MOLDOVSKY et al v. MILLER
Plaintiff: BREM MOLDOVSKY and BREM MOLDOVSKY L.L.C.
Defendant: JONATHAN MILLER and JONATHAN R. MILLER doing business as THE LAW FIRM OF JONATHAN R. MILLER
Case Number: 3:2021cv19418
Filed: October 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order to Refund Fees (Finance notified). Signed by Chief Deputy Theresa L. Burnett on 12/08/2021. (man)
December 7, 2021 Filing 15 Application for Refund of Fees (finance notified).. (MOLDOVSKY, BREM)
November 22, 2021 ***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (jem)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER: This matter is stayed and administratively terminated without prejudice pending Judge Robreno's decision in Miller v. Moldovsky et al., No. 21-cv-2219 (E.D. Pa.). [11, 13]. No conference will be scheduled at this time regarding the parties' request for stay. To the extent the parties desire a conference call on another issue, they may request so in writing. Plaintiffs' request to bar Defendant's filings during the period of stay is denied without prejudice. To the extent Defendant files "unwelcome letters and extra filings," this Court may revisit Plaintiffs' request at such time. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 11/22/2021.(kas)
November 19, 2021 Filing 13 Letter from Brem Moldovsky, Esquire re 12 Order on Oral Motion, #11 Letter. (MOLDOVSKY, BREM)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER that by no later than 11/19/2021 Plaintiff is to file a letter responding to Defendant's letter (ECF No. 11) that requests a stay of this matter. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 11/16/2021. (Gonzalez, P)
November 15, 2021 Filing 11 Letter from Jonathan R. Miller, Esq.. (MILLER, JONATHAN)
November 15, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BREM MOLDOVSKY L.L.C., BREM MOLDOVSKY re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, (MOLDOVSKY, BREM)
November 14, 2021 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #9 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by JONATHAN R. MILLER has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 12/08/2021. (jem)
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Jonathan Miller.. (MILLER, JONATHAN)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 Certification on behalf of BREM MOLDOVSKY L.L.C., BREM MOLDOVSKY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order)(MOLDOVSKY, BREM)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Jonathan R. Miller, Esq.. (MILLER, JONATHAN)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 Certification of Jonathan R. Miller, Esq. on behalf of JONATHAN R. MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Moldovsky parties' second amended countercomplaint (E.D. Pa.), #2 Exhibit motion to dismiss Moldovsky parties' second amended countercomplaint (E.D. Pa.))(MILLER, JONATHAN)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN R. MILLER on behalf of JONATHAN R. MILLER (MILLER, JONATHAN)
October 29, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JONATHAN R. MILLER. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
October 29, 2021 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
October 28, 2021 Filing 3 APPLICATION for Writ of Summons by BREM MOLDOVSKY L.L.C., BREM MOLDOVSKY. (MOLDOVSKY, BREM)
October 28, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BREM MOLDOVSKY L.L.C., BREM MOLDOVSKY. (MOLDOVSKY, BREM)
October 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JONATHAN MILLER ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number BNJDC-12935990) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BREM MOLDOVSKY, BREM MOLDOVSKY L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order, #2 Exhibit B - Order, #3 Exhibit C - Order, #4 Exhibit D - Order, #5 Exhibit E - Miller Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Ellner Aff, #7 Exhibit G - PA Transcript, #8 Exhibit H - Order, #9 Exhibit I - Order)(MOLDOVSKY, BREM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MOLDOVSKY et al v. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BREM MOLDOVSKY
Represented By: BREM MICA MOLDOVSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BREM MOLDOVSKY L.L.C.
Represented By: BREM MICA MOLDOVSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN R. MILLER doing business as THE LAW FIRM OF JONATHAN R. MILLER
Represented By: JONATHAN R. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?