BOLDT et al v. TAYLOR et al
Plaintiff: HARRY BOLDT and PATRICIA BOLDT
Defendant: JOHN DOES A-Z, CAPTAIN BRETT TAYLOR and REEL REACTION SPORTFISHING LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv03204
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/13/2021. (kas)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 6/30/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Any motion to amend the pleadings or to join new parties, whether by amended or third-party complaint, must be filed by May 28, 2021. Counsel for the Plaintiffs is directed to initiate the call. All fact discovery is to be completed by November 1, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 04/12/2021. (jdb)
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 Joint Discovery Plan by REEL REACTION SPORTFISHING LLC, CAPTAIN BRETT TAYLOR.(POLING, KRISTIN)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC INITIAL CONFERNCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/12/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 03/02/2021. (jdb)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by REEL REACTION SPORTFISHING LLC, CAPTAIN BRETT TAYLOR.(POLING, KRISTIN)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES E. MERCANTE on behalf of REEL REACTION SPORTFISHING LLC, CAPTAIN BRETT TAYLOR (MERCANTE, JAMES)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by REEL REACTION SPORTFISHING LLC, CAPTAIN BRETT TAYLOR, JOHN A-Z (MULTIPLE ALTERNATIVE FICTITIOUS INDIVIDU DOES from Superior Court of NJ; Law Division; Ocean County, case number OCN-L-003085-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12170050), filed by REEL REACTION SPORTFISHING LLC, CAPTAIN BRETT TAYLOR, JOHN A-Z (MULTIPLE ALTERNATIVE FICTITIOUS INDIVIDU DOES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(POLING, KRISTIN)
February 23, 2021 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BOLDT et al v. TAYLOR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HARRY BOLDT
Represented By: DONALD JOSEPH GRASSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA BOLDT
Represented By: DONALD JOSEPH GRASSO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPTAIN BRETT TAYLOR
Represented By: KRISTIN EILEEN POLING
Represented By: JAMES E. MERCANTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REEL REACTION SPORTFISHING LLC
Represented By: KRISTIN EILEEN POLING
Represented By: JAMES E. MERCANTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?