MARCHISOTTO v. MALIK et al
Plaintiff: JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO
Defendant: MIDDLESEX COUNTY NEW JERSEY, STUART J. RABNER, THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, GLENN A. GRANT, ERIC M. DEPROSSIMO, MUDDUSER MALIK, RONALD MICUCCI, I.A.D. MIDDLESEX COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, MERYL G. NADLER, HILLARY BRYCE, V. NICOLE LANGFITT, DEBRA E. CANOVA, MCPO DETECTIVE KELLY, KEVIN B. HARRIS, NEW JERSEY COURTS, ANDREW C. MUNGER, GUY P. RYAN, MIDDLESEX SHERIFF'S OFFICE, NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE, ALBERTO RIVAS, HEATHER JOY BAKER, WENDEL E. DANIELS, OCEAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, OCEAN COUNTY NEW JERSEY, STEVEN BONVILLE, I.A.D. NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE, GURBIR S. GREWAL, THE ADVISORY COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT, THE OFFICE OF ATTORNEY ETHICS N.J., MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, LOUIS P. LEPORE, THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS LEPORE, LPL 885 LLC DOS, LOUIS P. LEPORE, ESQ., CHRISTOPHER L.C. KUBERIET and JOSEPH L. YANNOTTI
Case Number: 3:2020cv20426
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Brian R Martinotti
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER SOSINSKI on behalf of HILLARY BRYCE, GURBIR S. GREWAL, CHRISTOPHER L.C. KUBERIET, MCPO DETECTIVE KELLY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, ANDREW C. MUNGER, NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, OCEAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY (SOSINSKI, PETER)
February 26, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #66 MOTION to Amend/Correct. Motion set for 4/5/2021 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 26, 2021 Filing 66 MOTION to Amend Case Caption filed by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
February 25, 2021 Filing 65 Letter request to update the docket from John F. Marchisotto. (jmh) Filed via ECF Help Desk
February 25, 2021 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
February 25, 2021 Filing 63 Letter request to update docket filed by John F. Marchisotto. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
February 25, 2021 Filing 62 BRIEF in Opposition filed by DEBRA E. CANOVA, LOUIS P. LEPORE, ESQ, LPL 885 LLC DOS, THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS LEPORE re #15 MOTION for Disqualification to Defendant Louis P. Lepore (Attachments: #1 Brief in opposition, #2 Certification of counsel)(LEPORE, LOUIS)
February 25, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #61 First MOTION to Dismiss failure to state a claim. Motion set for 4/5/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 25, 2021 Filing 61 First MOTION to Dismiss failure to state a claim by DEBRA E. CANOVA, LOUIS P. LEPORE, ESQ, LPL 885 LLC DOS, THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS LEPORE. Responses due by 3/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief to dismiss, #2 Affidavit Defendants' Affidavit, #3 Exhibit List of Exhibits with page numbers, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 1 to 10, #5 Exhibit Exhibits11 to 19, #6 Exhibit Exhibits 21 to 30, #7 Exhibit Exhibits 31 to 37, #8 Certification Attorney Certification, #9 Certification Certification of Service, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(LEPORE, LOUIS)
February 25, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #59 MOTION for Disqualification of District Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Motion set for 4/5/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 24, 2021 Filing 60 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
February 24, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #55 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 4/19/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 24, 2021 Filing 56 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #55 MOTION to Dismiss filed by John F. Marchisotto. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
February 23, 2021 Filing 59 MOTION for Disqualification of District Judge Brian R. Martinotti by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO. (jmh)(Filed via ECF Help Desk)
February 23, 2021 Filing 58 Exhibit to #42 Motion for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order and for the Court to Grant Money Damages filed by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
February 23, 2021 Filing 57 Letter to the Court withdrawing Notice of Lawsuit and Request to waive service of Summons filed by John F. Marchisotto. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
February 23, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #55 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 4/5/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 23, 2021 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss by OCEAN COUNTY NEW JERSEY. Responses due by 3/22/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief Letter Brief, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(THOMPSON, MATHEW)
