KAPLOW v. PORT POLICE & GUARDS UNION LOCAL 1456 et al
Plaintiff: JAMES KAPLOW
Defendant: PORT POLICE & GUARDS UNION LOCAL 1456, APM TERMINALS ELIZABETH LLC D/B/A MAERSK SHIPPING, MAERSK A/S: MAERSK, INC., ANTHONY CARTO, VINCENT BROWN, JOHN DOES 1-5 AND 6-10, APM TERMINALS ELIZABETH LLC doing business as MAERSK SHIPPING, MAERSK and A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2022cv01708
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Lois H Goodman
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff is to file Motion to Remand by no later than 6/8/2022. Defendants' response to complaint shall be filed on a date to be determined. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 5/12/2022. (kas)
May 12, 2022 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi: Telephone Conference held on 5/12/2022. (kas)
May 9, 2022 Filing 15 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel Responding to Defendants' Pre-Motion Conference Letters re #10 Letter, #11 Letter. (EDELSTEIN, MIRIAM)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER, rescheduling the Initial Conference set for 6/1/2022 to 6/14/2022 9:30 AM via Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the call at that time. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 5/5/2022. (ijf, )
May 2, 2022 Filing 13 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel Requesting Pre-Motion Conference - Motion to Remand. (EDELSTEIN, MIRIAM)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER that Plaintiff has until 05/09/2022 to file a response to Defendants' letters #10 and #11 requesting a pre-motion conference. The pre-motion conference call is set for 05/12/2022 at 10:00 a.m. before the Honorable Zahid N. Quraishi. Counsel will be provided instructions via email for the call. So Ordered on 05/02/2022 by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi.(kas)
April 29, 2022 Filing 11 Letter from Stephen Mogila and Timothy Hott, attorneys for Defendant, PPGU Local 1456 per the Court's Individual Rules of Practice. (HOTT, TIMOTHY)
April 29, 2022 Filing 10 Letter from Michael J. Riccobono. (RICCOBONO, MICHAEL)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER extending the time within which the Maersk Defendants and Union shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint until 5/2/2022 Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 4/22/2022. (jal) Modified on 4/25/2022 (jmh).
April 18, 2022 Filing 8 STIPULATION and Consent Order Extending Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by APM TERMINALS ELIZABETH LLC, MAERSK. (RICCOBONO, MICHAEL)
April 5, 2022 Filing 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendant Port Police & Guards Union Local 1456.. (HOTT, TIMOTHY)
April 5, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order #6 filed by PORT POLICE & GUARDS UNION LOCAL 1456 on 4/1/2022 was submitted incorrectly as a motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order for clerks extension USING Civil Events-& Other Filings-& Other Documents-& Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jal)
April 5, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The document #7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by PORT POLICE & GUARDS UNION LOCAL 1456 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/15/2022. (abr, ) Modified on 4/8/2022 (jal, ).
April 4, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Per Local Civil Rule 6.1(b). Motion set for 5/2/2022 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
April 1, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Per Local Civil Rule 6.1(b) by PORT POLICE & GUARDS UNION LOCAL 1456. (HOTT, TIMOTHY)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Initial Conference set for 6/23/2022 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 7E before Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman on 4/1/2022. (ijf, )
April 1, 2022 CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time toAnswer - Document #4 submitted by Maersk on 3/31/2022 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/15/2022. (jal, )
March 31, 2022 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants Maersk.. (RICCOBONO, MICHAEL)
March 31, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JAMES RICCOBONO on behalf of APM TERMINALS ELIZABETH LLC, MAERSK (RICCOBONO, MICHAEL)
March 30, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE by APM TERMINALS ELIZABETH LLC, MAERSK re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Consent to Removal (RICCOBONO, MICHAEL)
March 28, 2022 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a #Civil Cover Sheet using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
March 28, 2022 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jdg, )
March 25, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by PORT POLICE & GUARDS UNION LOCAL 1456 from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY CIVIL DIVISION MERCER COUNTY, case number MER-L-0186-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13287220), filed by PORT POLICE & GUARDS UNION LOCAL 1456. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit STATE COURT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, #2 Certification OF JOHN OATES IN SUPPORT OF PETITION FOR REMOVAL, #3 Exhibit TO CERTIFICATION OF JOHN OATES)(HOTT, TIMOTHY)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KAPLOW v. PORT POLICE & GUARDS UNION LOCAL 1456 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES KAPLOW
Represented By: MIRIAM S. EDELSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PORT POLICE & GUARDS UNION LOCAL 1456
Represented By: TIMOTHY R. HOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APM TERMINALS ELIZABETH LLC D/B/A MAERSK SHIPPING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAERSK A/S: MAERSK, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANTHONY CARTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCENT BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-5 AND 6-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APM TERMINALS ELIZABETH LLC doing business as MAERSK SHIPPING
Represented By: MICHAEL JAMES RICCOBONO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAERSK
Represented By: MICHAEL JAMES RICCOBONO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A NEW JERSEY NONPROFIT CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?