DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED et al v. GREWAL et al
Plaintiff: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC. and DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED
Defendant: Matthew Denn, Dictorate of Defense Trade Controls, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, Sarah Heidema, ANDREW CUOMO, GURBIR S GREWAL, PHV THOMAS WOLF, JOSH SHAPIRO, MICHAEL FEUER and Mike Miller
Case Number: 3:2021cv09867
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
2 Judge: Anne E Thompson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Filing 160 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIN HODGE on behalf of GURBIR S GREWAL (HODGE, ERIN)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 TEXT ORDER that 3:21-cv-9867-MAS-TJB is hereby consolidated with the matter 3:19-cv-4753-AET-TJB, with civil action no. 3:19-cv-4753, serving as the lead case. So Ordered by Judge Anne E. Thompson on 6/11/2021. (jjc, )
June 11, 2021 Judge Anne E. Thompson added. Judge Michael A. Shipp no longer assigned to case. (jjc, )
June 11, 2021 Cases associated: Create association to 3:19-cv-04753-AET-TJB. (jjc, )
June 8, 2021 Filing 158 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Hannah Roblyer to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
June 8, 2021 Filing 157 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel Nightingale to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
June 8, 2021 Filing 156 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Charles Flores to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
June 8, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, CHARLES FLORES, DANIEL NIGHTINGALE and HANNAH ROBLYER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jmh)
June 2, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Charles Flores, Daniel Nightingale, and Hannah Roblyer: $ 450, receipt number TRE119594 (abr, )
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 CONSENT ORDER granting leave to appear pro hac vice as to Charles Flores, Daniel Nightingale, and Hannah Roblyer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 5/21/2021. (jmh)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 TEXT ORDER: The deadline for Defendant to answer or respond to the Complaint will be held in abeyance until a decision is reached on Defendant's pending motion to consolidate this case with 19-4753. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. (mm)
May 19, 2021 Filing 153 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER on behalf of DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED, SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC. (SCHMUTTER, DANIEL)
May 18, 2021 Filing 152 Letter from Defendant Gurbir Grewal. (SHEEHAN, TIM)
April 28, 2021 Filing 151 Letter from Defendant Gurbir Grewal. (SHEEHAN, TIM)
April 28, 2021 Filing 150 NOTICE of Appearance by TIM SHEEHAN on behalf of GURBIR S GREWAL (SHEEHAN, TIM)
April 20, 2021 Filing 149 Notice to ALAN GURA re mandatory eFiling. (jal, )
April 20, 2021 Filing 148 Notice to JOSH BLACKMAN re mandatory eFiling. (jal, )
April 20, 2021 Filing 147 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:18-cv-00637. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Appeal of Order entered by District Judge #145 by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. No filing fee submitted (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Flores, Charles)
April 20, 2021 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, )
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING NJAG's #121 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue. ORDER that Plaintiffs' claims against the NJAG are SEVERED and shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey.ORDER that the NJAG's #144 Unopposed Motion for Oral Argument is MOOT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
April 5, 2021 Filing 144 Unopposed MOTION for Oral Argument re #121 Opposed MOTION to Sever Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case by Gurbir S. Grewal. (Low, Ronald)
March 29, 2021 Filing 143 Decision on Petition for WRIT OF CERTIORARI: DENIED by US Supreme Court (lt)
March 17, 2021 Filing 142 NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew A. Goldstein (Goldstein, Matthew)
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #140 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant NJAG's Reply in Support of its Motion to Sever and to Transfer Venue, (Dkt. 121), shall be limited to 10 pages. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fw)
February 3, 2021 Notice of Correction to Ronald Casey Low: re #140 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation and #141 Reply to Response to Motion. As of 7/28/20 when filing a Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations, the document that exceeds the page limit must be attached to the motion, and should not be filed as a separate docket event. Your filing will be added to the docket record by the Clerk's Office, if the Court grants your motion for leave. Please note this information for future filing purposes. (lt)
February 2, 2021 Filing 141 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Gurbir S. Grewal, re #121 Opposed MOTION to Sever Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Gurbir S. Grewal (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Low, Ronald)
February 2, 2021 Filing 140 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Gurbir S. Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Brief)(Low, Ronald)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #139 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Federal Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint within 60 days of this Court's ruling on the Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue, (Dkt. 121). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fw)
January 21, 2021 Filing 139 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #117 Amended Complaint, by Dictorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Newman, Lisa)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER GRANTING #133 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #137 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant NJAG shall file its Reply in support of its Motion to Sever and Transfer Case, (Dkt. 121), on or before February 2, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fw)
January 19, 2021 Filing 137 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #121 Opposed MOTION to Sever Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case by Gurbir S. Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald)
