THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. RETIREMENT VALUE LLC
Plaintiff: THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: RETIREMENT VALUE LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv20438
Filed: December 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2022 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Retirement Value LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(BIDERMAN, ERIC)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending the time that Defendant Retirement Value, LLC shall answer or otherwise to the Complaint until 2/04/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 1/10/2022. (jem)
January 5, 2022 Filing 5 Letter from Eric Biderman, Attorney for Retirement Value LLC, Enclosing Stipulation for Extension of Answer/Response Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Stipulation and Order for Extension])(BIDERMAN, ERIC)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC ADAM BIDERMAN on behalf of RETIREMENT VALUE LLC (BIDERMAN, ERIC)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Retirement Value, LLC on 12/15/2021, filed by THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (FARINELLA, PHILIP)
December 10, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to RETIREMENT VALUE LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg)
December 10, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Do NOT enter address information when entering parties. . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (km)
December 10, 2021 Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (mg)
December 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against RETIREMENT VALUE LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13034348), filed by THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet to Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint)(FARINELLA, PHILIP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY v. RETIREMENT VALUE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE LINCOLN NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: PHILIP FARINELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RETIREMENT VALUE LLC
Represented By: ERIC ADAM BIDERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?