ENRIGHT v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY ENRIGHT
Defendant: FCA US LLC and STELLANTIS N.V.
Case Number: 3:2021cv19364
Filed: October 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2021 Filing 16 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by KIMBERLY ENRIGHT re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (MUHIC, PETER)
December 22, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion reset for 2/7/2022 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb)
December 13, 2021 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC identifying STELLANTIS N.V. as Corporate Parent.. (COONS, JAMES)
December 13, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by FCA US LLC. Responses due by 1/4/2022 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(COONS, JAMES)
December 13, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 1/18/2022 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdb, )
December 8, 2021 Filing 13 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jason H. Alperstein to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13029122.) (MUHIC, PETER)
December 8, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, JASON H. ALPERSTEIN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdb)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jason H. Alperstein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/23/2021. (jdb)
November 22, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice THOMAS L. AZAR, JR to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12997645.) (COONS, JAMES)
November 22, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice SCOTT H. MORGAN to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12997619.) (COONS, JAMES)
November 22, 2021 Filing 9 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice STEPHEN A. D'AUNOY to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12997580.) (COONS, JAMES)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CONSENT ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to STEPHEN A. DAUNOY, THOMAS L. AZAR, JR., and SCOTT H, MORGAN. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/22/2021. (jdb)
November 22, 2021 Pro Hac Vice counsel, STEPHEN A. D'AUNOY, SCOTT H. MORGAN and THOMAS AZAR, JR, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jdb)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from James S. Coons to the Honorable Douglas E. Arpert, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James S. Coons, #2 Certification of Stephen A. D'Aunoy, #3 Certification of Thomas L. Azar, Jr., #4 Certification of Scott H. Morgan, #5 Proposed Consent Order)(COONS, JAMES)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. Attorney JAMES SIMON COONS for FCA US LLC added. (COONS, JAMES)
November 17, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES SIMON COONS on behalf of FCA US LLC (COONS, JAMES)
November 17, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The #6 Application for Clerk's Order to Extend Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint submitted by FCA US LLC has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/13/2021. (jdb)
November 11, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason H. Alperstein, Esquire by KIMBERLY ENRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Certification Certif. of P.Muhic,Esq iso Motion, #2 Certification Certif of J.Alperstein,Esq iso Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(MUHIC, PETER)
November 11, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jason H. Alperstein, Esquire. Motion set for 12/6/2021 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KIMBERLY ENRIGHT. FCA US LLC served on 11/4/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (MUHIC, PETER)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FCA US LLC, STELLANTIS N.V.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
October 28, 2021 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
October 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCA US LLC, STELLANTIS N.V. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12932090) with JURY DEMAND, filed by KIMBERLY ENRIGHT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MUHIC, PETER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ENRIGHT v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY ENRIGHT
Represented By: PETER A. MUHIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: JAMES SIMON COONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STELLANTIS N.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?