January 12, 2021 Filing 136 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Dictorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State, re #121 Opposed MOTION to Sever Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Gurbir S. Grewal (cc3)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #134 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Federal Defendants' response to Defendant Grewal's Motion to Sever and Transfer, (Dkt. 134-1), is limited to no more than 20 pages. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file Federal Defendants' response to Defendant Grewal's Motion to Sever and Transfer, (Dkt. 134-1). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fw)
January 11, 2021 Filing 135 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., re #121 Opposed MOTION to Sever Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Defendant Gurbir S. Grewal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Flores, Charles)
January 11, 2021 Filing 134 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation for Federal Defendants' Response to Grewal's Motion to Sever and Transfer by Dictorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Brief Federal Defendants' Opposition to Grewal's Motion to Sever and Transfer, #2 Proposed Order)(Newman, Lisa)
January 6, 2021 Filing 133 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Dictorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State. (Soskin, Eric)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #132 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Plainitffs shall respond to the Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue, (Dkt. 121), on or before January 11, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fw)
December 14, 2020 Filing 132 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #121 Opposed MOTION to Sever Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flores, Charles)
December 11, 2020 Filing 131 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defense Distributed Directorate of Defense Trade Controls (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 11, 2020 Filing 130 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defense Distributed US Department of State William Barr (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 11, 2020 Filing 129 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defense Distributed US State Department (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 11, 2020 Filing 128 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defense Distributed Sarah Heidema - Director of Policy Defense Trade Controls (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 11, 2020 Filing 127 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defense Distributed Summons issued to Mike Miller Acting Deputy Assistant Secretary of Defense Trade Controls (Goldstein, Matthew)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #126 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The Federal Defendants' shall respond to the Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue, (Dkt. 121), on or before January 11, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fw)
December 10, 2020 Filing 126 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #121 Opposed MOTION to Sever Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case by Dictorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, Michael R. Pompeo, United States Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Newman, Lisa)
December 3, 2020 Filing 125 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Defense Distributed, US Attorney served on 11/30/2020 #119 Summons Issued as to USA (Goldstein, Matthew) Modified on 12/3/2020 to correct event (td).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #120 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant NJAG's motion to sever and transfer venue is limited to no more than 20 pages. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fw)
November 25, 2020 Filing 124 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., re #120 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation filed by Defendant Gurbir S. Grewal (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flores, Charles)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #122 NJAG's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. NJAG shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint within 30 days of this Court's ruling on NJAG's Motion to Sever and to Transfer Venue. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (fw)
November 24, 2020 Filing 123 NOTICE Updated Certificate of Conference by Gurbir S. Grewal re #122 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #117 Amended Complaint, (Low, Ronald)
November 19, 2020 Filing 122 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #117 Amended Complaint, by Gurbir S. Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald)
November 19, 2020 Notice re #121 Opposed MOTION to Sever Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case , #120 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation . Effective 7/28/2020. When filing a Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations in the Austin Division, the document that exceeds the page limit should now be attached to the motion, and should no longer be filed as a separate docket event. Your filing will be added to the docket by the Clerks Office, if the Court grants your motion for leave. Please note this information for future filing purposes. (td)
November 18, 2020 Filing 121 Opposed MOTION to Sever , Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case by Gurbir S. Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald)
November 18, 2020 Filing 120 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Gurbir S. Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald)
November 17, 2020 Filing 119 Summons Issued as to Dictorate of Defense Trade Controls, Sarah Heidema, Mike Miller, United States Department of State, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (td)
November 17, 2020 Filing 118 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Goldstein, Matthew)
November 12, 2020 Notice of Correction: re #117 Second Amended Complaint. Pursuant to Section 5a(3) of the Districts Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, amended complaints that add parties are to be filed traditionally. Please take note for future filing purposes. (jv2)
November 10, 2020 Filing 117 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 COMPLAINT, #23 AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Defense Distributed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Flores, Charles) Modified on 11/12/2020 to add docket entry relationships, add new defendants (jv2).
