DAVIS v. SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: MR LESTER DAVIS
Defendant: SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION D/B/A SIX FLAGS, SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE, LLC, S&S - SANSEI TECHNOLOGIES, S&S WORLDWIDE, INC. A/K/ S&S POWER, INC., ROCKY MOUNTAIN CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. d/b/a ROCKY MOUNTAIN CONSTRUCTION, JOHN/JANE, 1-10 DOES, S&S WORLDWIDE, INC., SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION doing business as SIX FLAGS AND/OR SIX FLAGS THEME PARK, S&S POWER INC. and ROCKY MOUNTAIN CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. doing business as ROCKY MOUNTAIN CONSTRUCTION
Case Number: 3:2021cv14650
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Peter G Sheridan
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal as to SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION without prejudice. Signed by Judge Peter G. Sheridan on 09/20/2021. (jdb)
September 20, 2021 Set Deadline as to #7 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Motion set for 10/18/2021 before Judge Peter G. Sheridan. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION, SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE, LLC. Responses due by 10/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion, #2 Order, #3 Brief Brief In Support of Motion, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A)(EICHENBAUM, HEATHER)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Partial) by SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION. (EICHENBAUM, HEATHER)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by LESTER DAVIS. SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE, LLC served on 8/27/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (GREGORIO, ALAINA)
August 6, 2021 Filing 4 Exhibit to #2 Amended Complaint by LESTER DAVIS. (GREGORIO, ALAINA)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ROCKY MOUNTAIN CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC., S&S - SANSEI TECHNOLOGIES, S&S WORLDWIDE, INC., SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION, SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
August 6, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: In the future when choosing parties please choose each party individually. Do NOT select the ALL PLAINTIFFS or ALL DEFENDANTS button . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
August 6, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
August 6, 2021 Judge Peter G. Sheridan and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
August 6, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (mg)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by LESTER DAVIS.(GREGORIO, ALAINA)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12693705) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LESTER DAVIS.(GREGORIO, ALAINA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MR LESTER DAVIS
Represented By: ALAINA A. GREGORIO, ESQ.
Represented By: JOSEPH L. MESSA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION D/B/A SIX FLAGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE, LLC
Represented By: HEATHER M. EICHENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&S - SANSEI TECHNOLOGIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&S WORLDWIDE, INC. A/K/ S&S POWER, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKY MOUNTAIN CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. d/b/a ROCKY MOUNTAIN CONSTRUCTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN/JANE, 1-10 DOES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&S WORLDWIDE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION doing business as SIX FLAGS AND/OR SIX FLAGS THEME PARK
Represented By: HEATHER M. EICHENBAUM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&S POWER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKY MOUNTAIN CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. doing business as ROCKY MOUNTAIN CONSTRUCTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?