ROMANOV v. MICROSOFT CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: EZRA ROMANOV
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-10, MICROSOFT CORPORATION and RICHARD ROE 1-10
Case Number: 3:2021cv03564
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Claims (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CASPER, CHARLES)
April 16, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Claims. Motion reset for 5/3/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb, )
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER adjourning Defendants' #13 motion to compel arbitration to 05/03/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 04/16/2021. (jdb)
April 15, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION Consent to Adjourn Motion Return Date by EZRA ROMANOV. (SCHACHTEL, ALEXANDER)
April 12, 2021 Filing 13 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EZRA ROMANOV re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Claims (SCHACHTEL, ALEXANDER)
April 12, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #11 Brief in Opposition to Motion submitted by Alexander Schachtel on 04/12/2021 did not contain a proper electronic signature (s/). PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH THE PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE (s/ Attorney's Name.) This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jdb, )
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by EZRA ROMANOV re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Claims (SCHACHTEL, ALEXANDER)
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EZRA ROMANOV re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Claims (SCHACHTEL, ALEXANDER)
March 22, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Claims. Motion set for 4/19/2021 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb, )
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER- The Initial rule 16 conference scheduled for April 7, 2021 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni is adjourned with no new date. Parties are to notify the Court upon decision of the pending motion to stay. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm)
March 19, 2021 Filing 9 Exhibit to #8 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Claims by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andreas Holbrook - Part 1, #2 Declaration of Andreas Holbrook - Part 2, #3 Declaration of Andreas Holbrook - Part 3, #4 Declaration of Andreas Holbrook - Part 4, #5 Declaration of Andreas Holbrook - Part 5)(CASPER, CHARLES)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
March 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Claims by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(CASPER, CHARLES)
March 4, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by MICROSOFT CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 03/19/2021. (jdb, ) Modified on 3/4/2021 (jdb).
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Microsoft.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CASPER, CHARLES)
March 3, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #6 Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order filed by Charles Casper on 03/03/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order USING Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents - Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jdb, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Reply to Complaint [Local Civil Rule 6.1(b)] by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CASPER, CHARLES)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2021 11:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 2/26/2021. (jdb)
February 26, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Attorney for Plaintiff, ALEXANDER SCHACHEL, appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (mg)
February 26, 2021 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mg)
February 26, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT EUGENE DAY, III on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(DAY, ROBERT)
February 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES BLAINE CASPER on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CASPER, CHARLES)
February 26, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(CASPER, CHARLES)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MICROSOFT CORPORATION from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number OCN-L-2468-20. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12194683), filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certification, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(CASPER, CHARLES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROMANOV v. MICROSOFT CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Represented By: ROBERT EUGENE DAY, III
Represented By: CHARLES BLAINE CASPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ROE 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EZRA ROMANOV
Represented By: ALEXANDER N. SCHACHTEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?