LE CARRE et al v. ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC et al
Plaintiff: JAMES LE CARRE and ESTATE OF ALEXANDER OLIN
Defendant: ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC agent of D/B/A ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II, ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC agent of D/B/A WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER, JANE DOE NURSES 1-50, JANE ROE NURSES, TECHNICIANS, CNA'S AND PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES 1-50, JOHN DOE PHYSICIANS 1-50, RICHARD ROES 1-10, JANE DOE DIETICIANS 1-50, ABC CORPORATION AND ABC PARTNERSHIP, ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC doing business as ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II and ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC doing business as WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER
Cross Claimant: ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv20226
Filed: November 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC, ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER re #7 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(MILLER, MALINDA)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The Initial Conference set for 1/25/2022 at 10:00 AM is converted to a Telephone Status Conference. No JDP necessary at this time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/5/2022. (eh, )
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Letter from Defendants requesting a two-week adjournment of Initial Conference. (MILLER, MALINDA)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC, ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER re #7 MOTION to Remand (MARTINO, SALVATORE)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 2/7/2022 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jmh)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(GOUGH, DEBORAH)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #7 MOTION to Remand . Motion set for 1/18/2022 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DEBORAH R. GOUGH on behalf of All Plaintiffs (GOUGH, DEBORAH)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please review the #6 Notice of appearance filed by Deborah Gough on 12/8/2021. The attached document is entering an appearance for attorney Jennifer H. Wilson while Deborah appears to have been added. Please refile and add Jennifer H. Wilson on behalf of the appropriate parties. (jmh)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO on behalf of ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC, ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER (MARTINO, SALVATORE)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against JANE DOE DIETICIANS 1-50, JANE DOE NURSES 1-50, JANE ROE NURSES, JOHN DOE PHYSICIANS 1-50, RICHARD ROES 1-10 by CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC, ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, MALINDA)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Ordered the Initial Conference is set for 1/25/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/1/2021. (eh, )
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg)
November 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC, ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER. (MILLER, MALINDA)
November 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC, ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER from Superior Court of New Jersey - Ocean County, case number OCN L 2638 21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13004375), filed by CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC, ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Certificate of Service Notice of Filing in State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(MILLER, MALINDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LE CARRE et al v. ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES LE CARRE
Represented By: DEBORAH R. GOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF ALEXANDER OLIN
Represented By: DEBORAH R. GOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC agent of D/B/A ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC agent of D/B/A WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAIM SCHEINBAUM
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Represented By: SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS SCHWARTZ
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Represented By: SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Represented By: SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Represented By: SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE NURSES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE ROE NURSES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TECHNICIANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CNA'S AND PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE PHYSICIANS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ROES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE DIETICIANS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION AND ABC PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC doing business as ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II
Represented By: SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC doing business as WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER
Represented By: SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross claimant: ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?