UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FRIDMAN
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: ZELIK FRIDMAN
Case Number: 3:2021cv12090
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. ZELIK FRIDMAN served on 6/11/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (YUREKLI, GOKCE)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by ALEXANDER ROY KALYNIUK on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (KALYNIUK, ALEXANDER)
June 3, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ZELIK FRIDMAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
June 3, 2021 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ZELIK FRIDMAN, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(YUREKLI, GOKCE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FRIDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZELIK FRIDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: GOKCE TUGCE YUREKLI
Represented By: ALEXANDER ROY KALYNIUK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?