GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. et al v. ELKHOLY, M.D. et al
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY and GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
Defendant: WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D., PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C., PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C., PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C., ASHRAF SAKR, M.D., FOUAD KARAM, D.C., LUIS RAMIREZ-PACHECO, M.D., LYDIA SHAJENKO, M.D., STUART ATKIN, M.D., MEHRDAD LANGROUDI, M.D., CHANG LEE, M.D., KHALED MORSI, M.D. and MONICA JOHNSON, N.P.
Case Number: 3:2021cv16255
Filed: August 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2021 Filing 26 Letter from Richard B. Robins. (Attachments: #1 Consent Order)(ROBINS, RICHARD)
October 21, 2021 Filing 25 Letter from Richard B. Robins. (Attachments: #1 Consent Order)(ROBINS, RICHARD)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time, until 10/25/2021, for Defendants to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/1/2021. (jdb)
September 29, 2021 Filing 23 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by All Defendants. (CONFORTI, DAMIAN)
September 28, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMED NABULSI on behalf of All Defendants (NABULSI, MOHAMED)
September 28, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD B. ROBINS on behalf of All Defendants (ROBINS, RICHARD)
September 28, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by DAMIAN P. CONFORTI on behalf of All Defendants (CONFORTI, DAMIAN)
September 28, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW GIMIGLIANO on behalf of All Defendants (GIMIGLIANO, ANDREW)
September 23, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW GIMIGLIANO on behalf of WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D., MONICA JOHNSON, N.P., FOUAD KARAM, D.C., MEHRDAD LANGROUDI, M.D., KHALED MORSI, M.D., PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C., PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C., PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C., ASHRAF SAKR, M.D., LYDIA SHAJENKO, M.D. (GIMIGLIANO, ANDREW)
September 23, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by DAMIAN P. CONFORTI on behalf of WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D., MONICA JOHNSON, N.P., FOUAD KARAM, D.C., MEHRDAD LANGROUDI, M.D., KHALED MORSI, M.D., PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C., PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C., PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C., ASHRAF SAKR, M.D., LYDIA SHAJENKO, M.D. (CONFORTI, DAMIAN)
September 23, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMED NABULSI on behalf of WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D., MONICA JOHNSON, N.P., FOUAD KARAM, D.C., MEHRDAD LANGROUDI, M.D., KHALED MORSI, M.D., PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C., PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C., PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C., ASHRAF SAKR, M.D., LYDIA SHAJENKO, M.D. (NABULSI, MOHAMED)
September 23, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD B. ROBINS on behalf of WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D., MONICA JOHNSON, N.P., FOUAD KARAM, D.C., MEHRDAD LANGROUDI, M.D., KHALED MORSI, M.D., PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C., PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C., PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C., ASHRAF SAKR, M.D., LYDIA SHAJENKO, M.D. (ROBINS, RICHARD)
September 22, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. STUART ATKIN, M.D. served on 9/19/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
September 21, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW GIMIGLIANO on behalf of WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D., FOUAD KARAM, D.C., MEHRDAD LANGROUDI, M.D., KHALED MORSI, M.D., PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C., PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C., PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C., ASHRAF SAKR, M.D., LYDIA SHAJENKO, M.D. (GIMIGLIANO, ANDREW)
September 21, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by DAMIAN P. CONFORTI on behalf of WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D., FOUAD KARAM, D.C., MEHRDAD LANGROUDI, M.D., KHALED MORSI, M.D., PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C., PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C., PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C., ASHRAF SAKR, M.D., LYDIA SHAJENKO, M.D. (CONFORTI, DAMIAN)
September 21, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMED NABULSI on behalf of WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D., FOUAD KARAM, D.C., MEHRDAD LANGROUDI, M.D., KHALED MORSI, M.D., PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C., PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C., PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C., ASHRAF SAKR, M.D., LYDIA SHAJENKO, M.D. (NABULSI, MOHAMED)
September 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD B. ROBINS on behalf of WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D., FOUAD KARAM, D.C., MEHRDAD LANGROUDI, M.D., KHALED MORSI, M.D., PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C., PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C., PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C., ASHRAF SAKR, M.D., LYDIA SHAJENKO, M.D. (ROBINS, RICHARD)
September 17, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD B. ROBINS on behalf of WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D., FOUAD KARAM, D.C., PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C., PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C., PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C., ASHRAF SAKR, M.D. (ROBINS, RICHARD)
September 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMED NABULSI on behalf of WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D., FOUAD KARAM, D.C., PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C., PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C., PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C., ASHRAF SAKR, M.D. (NABULSI, MOHAMED)
September 17, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW GIMIGLIANO on behalf of WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D., FOUAD KARAM, D.C., PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C., PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C., PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C., ASHRAF SAKR, M.D. (GIMIGLIANO, ANDREW)
