265,375, #2 Exhibit 2 - USP 10,973,871)(ORTIZ, CARLOS)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER extending the deadline for Sun to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint by thirty (30) days to May 21, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 05/04/2021. (jdb)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint. Plaintiff may formally file its Amended Complaint no later than #5 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 05/05/2021. (jdb)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #18 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, . Motion set for 6/7/2021 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redlined Document, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(ORTIZ, CARLOS)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and Consent Order by SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(MILLER, GREGORY)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, WILLIAM G. GAEDE, III and MANDY KIM, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdb)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Mandy H. Kim to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12357015.) (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice William G. Gaede, III to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12356854.) (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and Consent Order by SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(MILLER, GREGORY)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by GENE Y. KANG on behalf of SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. (KANG, GENE)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by GREGORY D. MILLER on behalf of SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. (MILLER, GREGORY)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mandy H. Kim, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/26/2021. (jdb)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William G. Gaede, III, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 02/26/2021. (jdb)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mandy H. Kim, Esq.. Motion set for 2/16/2021 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb, )
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mandy H. Kim, Esq. by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Carlos F. Ortiz, #2 Certification of Mandy H. Kim, #3 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(ORTIZ, CARLOS)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE waiver sent on 1/6/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. waiver sent on 1/6/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. waiver sent on 1/6/2021, answer due 3/8/2021. (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William G. Gaede, III, Esq. on behalf of Plaintiff Aurinia Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Carlos F. Ortiz, Esq., #2 Certification of William G. Gaede III, Esq., #3 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(ORTIZ, CARLOS)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William G. Gaede, III, Esq. on behalf of Plaintiff Aurinia Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Motion set for 2/1/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William G. Gaede, III, Esq. on behalf of Plaintiff Aurinia Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Motion reset for 2/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb, )
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons In A Civil Case and Complaint For Patent Infringement, Demand For Jury Trial and Exhibit 1 served on Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. ("Sun USA") on 12/22/2020, filed by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr, )
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (abr, )
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE, SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC., SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11844989) with JURY DEMAND, filed by AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: copy of the 375 Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 AO 120 Form)(ORTIZ, CARLOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC. v. SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: GREGORY D. MILLER
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMA GLOBAL FZE
Represented By: GREGORY D. MILLER
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUN PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
Represented By: GREGORY D. MILLER
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AURINIA PHARMACEUTICALS INC.
Represented By: CARLOS FRANCISCO ORTIZ
Represented By: LESLEY MCCALL GROSSBERG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?