PAXTON v. PROVENTION BIO, INC. et al
Plaintiff: ADAM PAXTON
Defendant: ASHLEIGH PALMER, PROVENTION BIO, INC. and ANDREW DRECHSLER
Petitioner: Theo Sher and GEORGE L. JORDAN, JR.
Case Number: 3:2021cv11613
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN and HOOD J. ALEXANDER, II, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (abr, )
July 21, 2021 Filing 26 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice J. Alexander Hood II to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12650039.) (PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
July 21, 2021 Filing 25 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jeremy A. Lieberman to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12650004.) (PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
July 21, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE by Theo Sher re #22 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Theo Sher MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION OF THEO SHER TO APPOINT LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVE SELECTION OF COUNSEL (ROSEN, LAURENCE)
July 21, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #23 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lead Plaintiff Attorney: Thomas H. Przybylowski., #22 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Theo Sher MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A.. Motion set for 8/16/2021 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff , MOTION to Appoint Counsel Lead Plaintiff Attorney: Thomas H. Przybylowski. by GEORGE L. JORDAN, JR.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Declaration with Exhibits A-E)(PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
July 20, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Appoint Lead Plaintiff Theo Sher, MOTION to Appoint Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. by Theo Sher. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Brief, #3 Declaration of Laurence M. Rosen, #4 Exhibit 1 - PSLRA Early Notice, #5 Exhibit 2 - PSLRA Certification, #6 Exhibit 3 - Loss Chart, #7 Exhibit 4 - Firm Resume)(ROSEN, LAURENCE)
July 9, 2021 Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sara A. Bellin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12618093.) (ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
July 9, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Daniel V. McCaughey to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12618064.) (ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
July 9, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, Daniel V. McCaughey and SARA A. BELLIN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting pro hac vice admissions as to Daniel V. McCaughey. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/7/2021. (abr, )
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting pro hac admissions as to Sara A. Bellin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/7/2021. (abr, )
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER concerning time to respond to Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 7/6/2021. (abr, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 16 Letter from Yenis Argueta Guevara, re: application for admission pro hac vice. (Attachments: #1 Application and Certification of Yenis V. Argueta Guevara in Support of the Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel V. McCaughey and Sara A. Bellin, #2 Certification of Admission and Good Standing of Daniel V. McCaughey in Support of the Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #3 Certification of Admission and Good Standing of Sara A. Bellin in Support of the Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #4 [Proposed] Order Granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Daniel V. McCaughey, #5 [Proposed] Order Granting Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sara A. Bellin, #6 Certificate of Service)(ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
July 2, 2021 Filing 15 STATEMENT Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7.1.1 by ANDREW DRECHSLER, ASHLEIGH PALMER, PROVENTION BIO, INC.. (ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
July 2, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROVENTION BIO, INC.. (ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
July 2, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from Yenis V. Argueta Guevara. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Concerning Time to Respond to the Complaint)(ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
July 2, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by YENIS V. ARGUETA GUEVARA on behalf of ANDREW DRECHSLER, ASHLEIGH PALMER, PROVENTION BIO, INC. (ARGUETA GUEVARA, YENIS)
July 1, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ADAM PAXTON. ANDREW DRECHSLER waiver sent on 5/27/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
July 1, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ADAM PAXTON. ASHLEIGH PALMER waiver sent on 5/27/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ADAM PAXTON. PROVENTION BIO, INC. waiver sent on 5/27/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to J. ALEXANDER HOOD II. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/23/2021. (abr, )
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to JEREMY A. LIEBERMAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 6/23/2021. (abr, )
June 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ADAM PAXTON. (Attachments: #1 Certification Thomas Przybylowski, #2 Declaration J. Alexander Hood II, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order)(PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
June 11, 2021 Filing 5 Exhibit to #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ADAM PAXTON. (PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ADAM PAXTON. (Attachments: #1 Certification Thomas Przybylowski, #2 Declaration Jeremy A. Lieberman, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order)(PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
June 11, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 7/6/2021 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
May 21, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ANDREW DRECHSLER, ASHLEIGH PALMER, PROVENTION BIO, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Summons to be Issued by ADAM PAXTON as to ANDREW DRECHSLER, ASHLEIGH PALMER, PROVENTION BIO, INC.. (PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW DRECHSLER, ASHLEIGH PALMER, PROVENTION BIO, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12483578) with JURY DEMAND, filed by ADAM PAXTON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PRZYBYLOWSKI, THOMAS)
May 21, 2021 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAXTON v. PROVENTION BIO, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM PAXTON
Represented By: THOMAS HENRY PRZYBYLOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHLEIGH PALMER
Represented By: YENIS V. ARGUETA GUEVARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PROVENTION BIO, INC.
Represented By: YENIS V. ARGUETA GUEVARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW DRECHSLER
Represented By: YENIS V. ARGUETA GUEVARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Theo Sher
Represented By: LAURENCE M. ROSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GEORGE L. JORDAN, JR.
Represented By: THOMAS HENRY PRZYBYLOWSKI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?