YUSON v. AMATO et al
Plaintiff: ERWIN YUSON
Defendant: ELECTROCORE, INC., FRANCIS R. AMATO, DAVID M. RUBIN, JAMES L.L. TULLIS, NICHOLAS COLUCCI, BRIAN POSNER, MICHAEL G. ATIEH, THOMAS J. ERRICO, TREVOR J. MOODY, JOSEPH P. ERRICO, CARRIE S. COX, STEPHEN L. ONDRA, GLENN S. VRANIAK and MICHAEL W. ROSS
Case Number: 3:2021cv04481
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER to consolidate, establish a leadership structure, and stay related shareholder derivative actions. Signed by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 04/30/2021. (jdb)
May 3, 2021 Cases associated: Create association to 3:21-cv-04135-AET-TJB. (jdb)
May 3, 2021 ***Civil Case Terminated. (jdb, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN SCOTT JEMISON on behalf of All Defendants (JEMISON, JONATHAN)
April 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN DAVID HENRY on behalf of All Defendants (HENRY, JONATHAN)
March 11, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ERWIN YUSON. ELECTROCORE, INC. served on 3/10/2021, answer due 3/31/2021. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
March 9, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FRANCIS R. AMATO, MICHAEL G. ATIEH, NICHOLAS COLUCCI, CARRIE S. COX, ELECTROCORE, INC., JOSEPH P. ERRICO, THOMAS J. ERRICO, TREVOR J. MOODY, STEPHEN L. ONDRA, BRIAN POSNER, MICHAEL W. ROSS, DAVID M. RUBIN, JAMES L.L. TULLIS, GLENN S. VRANIAK. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
March 9, 2021 Judge Anne E. Thompson and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ERWIN YUSON. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by ERWIN YUSON as to FRANCIS R. AMATO, MICHAEL G. ATIEH, NICHOLAS COLUCCI, CARRIE S. COX, ELECTROCORE, INC., JOSEPH P. ERRICO, THOMAS J. ERRICO, TREVOR J. MOODY, STEPHEN L. ONDRA, BRIAN POSNER, MICHAEL W. ROSS, DAVID M. RUBIN, JAMES L.L. TULLIS, GLENN S. VRANIAK. (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FRANCIS R. AMATO, MICHAEL G. ATIEH, NICHOLAS COLUCCI, CARRIE S. COX, ELECTROCORE, INC., JOSEPH P. ERRICO, THOMAS J. ERRICO, TREVOR J. MOODY, STEPHEN L. ONDRA, BRIAN POSNER, MICHAEL W. ROSS, DAVID M. RUBIN, JAMES L.L. TULLIS, GLENN S. VRANIAK ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12242557) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ERWIN YUSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ROSEN, LAURENCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YUSON v. AMATO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELECTROCORE, INC.
Represented By: JONATHAN SCOTT JEMISON
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCIS R. AMATO
Represented By: JONATHAN SCOTT JEMISON
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID M. RUBIN
Represented By: JONATHAN SCOTT JEMISON
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES L.L. TULLIS
Represented By: JONATHAN SCOTT JEMISON
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS COLUCCI
Represented By: JONATHAN SCOTT JEMISON
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN POSNER
Represented By: JONATHAN SCOTT JEMISON
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL G. ATIEH
Represented By: JONATHAN SCOTT JEMISON
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS J. ERRICO
Represented By: JONATHAN SCOTT JEMISON
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TREVOR J. MOODY
Represented By: JONATHAN SCOTT JEMISON
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH P. ERRICO
Represented By: JONATHAN SCOTT JEMISON
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIE S. COX
Represented By: JONATHAN SCOTT JEMISON
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN L. ONDRA
Represented By: JONATHAN SCOTT JEMISON
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENN S. VRANIAK
Represented By: JONATHAN SCOTT JEMISON
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL W. ROSS
Represented By: JONATHAN SCOTT JEMISON
Represented By: JONATHAN DAVID HENRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERWIN YUSON
Represented By: LAURENCE M. ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?