September 28, 2020 Filing 116 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Status Conference held on 9/28/2020 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(td)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER, Telephone Status Conference set for 9/28/2020 09:40 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
September 11, 2020 Filing 114 Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE re #110 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Defense Distributed. ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment of the District Court is REVERSED, and the cause is REMANDED to the District Court for further proceedings in accordance with the opinion of this Court. (td)
December 23, 2019 Filing 113 Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE. ORDERED that the unopposed motion for partial dismissal of the appeal as to appellee Michael Feuer only is GRANTED. (td)
December 18, 2019 Filing 112 Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE. ORDERED that appellees unopposed motion for partial dismissal of the appeal as to Kathleen Jennings is GRANTED. (td)
December 18, 2019 Filing 111 Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE. ORDERED that appellees unopposed motion for partial dismissal of the appeal as to Andrew Cuomo is GRANTED.(td)
August 14, 2019 Certification of the Electronic Record on Appeal has been accepted by the 5th Circuit re Notice of Appeal. Attorneys are advised that they may now download the EROA from the Fifth Circuit CM/ECF site by following these instructions #here (td)
July 31, 2019 Filing 110 Appeal of Final Judgment #109 , #101 by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. ( Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0542-12417501) (Flores, Charles)
July 31, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL following #110 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0542-12417501. Per 5th Circuit rules, the appellant has 14 days, from the filing of the Notice of Appeal, to order the transcript. To order a transcript, the appellant should fill out #Form DKT-13 (Transcript Order) and follow the instructions set out on the form. This form is available in the Clerk's Office or by clicking the hyperlink above. (td)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER DENYING #102 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
March 7, 2019 Filing 108 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., re #102 MOTION to Amend Judgment filed by Plaintiff Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Plaintiff Defense Distributed (Flores, Charles)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #106 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of #107 , this motion is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
March 6, 2019 Filing 107 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Matthew Denn, Gurbir S. Grewal, re #102 MOTION to Amend Judgment filed by Plaintiff Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Plaintiff Defense Distributed (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald)
March 6, 2019 Filing 106 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #102 MOTION to Amend Judgment by Matthew Denn, Gurbir S. Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald)
March 6, 2019 Filing 105 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Michael Feuer, re #102 MOTION to Amend Judgment filed by Plaintiff Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Plaintiff Defense Distributed (Walsh, Michael)
March 6, 2019 Filing 104 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Josh Shapiro, Thomas Wolf, re #102 MOTION to Amend Judgment filed by Plaintiff Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Plaintiff Defense Distributed (Cabello, J.)
