Feher et al v. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Barbara Feher, JOSE GOMEZ, Trinidad Acosta, Taskin Al-Badee, Pamela Albach, DORINE ALEXANDER, Valerie Alexander, KATHRYN ANDERSON, SHIRLEY ANDERSON, Vanna Andrews, Karen Angel, Diana Aparicio, Jeffrey Arp, Fred Casey, Sandra Arwick, Lani Ayala, Helen Elaine Baker, Jerry Barocas, SHARON BARRETT, MEDA BARTEL, Alana Barton, DARLENE BAUMANN, Claudette Beaulieu, Andrew Becker, MARIA BENITEZ, ELIZABETH BENNETT, DONNA BENTLE, Marilyn Berger, Guy Hesse, Lucile Berry, Blanca Betancourt, DIANNA BLACK, Kim Rutledge, Angela Bomba, Lori Bonheyo, Marsha Boone, SHIRLEY BOOTH, Daphne Bowers, LISA BOWLING, Sandra Bracey, Joan Branch, Donna Brannon, Heather Brayton, Faye Brazeale, Catherine Bredemeier, Yvonne Britten, Gloria Britton, Cynthia Brooks, Becky Brown, Joan E. Browning, Browning Bruhn, Bernadine Ousley, SHIRLEY BRYANT, Shirely Buelow, Katie Buie, Cary White, Brenda Burns, Dorothy Burns, Carl Burns, Sandra Sue Burns, Patricia M. Byrd, Dawn Cain, Betty Calhoun, Shelia Callahan, Delphine Camarillo, PH.D. MARGARET CAMPBELL, VICTOR CARDENAS, Amanda Carlton, Sherry L. Carmen, DEBRA CARRIUOLO, Joe Castillo, Leigh Ann Chamberlin, Delores Chenault, Michelle Christenson, Mary Lou Christophersen, Jill A. Graves, Gisela Cintron Rodriguez, Anabel Cisneros, Deborah Clatterbuck, Loni Cole, Billie Coleman, Hope Colling, LORENE MOORE, Frieda Collins, Clara Coombes, Deena Corkins, Dreama Couchman, Teresa Coward, Linda Crawhorn, JOHN MOORE, Liberty Cropper, Nancy Crowe, Brittany Smosny, Shanna Cruz, Susan Cruze and TINA CULPEPPER
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC., PTI Union, LLC doing business as Pharma Tech Industries and PTI Royston, LLC doing business as Pharma Tech Industries
In Re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Case Number: 3:2021cv13451
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #43 MOTION to Dismiss : Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement, #42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 9/7/2021 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb, )
August 9, 2021 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss : Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement by PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement, #2 Certification of Caroline M. Tinsley, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
August 9, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Renewed Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #2 Certification of Caroline M. Tinsley, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Text of Proposed Order)(TINSLEY, CAROLINE)
August 9, 2021 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN)
August 9, 2021 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. (JAMES, SCOTT)
August 6, 2021 Filing 39 Short Form Complaint by Barbara Feher. (ROBINSON, MARK)
July 19, 2021 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by JANET LYNN POLETTO on behalf of PTI Royston, LLC (POLETTO, JANET)
July 19, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by JANET LYNN POLETTO on behalf of PTI Union, LLC (POLETTO, JANET)
July 9, 2021 Filing 36 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (km)
July 9, 2021 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC. (JAMES, SCOTT)
July 9, 2021 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal, )
July 8, 2021 Filing 34 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00767. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: District of New Jersey. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DJO)
July 8, 2021 Filing 32 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-261) regarding MDL No. 2738 IN RE: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (DJO)
July 1, 2021 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Specially Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (NEP)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions of defendants PTI Royston, LLC, and PTI Union, LLC, to join the Johnson & Johnson parties' motion to stay #19 and #26 are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 07/01/2021. (LXC)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of Defendant PTI Roston, LLC,for leave to file overlength memorandum in support of motion to dismiss #18 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 07/01/2021. (LXC)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion of the Johnson & Johnson parties for leave to file overlength memorandum in support of motion to dismiss #4 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 07/01/2021. (LXC)
July 1, 2021 Filing 27 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PTI Union, LLC.. (Tinsley, Caroline)
July 1, 2021 Filing 26 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
July 1, 2021 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #24 MOTION to Sever Claims filed by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Tinsley, Caroline)
July 1, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION to Sever Claims by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
July 1, 2021 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Party : Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Tinsley, Caroline)
July 1, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Party : Defendant PTI Union, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
July 1, 2021 Filing 21 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Tinsley for Defendant PTI Union, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
July 1, 2021 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC.. (Tinsley, Caroline)
July 1, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Joinder in Johnson & Johnson Defendants' Motion to Stay All Proceedings by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
July 1, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation : Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion for Leave to File its Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim in Excess of the Page Limitation by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Specially-Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Tinsley, Caroline)
July 1, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Specially Appearing Defendant PTI Royston, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Petition for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Failure to State a Claim by Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
July 1, 2021 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by Caroline M. Tinsley for Defendant PTI Royston, LLC. (Tinsley, Caroline)
June 28, 2021 Filing 15 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 7/8/2021. (KEK)
June 25, 2021 Filing 14 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (Potter, Jacob)
June 25, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #12 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bauer, Beth)
June 25, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
June 25, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Inc..(Bauer, Beth)
June 25, 2021 Filing 10 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Mark P. Robinson, Jr. Review of case shows that Attorney Mark P. Robinson, Jr is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (BAK)
June 25, 2021 Filing 9 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court, St. Louis County Missouri, filed by Kim Rutledge, Dianna Black, John Moore, Betty Calhoun, Alana Barton, Joe Castillo, Valerie Alexander, Loni Cole, Elizabeth Bennett, Jerry Barocas, Leigh Ann Chamberlin, Lani Ayala, Faye Brazeale, Katie Buie, Frieda Collins, Michelle Christenson, Donna Bentle, Susan Cruze, Brenda Burns, Patricia M. Byrd, Meda Bartel, Nancy Crowe, Linda Crawhorn, Vanna Andrews, Blanca Betancourt, Lori Bonheyo, Karen Angel, Liberty Cropper, Anabel Cisneros, Cynthia Brooks, Dreama Couchman, Brittany Smosny, Gisela Cintron Rodriguez, Guy Hesse, Delphine Camarillo, Joan E. Browning, Lisa Bowling, Shelia Callahan, Dorothy Burns, Joan Branch, Diana Aparicio, Sandra Arwick, Bernadine Ousley, Billie Coleman, Sandra Sue Burns, Cary White, Delores Chenault, Margaret Campbell, Catherine Bredemeier, Jill A. Graves, Deena Corkins, Sharon Barrett, Dawn Cain, Shirely Buelow, Victor Cardenas, Debra Carriuolo, Amanda Carlton, Jose Gomez, Helen Elaine Baker, Barbara Feher, Teresa Coward, Lucile Berry, Hope Colling, Maria Benitez, Marilyn Berger, Lorene Moore, Mary Lou Christophersen, Sandra Bracey, Fred Casey, Carl Burns, Sherry L. Carmen, Becky Brown, Andrew Becker, Shirley Bryant, Deborah Clatterbuck, Darlene Baumann, Donna Brannon, Yvonne Britten, Claudette Beaulieu, Jeffrey Arp, Tina Culpepper, Dorine Alexander, Clara Coombes, Marsha Boone, Trinidad Acosta, Shanna Cruz, Shirley Anderson, Browning Bruhn, Gloria Britton, Kathryn Anderson, Daphne Bowers, Taskin Al-Badee, Angela Bomba, Shirley Booth, Heather Brayton, Pamela Albach.(BAK)
