MOORE et al v. CENTURY PLAZA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: RONALD MOORE and THE INDEPENDENCE PROJECT, INC.
Defendant: CENTURY PLAZA, LLC, WIRELESS ZONE, LLC, NEW LIFE SUBS, LLC, HAMILTON Z CORP and MAS CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2021cv18353
Filed: October 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by NEW LIFE SUBS, LLC.(TOTH, ASHLEY)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: After reviewing the parties status update submitted on 11/24/2021, the Initial rule 16 conference scheduled for 12/9/2021 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni is adjourned with no new date. The parties are to report back to the Court electronically to tjb_orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 1/3/2022, with a joint written status update regarding settlement. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/24/2021. (mm)
November 24, 2021 Filing 18 Letter. (AIRGOOD, VICTORIA)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CONSENT ORDER that defendant, New Life Subs, LLC is hereby permitted to file an Answer 20 days from the entry of the within Consent Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/15/2021. (abr, )
November 12, 2021 Filing 16 Proposed Order Consent Order Extending Time to Answer by NEW LIFE SUBS, LLC. (TOTH, ASHLEY)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER of voluntary dismissal with prejudice as to MAS CORPORATION only. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 11/11/2021. (abr, )
November 10, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal , with Prejudice, of Claims Against Defendant MAS Corporation Only by RONALD MOORE, THE INDEPENDENCE PROJECT, INC. (SHADINGER, JON)
November 2, 2021 Filing 13 STATEMENT of Death by RONALD MOORE, THE INDEPENDENCE PROJECT, INC.. (SHADINGER, JON)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, Scheduling Conference set for 12/9/2021 at 12:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 11/1/2021. (abr, )
November 1, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by CENTURY PLAZA, LLC.(AIRGOOD, VICTORIA)
October 19, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RONALD MOORE, THE INDEPENDENCE PROJECT, INC.. CENTURY PLAZA, LLC served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. (SHADINGER, JON)
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RONALD MOORE, THE INDEPENDENCE PROJECT, INC.. MAS CORPORATION served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. (SHADINGER, JON)
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RONALD MOORE, THE INDEPENDENCE PROJECT, INC.. HAMILTON Z CORP served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. (SHADINGER, JON)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RONALD MOORE, THE INDEPENDENCE PROJECT, INC.. NEW LIFE SUBS, LLC served on 10/13/2021, answer due 11/3/2021. (SHADINGER, JON)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to MAS CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (abr, )
October 12, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Summons to be Issued by RONALD MOORE, THE INDEPENDENCE PROJECT, INC. as to MAS CORPORATION. (SHADINGER, JON)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Claims Against Defendant Wireless Zone, LLC only by RONALD MOORE, THE INDEPENDENCE PROJECT, INC. (SHADINGER, JON)
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT adding Defendant MAS CORPORATION and removing Defendant Wireless Zone LLC against CENTURY PLAZA, LLC, HAMILTON Z CORP, NEW LIFE SUBS, LLC, MAS CORPORATION, filed by RONALD MOORE, THE INDEPENDENCE PROJECT, INC..(SHADINGER, JON)
October 12, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to CENTURY PLAZA, LLC, HAMILTON Z CORP, NEW LIFE SUBS, LLC, WIRELESS ZONE, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal)
October 12, 2021 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal)
October 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CENTURY PLAZA, LLC, HAMILTON Z CORP, NEW LIFE SUBS, LLC, WIRELESS ZONE, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12881129), filed by RONALD MOORE, THE INDEPENDENCE PROJECT, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SHADINGER, JON)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOORE et al v. CENTURY PLAZA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD MOORE
Represented By: JON G. SHADINGER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE INDEPENDENCE PROJECT, INC.
Represented By: JON G. SHADINGER, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTURY PLAZA, LLC
Represented By: VICTORIA J. AIRGOOD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIRELESS ZONE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW LIFE SUBS, LLC
Represented By: ASHLEY LAUREN TOTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMILTON Z CORP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?