February 23, 2021 Filing 54 ANSWER to Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against HEATHER JOY BAKER, STEVEN BONVILLE, HILLARY BRYCE, DEBRA E. CANOVA, WENDEL E. DANIELS, GLENN A. GRANT, GURBIR S. GREWAL, I.A.D. NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE, CHRISTOPHER L.C. KUBERIET, V. NICOLE LANGFITT, LOUIS P. LEPORE, ESQ, LPL 885 LLC DOS, MUDDUSER MALIK, MCPO DETECTIVE KELLY, RONALD MICUCCI, MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, ANDREW C. MUNGER, MERYL G. NADLER, NEW JERSEY COURTS, NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE, OCEAN COUNTY NEW JERSEY, OCEAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, STUART J. RABNER, ALBERTO RIVAS, GUY P. RYAN, THE ADVISORY COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT, THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS LEPORE, THE OFFICE OF ATTORNEY ETHICS N.J., THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, JOSEPH L. YANNOTTI by ERIC M. DEPROSSIMO.(FLORIO, EDWARD)
February 22, 2021 Filing 53 Letter to Judge Martinotti requesting the Court to direct the Clerk to set Plaintiff's #30 Motion for Default Judgment filed by John F. Marchisotto. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
February 22, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). Motion set for 4/5/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 22, 2021 Filing 52 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) file by John F. Marchisotto. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
February 22, 2021 Filing 51 Letter requesting a response the #31 Letter requesting for a Court Order for service to be made by the USMS or a person specifically appointed by the Court from John F. Marchisotto. (jmh) (Filed via ECF Help Desk)
February 22, 2021 Filing 50 Letter request to Clarify Text Order #48 and for the Court to direct Attorney Abouzeid Danielle to provide the Court and plaintiff the first name of Detective Kelly, Middlesex County Sheriff's Office filed John F. Marchisotto. (Text Order has been corrected by the Clerks office on 2/22/2021) (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
February 19, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6). Motion set for 3/15/2021 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 19, 2021 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) by HEATHER JOY BAKER, STEVEN BONVILLE, WENDEL E. DANIELS, GLENN A. GRANT, V. NICOLE LANGFITT, MERYL G. NADLER, NEW JERSEY COURTS, STUART J. RABNER, ALBERTO RIVAS, GUY P. RYAN, THE ADVISORY COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT, THE OFFICE OF ATTORNEY ETHICS N.J., JOSEPH L. YANNOTTI. Responses due by 3/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(MORAN, MICHAEL)
February 19, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #48 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by I.A.D. MIDDLESEX COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, I.A.D. and MIDDLESEX SHERIFF'S OFFICE has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/4/2021. (jmh)
February 19, 2021 Filing 48 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Middlesex Sheriff's Office and I.A.D. Middlesex County Sheriff's Office. Attorney DANIELLE ABOUZEID for I.A.D. MIDDLESEX COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE,DANIELLE ABOUZEID for MIDDLESEX SHERIFF'S OFFICE added. (ABOUZEID, DANIELLE)
February 19, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #47 MOTION to Lodge Exhibits as Evidence. Motion set for 3/15/2021 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 19, 2021 Filing 47 MOTION to Lodge Exhibits as Evidence by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7)(jmh)
February 19, 2021 Filing 46 Exhibit to #42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order and for the Court to Grant Money Damage filed by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
February 19, 2021 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIELLE ABOUZEID on behalf of I.A.D. MIDDLESEX COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, MIDDLESEX SHERIFF'S OFFICE (ABOUZEID, DANIELLE)
February 18, 2021 Filing 44 Exhibits to #42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order and for the Court to Grant Money Damages filed by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (Attachments: #1 E-Mails)(jmh)
February 18, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #43 MOTION to Lodge Exhibits as Evidence. Motion set for 3/15/2021 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 18, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION to Lodge Exhibits as Evidence by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO. (Filed by ECF Help Desk) (Attachments: #1 Letter)(jmh)
February 17, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Temporary Restraining Order and for the Court to Grant Money Damages filed by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
February 17, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #41 MOTION. Motion set for 3/15/2021 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 17, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION to Lodge Exhibits filed by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5)(jmh) (Filed via ECF Help Desk)
February 17, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #40 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MIDDLESEX COUNTY NEW JERSEY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/3/2021. (jmh)
February 17, 2021 Filing 40 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Middlesex County New Jersey.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(TRINTER, KURT)
February 16, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #39 MOTION to Expand the Record. Motion set for 3/15/2021 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 16, 2021 Filing 39 MOTION to Expand the Record by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO. (jmh) (Filed via ECF Help desk)