June 25, 2021 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc... (Bauer, Beth)
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Johnson & Johnson.. (Bauer, Beth)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Bauer, Beth)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation for Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Bauer, Beth)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Bauer, Beth)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Dyer Kellett for Defendants Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Kellett, Mary Elizabeth)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis County, State of MO, case number 21SL-CC01801, with receipt number AMOEDC-8722889, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Criminal Cover Sheet, #8 Original Filing Form)(Bauer, Beth)
June 25, 2021 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. (BAK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feher et al v. Johnson & Johnson, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Dyer Kellett
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC.
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Dyer Kellett
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES INC.
Represented By: Beth A. Bauer
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Dyer Kellett
Represented By: KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER
Represented By: SCOTT A. JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Union, LLC doing business as Pharma Tech Industries
Represented By: CAROLINE M. TINSLEY
Represented By: JANET LYNN POLETTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTI Royston, LLC doing business as Pharma Tech Industries
Represented By: CAROLINE M. TINSLEY
Represented By: JANET LYNN POLETTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Feher
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSE GOMEZ
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trinidad Acosta
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taskin Al-Badee
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Albach
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DORINE ALEXANDER
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Alexander
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHRYN ANDERSON
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY ANDERSON
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanna Andrews
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Angel
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Aparicio
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Arp
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Casey
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Arwick
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lani Ayala
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Elaine Baker
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Barocas
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON BARRETT
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDA BARTEL
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana Barton
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARLENE BAUMANN
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudette Beaulieu
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Becker
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA BENITEZ
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH BENNETT
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA BENTLE
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Berger
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Hesse
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucile Berry
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Betancourt
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANNA BLACK
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Rutledge
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Bomba
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Bonheyo
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Boone
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY BOOTH
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphne Bowers
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA BOWLING
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Bracey
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Branch
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Brannon
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Brayton
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye Brazeale
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Bredemeier
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvonne Britten
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Britton
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Brooks
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Brown
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan E. Browning
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Browning Bruhn
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadine Ousley
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY BRYANT
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirely Buelow
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katie Buie
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary White
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Burns
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Burns
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Burns
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Sue Burns
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia M. Byrd
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dawn Cain
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Calhoun
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelia Callahan
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delphine Camarillo
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PH.D. MARGARET CAMPBELL
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTOR CARDENAS
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Carlton
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherry L. Carmen
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA CARRIUOLO
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Castillo
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh Ann Chamberlin
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delores Chenault
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Christenson
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lou Christophersen
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill A. Graves
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gisela Cintron Rodriguez
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anabel Cisneros
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Clatterbuck
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loni Cole
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie Coleman
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Colling
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORENE MOORE
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frieda Collins
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clara Coombes
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deena Corkins
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dreama Couchman
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Coward
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Crawhorn
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MOORE
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Cropper
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Crowe
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Smosny
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanna Cruz
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Cruze
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TINA CULPEPPER
Represented By: Craig Anthony Schlapprizzi
Represented By: MARK P ROBINSON, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?