LAVINE et al v. AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS et al
Plaintiff: SHINGO LAVINE, ADAM LAVINE and AIKO LAVINE
Defendant: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS INC. and PRINCETON MEDICAL GROUP, P.A.
Case Number: 3:2021cv17099
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JONATHAN LUPKIN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mg)
October 29, 2021 Filing 12 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jonathan Lupkin to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (DELANEY, ANDREW)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER that Plaintiffs' amended complaint shall be filed by 11/29/2021; Defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiffs' amended complaint shall be filed by 12/13/2021; the return date on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is 1/18/2022. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/29/2021. (jem)
October 29, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 1/18/2022 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
October 28, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION by All Plaintiffs. (DELANEY, ANDREW)
October 18, 2021 Pro Hac Vice fee: $150, receipt number NEW045513, as to Jonathan D. Lupkin (jc, )
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Jonathan D. Lupkin pro hac vice admission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/15/2021. (mg)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Initial Conference set for 1/25/2022 03:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 10/14/2021. (ijf, )
October 14, 2021 ATTENTION COUNSEL: The Initial Conference scheduled for 1/25/2022 has been cancelled pending the decision on the #7 Amended Motion to Dismiss. (ijf, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LEVY, JARED)
October 12, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 11/15/2021 before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mg)
October 12, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #7 Amended MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 11/15/2021 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
October 11, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs. (DELANEY, ANDREW)
October 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW DELANEY on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DELANEY, ANDREW)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Defendants' motion for leave to file and Amended Motion to Dismiss; Motion to Dismiss must be filed within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 9/28/2021. (mg)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 Letter from Jared K. Levy. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LEVY, JARED)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 Clerk's Letter: Attorney is not admitted to the Federal Bar of New Jersey. Notice has been mailed to the attorney's address. (jal, )
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS from SUPERIOR COURT OF MERCER COUNTY NJ, case number MER L 000272 21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12809975), filed by AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Part 1, #3 Exhibit A - Part 2, #4 Exhibit B)(LEVY, JARED)
September 17, 2021 CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (jal, )
September 17, 2021 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jal, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LAVINE et al v. AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHINGO LAVINE
Represented By: ANDREW DELANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADAM LAVINE
Represented By: ANDREW DELANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIKO LAVINE
Represented By: ANDREW DELANEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS INC.
Represented By: JARED K. LEVY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRINCETON MEDICAL GROUP, P.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?