February 16, 2021 Filing 38 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons as to Defendants Defendants; (1) Andrew C. Munger, (2) Gurbir S. Grewal, (3) New Jersey Office of the Attorney General, (4) Hillary Bryce, (5) Ocean County Prosecutor's Office, (6) MUDDUSER MALIK, (7) RONALD MICUCCI (8) NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE, and (9) Internal Affairs Division New Jersey State Police filed by John F. Marchisotto. (jmh)
February 16, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Newswire Press Release by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO (jmh) (Filed via ECF Help Desk)
February 15, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #34 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by KEVIN B. HARRIS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/3/2021. (jmh)
February 13, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE by LOUIS P. LEPORE, ESQ RULE 11 Letter and Draft motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Draft Motion Rule 11, #2 Certificate of Service Service)(LEPORE, LOUIS)
February 13, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE by DEBRA E. CANOVA, LOUIS P. LEPORE, ESQ RULE 11 Letter and Draft motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Draft Motion Rule 11, #2 Certificate of Service Service)(LEPORE, LOUIS)
February 13, 2021 Filing 34 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant, Kevin B. Harris. Attorney CLARK W. CONVERY for KEVIN B. HARRIS added. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(CONVERY, CLARK)
February 11, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by KURT JASON TRINTER on behalf of MIDDLESEX COUNTY NEW JERSEY (TRINTER, KURT)
February 11, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL T. MORAN on behalf of HEATHER JOY BAKER, STEVEN BONVILLE, WENDEL E. DANIELS, GLENN A. GRANT, V. NICOLE LANGFITT, MERYL G. NADLER, NEW JERSEY COURTS, STUART J. RABNER, ALBERTO RIVAS, GUY P. RYAN, THE ADVISORY COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT, THE OFFICE OF ATTORNEY ETHICS N.J., JOSEPH L. YANNOTTI (MORAN, MICHAEL)
February 11, 2021 Filing 31 Letter requesting a Court Order for service to be made by the USMS or a person specifically appointed by the Court from John F. Marchisotto. (jmh)
February 11, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the Request for Default submitted by John Marchisotto on 2/1/2021 cannot be granted as requested because Defendants have not been properly served. Please refer to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 4(i). This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (jmh)
February 11, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the #30 Motion for Default submitted by John Marchisotto on 2/11/2021 cannot be set as a motion because a Clerks entry of default was not entered on behalf of the Defendants requested. The Motion submitted will be construed as a Request for Default. This message is for informational purposes only and this submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (jmh)
February 11, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Andrew C. Munger, Gurbir S. Grewal, New Jersey Office the Attorney General, Hillary Bryce, Ocean County Prosecutor's Office, Mudduser Malik, Ronald Micucci, New Jersey State Police, and Internal Affairs Division New Jersey State Police filed by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO. (jmh)
February 9, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #29 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by ERIC M. DEPROSSIMO has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/23/2021. (jmh)
February 9, 2021 Filing 29 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to DEFENDANT ERIC M. DEPROSSIMO.. (FLORIO, EDWARD)
February 9, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Disqualification to Defendant Louis P. Lepore. Motion reset for 3/15/2021 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 LETTER ORDER granting Defendants' request; The return date for Plaintiff's #15 Motion is adjourned to 3/15/2021; Any opposition to the Motion is therefore due to be filed no later than 3/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/9/2021. (abr, )
February 8, 2021 Filing 27 Letter Notification of External Order Filed By The Clerk Of The Appellate Division filed by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO (jmh)(Filed via ECF Help Desk)
February 8, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by LOUIS P. LEPORE on behalf of DEBRA E. CANOVA, LOUIS P. LEPORE, ESQ, LPL 885 LLC DOS, THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS LEPORE (LEPORE, LOUIS)
February 8, 2021 Filing 25 Letter re #21 Letter. (LEPORE, LOUIS)
February 8, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #21 Application filed by Louis Lepore on 2/6/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Letter. Please resubmit the Application using the event - Application/Petition - that can be found under - Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jmh)
February 8, 2021 Filing 24 Letter regarding Clerk's Text Order for #22 Application filed by John F. Marchisotto. (jmh) (Filed via ECF Help Desk)
February 7, 2021 Filing 23 Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's #21 Letter Application filed by John Marchisotto. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
