RICHWINE v. ON CAMPUS MARKETING, LLC et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL RICHWINE
Defendant: ABC CORPS #1-10, JOHN DOES #6-10, ON CAMPUS MARKETING, LLC and JOHN DOES #1-5
Case Number: 3:2021cv02488
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/24/2021. The parties shall exchange Rule 26 disclosures. Formal discovery is stayed. Settlement Conference via telephone is set for April 22, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Parties with full settlement authority are required to be available for the duration of the conference. Kindly mark your calendars accordingly. The Court shall circulate dial-in information for the conference at a later date. (mm)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by ON CAMPUS MARKETING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HYMAN, GREGORY)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ON CAMPUS MARKETING, LLC identifying On Campus Marketing, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HYMAN, GREGORY)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/24/2021 at 12:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/16/2021. (jem)
February 15, 2021 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jjc, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ON CAMPUS MARKETING, LLC from Superior Court of Mercer County, case number MER-L-000073-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12122340), filed by ON CAMPUS MARKETING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification Local Rule 11.2 Certification, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F)(HYMAN, GREGORY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RICHWINE v. ON CAMPUS MARKETING, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES #6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ON CAMPUS MARKETING, LLC
Represented By: GREGORY S. HYMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES #1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL RICHWINE
Represented By: PATRICK F. CARRIGG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?