March 4, 2019 Filing 103 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Andrew Cuomo, re #102 MOTION to Amend Judgment filed by Plaintiff Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Plaintiff Defense Distributed (Bexley, Tyler)
February 27, 2019 Filing 102 MOTION to Amend Judgment by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Flores, Charles)
January 30, 2019 Filing 101 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING #50 Defendant Michael Feuer's Motion to Dismiss. ORDER GRANTING #55 Defendant Andrew M. Cuomo's Motion to Dismiss. ORDER GRANTING #57 Defendants Gurbir S. Grewal and Matthew Denn's Motion to Dismiss. ORDER GRANTING #75 Defendants Thomas Wolf and Josh Shapiro's Motion to Dismiss. ORDER DENYING #67 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiffs claims against all Defendants. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (lt)
January 28, 2019 Filing 99 Transcript filed of Proceedings held on January 15, 2019, Proceedings Transcribed: Preliminary Injunction. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela J. Andasola, pjandasola@comcast.net, Telephone number: (210) 244-5038. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 2/18/2019, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/28/2019, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/29/2019, (Andasola, Pamela)
January 18, 2019 Filing 98 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Preliminary Injunction Hearing Question by Gurbir S. Grewal. (Low, Ronald)
January 15, 2019 Filing 97 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Motion Hearing held on 1/15/2019 re #67 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Defense Distributed (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(td)
January 15, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. re #67 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Flores, Charles)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING #94 Motion by Shelbi Flood to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
January 14, 2019 Filing 94 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald Casey Low on behalf of Shelbi Flood ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11643054) by on behalf of Matthew Denn, Gurbir S. Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Low, Ronald)
January 10, 2019 Filing 93 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Telephone Conference held on 1/10/2019 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(td)
January 9, 2019 Filing 92 Sealed Document filed. (td)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 1/10/2019 at 11:30 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #88 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
January 4, 2019 Filing 90 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Josh Shapiro, Thomas Wolf, re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1), 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Thomas Wolf, Defendant Josh Shapiro (Cabello, J.)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING #77 Motion for Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #74 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
January 2, 2019 Filing 88 Motion for leave to File Sealed Document. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (dm)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION Hearing for 1/15/2019 10:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
December 28, 2018 Filing 86 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., re #75 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1), 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6) filed by Defendant Thomas Wolf, Defendant Josh Shapiro (Flores, Charles)
December 28, 2018 Filing 85 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth W. Taber on behalf of Matthew Denn (Taber, Kenneth)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING #80 Motion by Alexander D. Hardiman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
December 26, 2018 Filing 83 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., re #67 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Plaintiff Defense Distributed (Flores, Charles)
December 21, 2018 Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Matthew Denn, Gurbir S. Grewal, re #57 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Matthew Denn, Defendant Gurbir S. Grewal (Low, Ronald)
December 21, 2018 Filing 81 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald Casey Low on behalf of Matthew Denn (Low, Ronald)
December 21, 2018 Filing 80 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald Casey Low for Alexander D. Hardiman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11584172) by on behalf of Matthew Denn, Gurbir S. Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Low, Ronald)
December 19, 2018 Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Andrew Cuomo, re #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the First Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(1), Rule 1(b)(2), and Rule 12(b)(3) filed by Defendant Andrew Cuomo (Bexley, Tyler)
December 18, 2018 Filing 78 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Gurbir S. Grewal, re #67 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Plaintiff Defense Distributed (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald)
December 14, 2018 Filing 77 MOTION Michael Feuer's Request for Judicial Notice re #50 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Michael Feuer. (Chan, Connie)
December 14, 2018 Filing 76 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Michael Feuer, re #50 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Michael Feuer (Chan, Connie)
December 14, 2018 Filing 75 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(1), 12(B)(2) and 12(B)(6) by Josh Shapiro, Thomas Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Cabello, J.)
December 14, 2018 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the First Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(1), Rule 1(b)(2), and Rule 12(b)(3) by Andrew Cuomo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marketos, Peter)
December 12, 2018 Filing 73 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., re #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the First Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(1), Rule 1(b)(2), and Rule 12(b)(3) filed by Defendant Andrew Cuomo, #57 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Matthew Denn, Defendant Gurbir S. Grewal (Flores, Charles)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING #71 Motion by Benjamin D. Tievsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
December 11, 2018 Filing 71 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald Casey Low for Benjamin D. Tievsky ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11539781) by on behalf of Matthew Denn, Gurbir S. Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING IN PART #70 Defendant Grewal's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #67 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Having considered the motion, the Court will grant a one-week extension for Defendant to file its response. No further extensions of time will be granted. Defendant's response is due on or before December 18, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
December 10, 2018 Filing 70 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #67 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Gurbir S. Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING #66 Second Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
December 6, 2018 Filing 68 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel N. Hammond on behalf of Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Hammond, Daniel)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #61 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Cuomo's Motion to Dismiss #55 entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Plaintiffs' response is due on or before December 12, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #62 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Grewal and Denn's Motion to Dismiss #57 entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Plaintiffs' response is due on or before December 12, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #63 Defendants Grewal and Denn's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiffs' response to Defendants' motion to dismiss #57 entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendants' reply is due on or before December 21, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #64 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages entered by Judge Robert Pitman. The Court grants this motion in order to dispose of Plaintiffs' motion for temporary restraining order #66 as efficiently as possible. No further page limit extensions will be granted in this matter. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
December 4, 2018 Filing 67 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(td)
December 4, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flores, Charles)
December 4, 2018 Filing 65 APPENDIX to #67 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52)(Flores, Charles) Modified on 12/4/2018 (td).