September 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DAMIAN P. CONFORTI on behalf of WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D., FOUAD KARAM, D.C., PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C., PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C., PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C., ASHRAF SAKR, M.D. (CONFORTI, DAMIAN)
September 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. CHANG LEE, M.D. served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021; ASHRAF SAKR, M.D. served on 9/16/2021, answer due 10/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed on Ashraf Sakr, M.D., #2 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
September 9, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D. served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021; MONICA JOHNSON, N.P. served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021; FOUAD KARAM, D.C. served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021; MEHRDAD LANGROUDI, M.D. served on 9/2/2021, answer due 9/23/2021; PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C. served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021; PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C. served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021; PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C. served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021; LUIS RAMIREZ-PACHECO, M.D. served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021; LYDIA SHAJENKO, M.D. served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons Returned Executed on Fouad Karam, D.C., #2 Summons Returned Executed on Monica Johnson, NP, #3 Summons Returned Executed on Mehrdad Langroudi, M.D., #4 Summons Returned Executed on Precision Anesthesia Associates, P.C., #5 Summons Returned Executed on Precision Pain & Spine Institute, L.L.C., #6 Summons Returned Executed on Precision Spine & Sports Medicine of New Jersey, L.L.C., #7 Summons Returned Executed on Luis Ramirez-Pacheco, M.D., #8 Summons Returned Executed on Lydia Shajenko, M.D., #9 Certificate of Service)(KANG, GENE)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to STUART ATKIN, M.D., WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D., MONICA JOHNSON, N.P., FOUAD KARAM, D.C., MEHRDAD LANGROUDI, M.D., CHANG LEE, M.D., KHALED MORSI, M.D., PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C., PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C., PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C., LUIS RAMIREZ-PACHECO, M.D., ASHRAF SAKR, M.D.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
August 30, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. identifying Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (KANG, GENE)
August 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STUART ATKIN, M.D., WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D., MONICA JOHNSON, N.P., FOUAD KARAM, D.C., MEHRDAD LANGROUDI, M.D., CHANG LEE, M.D., KHALED MORSI, M.D., PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C., PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C., PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C., LUIS RAMIREZ-PACHECO, M.D., ASHRAF SAKR, M.D., LYDIA SHAJENKO, M.D. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12759168) with JURY DEMAND, filed by GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY, GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Exhibit "2", #3 Exhibit "3", #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(KANG, GENE)
August 30, 2021 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jal, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. et al v. ELKHOLY, M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: GENE Y. KANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAEL ELKHOLY, M.D.
Represented By: ANDREW GIMIGLIANO
Represented By: DAMIAN P. CONFORTI
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: RICHARD B. ROBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRECISION PAIN & SPINE INSTITUTE, L.L.C.
Represented By: ANDREW GIMIGLIANO
Represented By: DAMIAN P. CONFORTI
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: RICHARD B. ROBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRECISION SPINE & SPORTS MEDICINE OF NEW JERSEY, L.L.C.
Represented By: ANDREW GIMIGLIANO
Represented By: DAMIAN P. CONFORTI
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: RICHARD B. ROBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRECISION ANESTHESIA ASSOCIATES, P.C.
Represented By: ANDREW GIMIGLIANO
Represented By: DAMIAN P. CONFORTI
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: RICHARD B. ROBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASHRAF SAKR, M.D.
Represented By: ANDREW GIMIGLIANO
Represented By: DAMIAN P. CONFORTI
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: RICHARD B. ROBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FOUAD KARAM, D.C.
Represented By: ANDREW GIMIGLIANO
Represented By: DAMIAN P. CONFORTI
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: RICHARD B. ROBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS RAMIREZ-PACHECO, M.D.
Represented By: ANDREW GIMIGLIANO
Represented By: DAMIAN P. CONFORTI
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: RICHARD B. ROBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYDIA SHAJENKO, M.D.
Represented By: ANDREW GIMIGLIANO
Represented By: DAMIAN P. CONFORTI
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: RICHARD B. ROBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUART ATKIN, M.D.
Represented By: ANDREW GIMIGLIANO
Represented By: DAMIAN P. CONFORTI
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: RICHARD B. ROBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEHRDAD LANGROUDI, M.D.
Represented By: ANDREW GIMIGLIANO
Represented By: DAMIAN P. CONFORTI
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: RICHARD B. ROBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHANG LEE, M.D.
Represented By: ANDREW GIMIGLIANO
Represented By: DAMIAN P. CONFORTI
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: RICHARD B. ROBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KHALED MORSI, M.D.
Represented By: ANDREW GIMIGLIANO
Represented By: DAMIAN P. CONFORTI
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: RICHARD B. ROBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONICA JOHNSON, N.P.
Represented By: ANDREW GIMIGLIANO
Represented By: DAMIAN P. CONFORTI
Represented By: MOHAMED NABULSI
Represented By: RICHARD B. ROBINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?