BEHRENS v. AMAZON.COM INC et al
Plaintiff: DAVID BEHRENS
Defendant: AMAZON.COM INC, KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION, STOP & SHOP SUPERMARKET CO LLC, STOP & SHOP KEYPORT, COTTONELLE, JOHN DOES 1-30 and ABC CORPS 1-30
Case Number: 3:2022cv01475
Filed: March 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Georgette Castner
2 Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2022 Filing 22 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney DANIEL WINTER terminated. Attorney JOANNA MARIE DOHERTY for STOP & SHOP KEYPORT added.. (DOHERTY, JOANNA)
May 2, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 6/6/2022 before Judge Georgette Castner. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
May 2, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 6/6/2022 before Judge Georgette Castner. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
April 29, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by AMAZON.COM INC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DOHERTY, JOANNA)
April 29, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss by STOP & SHOP KEYPORT. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DOHERTY, JOANNA)
April 29, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by JOANNA MARIE DOHERTY on behalf of STOP & SHOP KEYPORT (DOHERTY, JOANNA)
April 29, 2022 Filing 18 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney BETH S. ROSE terminated. Attorney JOANNA MARIE DOHERTY for AMAZON.COM INC added.. (DOHERTY, JOANNA)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Georgette Castner for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 4/11/2022. (jjc, )
April 8, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 5/2/2022 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
April 7, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(DOHERTY, JOANNA)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to the third amended complaint; Defendant must respond by 4/29/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/6/2022. (jal, )
April 6, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time To Respond To Complaint by AMAZON.COM INC. (SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending defendants time to file a responsive pleading, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint for 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/31/2022. (jal, ) Modified on 4/6/2022 (jmh).
March 30, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time To Answer by STOP & SHOP KEYPORT. (WINTER, DANIEL)
March 29, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #8 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/7/2022.
March 29, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application for Clerk's Extension filed by Joanna Doherty on 3/24/2022 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. The Clerk's Office has terminated the Motion. In the future please use the event Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (abr, )
March 28, 2022 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STOP & SHOP KEYPORT identifying Ahold Delhaize U.S.A., Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (HALL-GALE, JEFFREY)
March 28, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JEFFREY HALL-GALE on behalf of STOP & SHOP KEYPORT (HALL-GALE, JEFFREY)
March 25, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply . Motion set for 4/18/2022 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (abr, )
March 24, 2022 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION. (DOHERTY, JOANNA)
March 24, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION. (DOHERTY, JOANNA)
March 24, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOANNA MARIE DOHERTY on behalf of KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION (DOHERTY, JOANNA)
March 23, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL WINTER on behalf of STOP & SHOP KEYPORT (WINTER, DANIEL)
March 22, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by AMAZON.COM INC on 3/21/2022 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/7/2022. (mg)
March 21, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMAZON.COM INC. (SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
March 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by BETH S. ROSE on behalf of AMAZON.COM INC (ROSE, BETH)
March 21, 2022 Filing 3 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Amazon.com, Inc... (SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 Exhibit to #1 Notice of Removal Civil Cover Sheet by AMAZON.COM INC. (SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
March 17, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AMAZON.COM INC from Superior Court of Monmouth County, case number MON-L-00467-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13262126), filed by AMAZON.COM INC.(SCHWARTZ, ANDREW)
March 17, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
March 17, 2022 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jal, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BEHRENS v. AMAZON.COM INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BEHRENS
Represented By: DAVID P. LEVINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMAZON.COM INC
Represented By: ANDREW W. SCHWARTZ
Represented By: BETH S. ROSE
Represented By: JOANNA MARIE DOHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY CLARK CORPORATION
Represented By: JOANNA MARIE DOHERTY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STOP & SHOP SUPERMARKET CO LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STOP & SHOP KEYPORT
Represented By: DANIEL WINTER
Represented By: JOANNA MARIE DOHERTY
Represented By: JEFFREY HALL-GALE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COTTONELLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPS 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?