December 4, 2018 Filing 64 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation re: Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Preliminary Injunction, #3 Proposed Order)(Flores, Charles)
December 4, 2018 Notice of Correction: re #64 Opposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation re: Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. When filing a Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations in the AUSTIN Division, the document which exceeds the page limit should NOT be attached to the motion, but rather filed as a separate pleading. We will take the necessary steps to pull the Motion for preliminary injunction from the Motion for leave to exceed page limit and get it added to the docket record. No further action is required. Please note this information for future filing purposes. (td)
November 30, 2018 Filing 63 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #57 MOTION to Dismiss by Matthew Denn, Gurbir S. Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald)
November 29, 2018 Filing 62 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #57 MOTION to Dismiss by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flores, Charles)
November 29, 2018 Filing 61 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the First Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(1), Rule 1(b)(2), and Rule 12(b)(3) by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flores, Charles)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #56 Defendant Matthew Denn's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #27 Defendant Feuer's Motion to Dismiss entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #23 , the motion is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #60 Defendant Michael Feuer's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint entered by Judge Robert Pitman. Defendant's reply is due on or before December 14, 2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Text Order MOOTING #28 Defendant Feuer's Motion entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #23 , the motion is MOOT. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjr)
November 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Michael Feuer answer due 12/14/2018. (lt)
November 26, 2018 Filing 60 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #50 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Michael Feuer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chan, Connie)
November 23, 2018 Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., re #50 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant Michael Feuer (Flores, Charles) Modified on 12/17/2018 to correct link and amend text (td).
November 21, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald Casey Low on behalf of Matthew Denn (Low, Ronald)
November 21, 2018 Filing 57 MOTION to Dismiss by Matthew Denn, Gurbir S. Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald)
November 20, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Matthew Denn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Low, Ronald)
November 19, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction the First Amended Complaint Pursuant to F.R.C.P. Rule 12(b)(1), Rule 1(b)(2), and Rule 12(b)(3) by Andrew Cuomo. (Marketos, Peter)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #51 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING #52 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dl)
November 9, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Proposed Order)(Flores, Charles)
November 6, 2018 Filing 51 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #50 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint and to Extend Page Limits by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flores, Charles)
October 26, 2018 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Michael Feuer. (Walsh, Michael)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re #46 Stipulation filed by Gurbir S. Grewal; Gurbir S. Grewal answer due 11/21/2018. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
October 19, 2018 Filing 48 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Defense Distributed as to Andrew Cuomo. Waiver sent on 9/18/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Flores, Charles)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING #45 Motion by Kenneth W. Taber to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
October 19, 2018 Filing 46 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Gurbir S. Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Low, Ronald)
October 19, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ronald Casey Low for Kenneth Taber (Filing fee $100 receipt number 0542-11362025) by on behalf of Gurbir S. Grewal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Low, Ronald)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING #37 Motion by John D. Kimball to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
October 18, 2018 Filing 43 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ronald Casey Low on behalf of Gurbir S. Grewal. Attorney Ronald Casey Low added to party Gurbir S. Grewal(pty:dft) (Low, Ronald)
October 17, 2018 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. Replaces document 40 #40 Certificate of Service (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 17, 2018 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. of Michael Feuer (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 17, 2018 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. of Los Angeles City Attorney (Goldstein, Matthew)
October 16, 2018 Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Defense Distributed as to Josh Shapiro. Waiver sent on 10/15/2018, answer due 12/14/2018; Thomas Wolf. Waiver sent on 10/15/2018, answer due 12/14/2018. (Flores, Charles)
October 16, 2018 Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Second Amendment Foundation, Inc., Defense Distributed as to Matthew Denn. Waiver sent on 9/18/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. (Flores, Charles)
October 15, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by J. David Cabello , [John D. Kimball-Blank Rome LLP], ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11341013) by on behalf of Josh Shapiro, Thomas Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Motion Pro Hac Vice [John D. Kimball-Blank Rome LLP])(Cabello, J.)
