HESTON v. AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.
Plaintiff: RYAN HESTON
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00435
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Initial Conference set for 3/30/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. The Court will provide counsel with dial in information via email prior to the scheduled conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/1/2021. (if, )
January 29, 2021 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC..(HECKMAN, AUGUST)
January 20, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by NEEDHY SHAH on behalf of AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. (SHAH, NEEDHY)
January 11, 2021 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal, )
January 8, 2021 CLERK'S TEXT ORDER - The Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer document #3 submitted by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. on 1/8/2021 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/29/2021. (mg)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney AUGUST W. HECKMAN, III for AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. added. (HECKMAN, AUGUST)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HECKMAN, AUGUST)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC. from Superior Court of New Jersey, Mercer County, case number MER-L-002149-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11947831), filed by AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(HECKMAN, AUGUST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HESTON v. AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN HESTON
Represented By: DRAKE P. BEARDEN, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: AUGUST W. HECKMAN, III
Represented By: NEEDHY SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?