February 7, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #22 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS LEPORE, DEBRA E. CANOVA, LOUIS P. LEPORE, ESQ, LPL 885 LLC DOS has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/4/2021. (jmh)
February 6, 2021 Filing 22 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Extension of Time. Attorney LOUIS P. LEPORE for DEBRA E. CANOVA,LOUIS P. LEPORE for LOUIS P. LEPORE, ESQ,LOUIS P. LEPORE for LPL 885 LLC DOS added. (LEPORE, LOUIS)
February 6, 2021 Filing 21 Letter from Louis Lepore, Esq. (LEPORE, LOUIS)
February 5, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by LOUIS P. LEPORE, ESQ RULE 11 Letter and Draft motion (Attachments: #1 Index Draft Motion Rule 11, #2 Certification Certification of letter and Draft Motion Rule 11)(LEPORE, LOUIS)
February 5, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #19 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by OCEAN COUNTY NEW JERSEY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 2/25/2021. (jmh)
February 5, 2021 Filing 19 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Ocean County, improperly named as Ocean County New Jersey. Attorney MATHEW BRADY THOMPSON for OCEAN COUNTY NEW JERSEY added. (THOMPSON, MATHEW)
February 3, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J. FLORIO on behalf of ERIC M. DEPROSSIMO (FLORIO, EDWARD)
February 3, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by MATHEW BRADY THOMPSON on behalf of OCEAN COUNTY NEW JERSEY (THOMPSON, MATHEW)
February 2, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Press Release filed by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO (jmh) (Filed via ECF Help Desk)
February 2, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #15 MOTION for Disqualification to Defendant Louis P. Lepore. Motion set for 3/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 2, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Disqualification of Defendant Louis P. Lepores' #8 Notice of Appearance filed by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO. (jmh)(Filed via ECF Help Desk)
January 31, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO (jmh) (Filed via ECF Help Desk)
January 28, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CHRISTOPHER L.C. KUBERIET, LOUIS P. LEPORE, LPL 885 LLC DOS ID #: 4209505, THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS LEPORE, JOSEPH L. YANNOTTI. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh)
January 28, 2021 Filing 12 Request for Summons to be Issued by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO as to CHRISTOPHER L.C. KUBERIET, LOUIS P. LEPORE, LPL 885 LLC DOS ID #: 4209505, THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS LEPORE, JOSEPH L. YANNOTTI. (jmh) (Filed via ECF Help Desk)
January 28, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against HEATHER JOY BAKER, STEVEN BONVILLE, HILLARY BRYCE, DEBRA E. CANOVA, WENDEL E. DANIELS, ERIC M. DEPROSSIMO, GLENN A. GRANT, GURBIR S. GREWAL, KEVIN B. HARRIS, I.A.D. MIDDLESEX COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, I.A.D. NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE, V. NICOLE LANGFITT, LOUIS P. LEPORE, MUDDUSER MALIK, MCPO DETECTIVE KELLY, RONALD MICUCCI, MIDDLESEX COUNTY NEW JERSEY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, MIDDLESEX SHERIFF'S OFFICE, ANDREW C. MUNGER, MERYL G. NADLER, NEW JERSEY COURTS, NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE, OCEAN COUNTY NEW JERSEY, OCEAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, STUART J. RABNER, ALBERTO RIVAS, GUY P. RYAN, THE ADVISORY COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT, THE OFFICE OF ATTORNEY ETHICS N.J., THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY, JOSEPH L. YANNOTTI, CHRISTOPHER L.C. KUBERIET, THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS LEPORE, LPL 885 LLC DOS ID #: 4209505 HEATHER JOY BAKER; STEVEN BONVILLE; HILLARY BRYCE; DEBRA E. CANOVA; WENDEL E. DANIELS; ERIC M. DEPROSSIMO; GLENN A. GRANT; GURBIR S. GREWAL; KEVIN B. HARRIS; I.A.D. MIDDLESEX COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE; I.A.D. NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE; V. NICOLE LANGFITT; LOUIS P. LEPORE; MUDDUSER MALIK; MCPO DETECTIVE KELLY; RONALD MICUCCI; MIDDLESEX COUNTY NEW JERSEY; MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE; MIDDLESEX SHERIFF'S OFFICE; ANDREW C. MUNGER; MERYL G. NADLER; NEW JERSEY COURTS; NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL; NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE; OCEAN COUNTY NEW JERSEY; OCEAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE; STUART J. RABNER; ALBERTO RIVAS; GUY P. RYAN; THE ADVISORY COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT; THE OFFICE OF ATTORNEY ETHICS N.J.; THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY; JOSEPH L. YANNOTTI; CHRISTOPHER L.C. KUBERIET; THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS LEPORE; LPL 885 LLC DOS ID #: 4209505., filed by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO.(jmh) (Filed via ECF Help Desk)
January 26, 2021 Filing 10 Letter regarding letter written by Louis P. Lepore from John F. Marchisotto. (Filed via ECF Help Desk) (jmh)
January 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Press Release for Summons sent to law enforcement, court officials in NJ harassment case, filed by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO (jmh) (Filed via ECF Help Desk)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by LOUIS P. LEPORE on behalf of DEBRA E. CANOVA, LOUIS P. LEPORE (LEPORE, LOUIS)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 Letter regarding amending complaint filed by John F. Marchisotto. (jmh) (Filed via ECF Help Desk)