October 15, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. David Cabello on behalf of Josh Shapiro, Thomas Wolf. Attorney J. David Cabello added to party Josh Shapiro(pty:dft), Attorney J. David Cabello added to party Thomas Wolf(pty:dft) (Cabello, J.)
September 28, 2018 Filing 35 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Flores, Charles)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING #26 Motion by Connie K. Chan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion by James P. Clark to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING #24 Motion by Michael M. Walsh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #29 & #30 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
September 19, 2018 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flores, Charles)
September 19, 2018 Filing 29 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flores, Charles)
September 17, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION Michael Feuer's Request for Judicial Notice re #27 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), and Texas Civil Practice & Remedies Code Sec. 27.003 by Michael Feuer. (Steed, Jason)
September 17, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6), and Texas Civil Practice & Remedies Code Sec. 27.003 by Michael Feuer. (Steed, Jason)
September 17, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason P. Steed for Connie K. Chan ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11237635) by on behalf of Michael Feuer. (Steed, Jason)
September 17, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason P. Steed for James P. Clark ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11237600) by on behalf of Michael Feuer. (Steed, Jason)
September 17, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason P. Steed for Michael M. Walsh ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11237340) by on behalf of Michael Feuer. (Steed, Jason)
September 17, 2018 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending #1 Complaint,., filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Raffetto, Mary)
September 14, 2018 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. as to Gurbir S. Grewal. Waiver sent on 8/23/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
September 11, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. Service of Michael Feuer In his capacity of LA City Attorney (Goldstein, Matthew)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion by Matthew A. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion by Charles R. Flores to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion by Daniel N. Hammond to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (td)
August 29, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc. Corrected Certificate of Service for #3 Notice of Appearance, (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 24, 2018 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Michael Feuer. (td)
August 23, 2018 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 23, 2018 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Michael Feuer. (td)
August 22, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan F. Mitchell on behalf of Matthew Goldstein ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11135901) by on behalf of Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mary Kathryn Raffetto of Charles R. Flores ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11134380) by on behalf of Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order-Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles R. Flores)(Raffetto, Mary)
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mary Kathryn Raffetto for Daniel N. Hammond ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-11134307) by on behalf of Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order to Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Daniel N., Hammond)(Raffetto, Mary)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mary Kathryn Raffetto on behalf of Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Attorney Mary Kathryn Raffetto added to party Defense Distributed(pty:pla), Attorney Mary Kathryn Raffetto added to party Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.(pty:pla) (Raffetto, Mary)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Michael Feuer, Gurbir S. Grewal. (td)
August 17, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
August 17, 2018 Filing 6 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Jonathan F. Mitchell: re #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. (td)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Mitchell, Jonathan)
July 31, 2018 Filing 4 DEFICIENCY NOTICE to Jonathan F. Mitchell: re #3 Notice of Appearance. (td)
July 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan F. Mitchell on behalf of Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell added to party Defense Distributed(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell added to party Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.(pty:pla) (Mitchell, Jonathan)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 Letter to Alan Gura re: Non-Admitted Status.(afd)
July 29, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (afd)
July 29, 2018 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (afd)
July 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11059998). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Defense Distributed, Second Amendment Foundation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Blackman, Joshua) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/30/2018 to flatten image) (afd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED et al v. GREWAL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: ALAN GURA
Represented By: JOSH BLACKMAN
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEFENSE DISTRIBUTED
Represented By: ALAN GURA
Represented By: JOSH BLACKMAN
Represented By: DANIEL L. SCHMUTTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Denn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dictorate of Defense Trade Controls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL R. POMPEO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Heidema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW CUOMO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GURBIR S GREWAL
Represented By: TIM SHEEHAN
Represented By: ERIN HODGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHV THOMAS WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSH SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL FEUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?