NOVO NORDISK INC. et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC. and NOVO NORDISK INC.
Defendant: ROBERT P. CHARROW, THOMAS J. ENGELS, ALEX M. AZAR, II, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and HEALTH RESOURCES AND SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Intervenor: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, 340B HEALTH, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEALTH-SYSTEM PHARMACISTS, AMERICA'S ESSENTIAL HOSPITALS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS d/b/a CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION and AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
Interested Party: ACTING U.S. AG JEFFREY A. ROSEN and U.S. ATTORNEY OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY
Case Number: 3:2021cv00806
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2005
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William B. Schultz, Margaret M. Dotzel, Casey Trombley-Shapiro Jonas, and Ariella E. Muller. Motion set for 4/5/2021 before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
March 11, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for William B. Schultz, Margaret M. Dotzel, Casey Trombley-Shapiro Jonas, and Ariella E. Muller by 340B HEALTH, AMERICA'S ESSENTIAL HOSPITALS, AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEALTH-SYSTEM PHARMACISTS, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS d/b/a CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Margaret M. Dotzel, #2 Certification of William B. Schultz, #3 Certification of C. Trombley-Shapiro Jonas, #4 Certification of Ariella E. Muller, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(BOYAN, JAMES)
March 8, 2021 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC., NOVO NORDISK INC.. U.S. ATTORNEY OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY served on 2/26/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
March 8, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC., NOVO NORDISK INC.. Jeffrey A. Rosen served on 1/22/2021, answer due 3/23/2021. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
March 3, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JOHN SHAKOW, ASHLEY C. PARRISH and GRACIELA RODRIGUEZ, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jmh)
March 2, 2021 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 340B HEALTH, AMERICA'S ESSENTIAL HOSPITALS, AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEALTH-SYSTEM PHARMACISTS, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS d/b/a CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION. (BOYAN, JAMES)
March 2, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION to Intervene by AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, 340B HEALTH, AMERICA'S ESSENTIAL HOSPITALS, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS d/b/a CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEALTH-SYSTEM PHARMACISTS. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of James W. Boyan III with Exhibits A-S, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(BOYAN, JAMES)
March 2, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 4/5/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
February 26, 2021 Filing 19 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice John D. Shakow to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
February 26, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Ashley C. Parrish to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
February 26, 2021 Filing 17 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Graciela M. Rodriguez to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
February 25, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 450, receipt number CAM012306 (rtm, )
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Graciela M. Rodriguez, Ashley C. Parrish, and John D. Shakow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 2/24/2021. (jmh)
February 5, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC.. THOMAS J. ENGELS served on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
February 5, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC.. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
February 5, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC.. ROBERT P. CHARROW served on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
February 5, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC.. HEALTH RESOURCES AND SERVICES ADMINISTRATION served on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
February 5, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC.. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/20/2021, answer due 3/22/2021. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
January 28, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Graciela M. Rodriguez, Ashley C. Parrish, and John D. Shakow. Motion set for 3/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
January 27, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Graciela M. Rodriguez, Ashley C. Parrish, and John D. Shakow by NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Graciela M. Rodriguez, #2 Certification of Ashley C. Parrish, #3 Certification of John D. Shakow, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(DAHAN, ISRAEL)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT P. CHARROW, THOMAS J. ENGELS, HEALTH RESOURCES AND SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
January 19, 2021 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 Request for Summons to be Issued by NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC. as to ROBERT P. CHARROW. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 Request for Summons to be Issued by NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC. as to THOMAS J. ENGELS. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
January 15, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Summons to be Issued by NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC. as to HEALTH RESOURCES AND SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC. as to ALEX M. AZAR, II. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
January 15, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Summons to be Issued by NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC. as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
January 15, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC. identifying Novo Nordisk US Commercial Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
January 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by ISRAEL DAHAN on behalf of NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC. (DAHAN, ISRAEL)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II, ROBERT P. CHARROW, THOMAS J. ENGELS, HEALTH RESOURCES AND SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-11985602), filed by NOVO NORDISK INC., NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Certification)(DAHAN, ISRAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NOVO NORDISK INC. et al v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT P. CHARROW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS J. ENGELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTH RESOURCES AND SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOVO NORDISK PHARMA, INC.
Represented By: ISRAEL DAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NOVO NORDISK INC.
Represented By: ISRAEL DAHAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES
Represented By: JAMES W. BOYAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: 340B HEALTH
Represented By: JAMES W. BOYAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEALTH-SYSTEM PHARMACISTS
Represented By: JAMES W. BOYAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: AMERICA'S ESSENTIAL HOSPITALS
Represented By: JAMES W. BOYAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS d/b/a CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: JAMES W. BOYAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: JAMES W. BOYAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ACTING U.S. AG JEFFREY A. ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. ATTORNEY OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?