FIORE et al v. ALLIANCE HC II LLC et al
Plaintiff: PATRICIA A. FIORE and JOHN P. FIORE
Defendant: ALLIANCE HC II LLC, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER, ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC doing business as ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II doing business as WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER, JANE DOE NURSES 1-50, JANE ROE NURSES, TECHNICIANS, CNA'S AND PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES 1-50, JOHN DOE DOE PHYSICIANS 1-50, RICHARD ROES 1-10, JANE DOE DIETICIANS 1-50 and ABC CORPORATION AND ABC PARTNERSHIP
Case Number: 3:2022cv04474
Filed: July 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Freda L Wolfson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Notice of Removal- Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2022 Filing 11 BRIEF in Opposition filed by ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC, ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER re #6 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, MALINDA)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Administratively terminating #5 Motion to Dismiss pending courts decision on #6 motion to remand. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/2/2022. (kht)
September 1, 2022 Filing 9 Letter from Francisco J. Rodriguez. (RODRIGUEZ, FRANCISCO)
August 18, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion reset for 9/19/2022 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
August 17, 2022 Filing 8 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by All Plaintiffs re #5 MOTION to Dismiss (RODRIGUEZ, FRANCISCO)
August 15, 2022 Reset Deadlines as to #6 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey. Motion set for 9/16/2022 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
August 12, 2022 Filing 7 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC, ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER re #6 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey (MARTINO, SALVATORE)
August 8, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #6 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey. Motion set for 9/6/2022 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
August 5, 2022 Filing 6 First MOTION to Remand to Superior Court of New Jersey by All Plaintiffs. (RODRIGUEZ, FRANCISCO)
July 29, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 9/6/2022 before Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg)
July 28, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC, ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER. Responses due by 8/23/2022 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Malinda A. Miller, Esq., #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Wilhelms v. ProMedica, #5 Exhibit C - Mills v. Hartford Health, #6 Exhibit D - de Becker v. Qureshi, #7 Exhibit E - Zelig v. City Medical, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Certificate of Service)(MILLER, MALINDA)
July 11, 2022 Clerk`s Text Order - The Application for Clerk's Order Extending Time to Answer #4 submitted by CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 7/28/2022. (jdg)
July 8, 2022 Filing 4 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants.. (MILLER, MALINDA)
July 7, 2022 Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (kht)
July 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO on behalf of ALLIANCE HC II LLC, ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II, CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER (MARTINO, SALVATORE)
July 7, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ALLIANCE HC II LLC, ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER. (MILLER, MALINDA)
July 7, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER, ALLIANCE HC II LLC, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II from Superior Court of New Jersey - Ocean County, case number OCN-L-000667-22. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13544741), filed by CHAIM SCHEINBAUM, WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER, ALLIANCE HC II LLC, LOUIS SCHWARTZ, ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Bolton Statement of Interest, #3 Exhibit C - Certification, #4 Certificate of Service Notice of Filing in State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(MILLER, MALINDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIORE et al v. ALLIANCE HC II LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA A. FIORE
Represented By: FRANCISCO J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN P. FIORE
Represented By: FRANCISCO J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANCE HC II LLC
Represented By: SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER
Represented By: SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II
Represented By: SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHAIM SCHEINBAUM
Represented By: SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS SCHWARTZ
Represented By: SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANCE HC 11 LLC doing business as ANDOVER SUBACUTE AND REHABILITATION II doing business as WOODLAND BEHAVIORAL AND NURSING CENTER
Represented By: SALVATORE CHRISTOPHER MARTINO
Represented By: MALINDA A. MILLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE NURSES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE ROE NURSES, TECHNICIANS, CNA'S AND PARAMEDICAL EMPLOYEES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE DOE PHYSICIANS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD ROES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE DIETICIANS 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORPORATION AND ABC PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?