MARINACCIO v. WALSH
Plaintiff: PAUL MARINACCIO
Defendant: JANE DOE(S) 1-12, CLERK WILLIAM T WALSH, DISTRICT COURT CLERK, CLERK'S OFFICE WORKERS, WILLIAM T. WALSH, COURT CLERK SUPERVISOR JANE JOE and CLERK'S OFFICE WORKERS JANE DOE(S) 1-12
Case Number: 3:2021cv11167
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
2 Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. Magistrate Judge Z. N. Quraishi no longer assigned to case. (mg)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The rule 16 conference call on for 6/29/2021 is hereby adjourned to 8/12/2021 at 1:30 p.m. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 6/16/2021. (kas)
June 14, 2021 Filing 7 Letter to Judge Quraishi regarding 5/17/2021 ORDER from PAUL MARINACCIO. (mg)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER ORDER granting Defendant's request for an extension of time until 7/23/2021 to respond to the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 5/24/2021. (jmh)
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT against CLERK'S OFFICE WORKERS, DISTRICT COURT CLERK, JANE DOE(S) 1-12, and WILLIAM T WALSH, filed by PAUL MARINACCIO. (Attachments: #1 Strikethrough Amended Complaint, #2 Letter & Certificate of Service)(jmh)
May 21, 2021 Filing 4 Letter from AUSA Frances Bajada. (BAJADA, FRANCES)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/29/2021 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 6/29/2021. (jmh)
May 13, 2021 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Zahid N. Quraishi added. (mg)
May 13, 2021 Filing 2 Certification on behalf of WILLIAM T WALSH. (BAJADA, FRANCES)
May 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WILLIAM T WALSH from Superior Court of New Jersey, case number ESX-L-8760-20., filed by WILLIAM T WALSH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Certificate of Service)(BAJADA, FRANCES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MARINACCIO v. WALSH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE(S) 1-12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLERK WILLIAM T WALSH
Represented By: FRANCES C. BAJADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTRICT COURT CLERK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLERK'S OFFICE WORKERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM T. WALSH
Represented By: FRANCES C. BAJADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COURT CLERK SUPERVISOR JANE JOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLERK'S OFFICE WORKERS JANE DOE(S) 1-12
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL MARINACCIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?