January 22, 2021 Filing 6 Letter to Robert Wilkinson and Press Release filed by John F. Marchisotto. (Attachments: #1 Press Release)(jmh) (Filed via ECF Help Desk)
January 19, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(jmh)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to HEATHER JOY BAKER, STEVEN BONVILLE, HILLARY BRYCE, DEBRA E. CANOVA, WENDEL E. DANIELS, ERIC M. DEPROSSIMO, GLENN A. GRANT, GURBIR S. GREWAL, KEVIN B. HARRIS, I.A.D. MIDDLESEX COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE, I.A.D. NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE, V. NICOLE LANGFITT, LOUIS P. LEPORE, MUDDUSER MALIK, MCPO DETECTIVE KELLY, RONALD MICUCCI, MIDDLESEX COUNTY NEW JERSEY, MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, MIDDLESEX SHERIFF'S OFFICE, ANDREW C. MUNGER, MERYL G. NADLER, NEW JERSEY COURTS, NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE, OCEAN COUNTY NEW JERSEY, OCEAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE, STUART J. RABNER, ALBERTO RIVAS, GUY P. RYAN, THE ADVISORY COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT, THE OFFICE OF ATTORNEY ETHICS N.J., THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jem)
January 5, 2021 COMPLAINT filed, see docket entry #1 .(jem)
January 5, 2021 Filing fee of $402 received, receipt number TRE116422. (jem)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Consent & Registration to Receive Documents Electronically by JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO (mg)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 Clerk's Letter: Complaint not accompanied by the filing fee or application to proceed in forma pauperis. (mg)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARCHISOTTO v. MALIK et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDDLESEX COUNTY NEW JERSEY
Represented By: KURT JASON TRINTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUART J. RABNER
Represented By: MICHAEL T. MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE STATE OF NEW JERSEY
Represented By: PETER SOSINSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENN A. GRANT
Represented By: MICHAEL T. MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC M. DEPROSSIMO
Represented By: EDWARD J. FLORIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MUDDUSER MALIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RONALD MICUCCI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.A.D. MIDDLESEX COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Represented By: DANIELLE ABOUZEID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERYL G. NADLER
Represented By: MICHAEL T. MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILLARY BRYCE
Represented By: PETER SOSINSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. NICOLE LANGFITT
Represented By: MICHAEL T. MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA E. CANOVA
Represented By: LOUIS P. LEPORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCPO DETECTIVE KELLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN B. HARRIS
Represented By: CLARK W. CONVERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY COURTS
Represented By: MICHAEL T. MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW C. MUNGER
Represented By: PETER SOSINSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GUY P. RYAN
Represented By: MICHAEL T. MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDDLESEX SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Represented By: DANIELLE ABOUZEID
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: PETER SOSINSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALBERTO RIVAS
Represented By: MICHAEL T. MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER JOY BAKER
Represented By: MICHAEL T. MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENDEL E. DANIELS
Represented By: MICHAEL T. MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN COUNTY NEW JERSEY
Represented By: MATHEW BRADY THOMPSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN BONVILLE
Represented By: MICHAEL T. MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.A.D. NEW JERSEY STATE POLICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GURBIR S. GREWAL
Represented By: PETER SOSINSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE ADVISORY COMMITTEE ON JUDICIAL CONDUCT
Represented By: MICHAEL T. MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE OFFICE OF ATTORNEY ETHICS N.J.
Represented By: MICHAEL T. MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIDDLESEX COUNTY PROSECUTOR'S OFFICE
Represented By: PETER SOSINSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS P. LEPORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LAW OFFICES OF LOUIS LEPORE
Represented By: LOUIS P. LEPORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPL 885 LLC DOS
Represented By: LOUIS P. LEPORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS P. LEPORE, ESQ.
Represented By: LOUIS P. LEPORE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER L.C. KUBERIET
Represented By: PETER SOSINSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH L. YANNOTTI
Represented By: MICHAEL T. MORAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN F. MARCHISOTTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?