JEVREMOVIC et al v. COURVILLE
Plaintiff: LIMA JEVREMOVIC and Autonomous User Rehabilitation Agent, LLC
Defendant: BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE
Case Number: 3:2022cv04969
Filed: August 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Referring Judge: Rukhsanah L Singh
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint until 10/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 9/20/2023. (jal, )
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION re #48 Amended Complaint Extending Time To Answer to October 24, 2023 by BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE. (JOHNSON, JOHN)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by LIMA JEVREMOVIC, AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jevremovic TRO Order, #2 Appendix Comparison)(OSTROVE, ELLIOT)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by ELLIOT DAVID OSTROVE on behalf of All Plaintiffs (OSTROVE, ELLIOT)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney SHERRI A. AFFRUNTI terminated. Attorney ELLIOT DAVID OSTROVE for AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC,ELLIOT DAVID OSTROVE for LIMA JEVREMOVIC added.. (AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs are hereby granted leave to file a Second Amended Complaint within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order. A failure to cure the defects noted in the accompanying Opinion may lead to dismissal with prejudice; and it is further ORDERED that the Clerk is instructed to mark this matter CLOSED. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/10/2023. (mlh)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/10/2023. (mlh)
August 10, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated. (mlh)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE by AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC, LIMA JEVREMOVIC re #41 Order Request to Receive Electronic Filings for Jeffrey J. Miles, Esq. (AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee received for Jeffrey J. Miles: $ 150, receipt number 133639 (jjc, )
July 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Letter re #39 Order on Motion to Seal Document. (AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
July 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AMENDED ORDER granting PRO HAC VICE admission as to JEFFREY J. MILES, ESQ. and TERMINATION of ADAM M. WINOKUR, ESQ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 7/13/2023. (mlh)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE re #33 MOTION to Dismiss - Renewed Pursuant to Court's Instructions [ECF 24] and in Response to Amended Complaint [ECF 26] - Defendant's Renewed Reply In Further Support of Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) with Certificate of Service - (JOHNSON, JOHN)
July 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 7/6/2023. (jdg)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CONSENT ORDER: Granting pro hac vice admission as to Adam M. Winokur. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 6/27/2023. (jal, )
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC, LIMA JEVREMOVIC re #27 MOTION to Seal Document (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Letter from Sherri A. Affrunti, Esq. to Magistrate Singh with PHV Application for Jeffrey Miles, Esq.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sherri A. Affrunti, Esq., #2 Declaration Certification of Jeffrey Miles, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order Order Terminating PHV Admission of Adam Winokur, Esq., #4 Text of Proposed Order Order for PHV Admission of Jeffrey Miles, Esq.)(AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC, LIMA JEVREMOVIC re #33 MOTION to Dismiss - Renewed Pursuant to Court's Instructions [ECF 24] and in Response to Amended Complaint [ECF 26] (AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE re #27 MOTION to Seal Document (Attachments: #1 Declaration - Declaration of Brittany Jeream Courville, #2 Text of Proposed Order - proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service - Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, JOHN)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #33 MOTION to Dismiss - Renewed Pursuant to Court's Instructions [ECF 24] and in Response to Amended Complaint [ECF 26]. Motion set for 7/17/2023 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss - Renewed Pursuant to Court's Instructions [ECF 24] and in Response to Amended Complaint [ECF 26] by BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE. (JOHNSON, JOHN)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER that in light of the supplemental allegations contained in the Amended Complaint #26 with respect to the citizenship of Plaintiff AURA LLC, the Court hereby WITHDRAWS its Order to Show Cause #24 concerning subject matter jurisdiction. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 6/13/2023. (kas)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Discover Confidentiality Order #31 filed on 6/8/2023 appears to be a duplicate. The submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. this message is for informational purposes only. (mg )
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 6/7/2023. (mg)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order Filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 6/7/2023. (jal, )
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Proposed Order Stipulated Discovery Confidentiality Order by AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC, LIMA JEVREMOVIC. (AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
June 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #27 MOTION to Seal Document . Motion set for 7/3/2023 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Certification on behalf of AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC, LIMA JEVREMOVIC Re #27 Motion to Seal Document,. (AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court.
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Seal Document by AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC, LIMA JEVREMOVIC. (Attachments: #1 Brief Plaintiff's Brief, #2 Certification Certification of Neville L. Johnson, #3 Declaration Declaration of Lima Jevremovic, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE, filed by LIMA JEVREMOVIC, AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC.(AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
June 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Proposed Order Proposed Confidentiality Order by AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC, LIMA JEVREMOVIC. (AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff must show cause why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. If Plaintiffs do not submit properly establish jurisdiction by June 6, 2023, this matter will be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction and the Clerk shall close the case. The Clerks Office is instructed to administratively terminate the pending Motion to Dismiss without prejudice to Defendants right to renew it at a later date.. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 5/30/2023. (jdg)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 BRIEF in Support filed by BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint - Defendant's Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of its Motion To Dismiss Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (JOHNSON, JOHN)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 BRIEF in Opposition filed by AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC, LIMA JEVREMOVIC re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
October 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, TAMAR S. WISE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jal, )
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Tamar S. Wise to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-13769767.) (JOHNSON, JOHN)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 11/7/2022 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Motion set for 11/21/2022 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE. (Attachments: #1 Brief - Defendant's Memorandum of Law In Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6), #2 Certificate of Service - Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Order)(JOHNSON, JOHN)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE by BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE re #18 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear - Request by Local Counsel for PHV Attorney Tamar S. Wise to Receive Electronic Notifications (JOHNSON, JOHN)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee received as to Tamar S. Wise: $ 150, receipt number TRE129065 (jdg)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tamar S. Wise. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 10/4/2022. (jal, )
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER that the Court has reviewed the parties' letters #15 and #16 , and hereby WAIVES the requirement for a pre-motion conference; Defendant shall file any Motion to Dismiss, limited to the bases articulated in her letter, by no later than 10/14/2022, to be made returnable 11/07/2022. So Ordered by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/04/2022. (Gonzalez, P)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Letter from Plaintiffs in response to Defendant's request for Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss re #15 Letter. (AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Letter from John P. Johnson, Jr., Esquire. (JOHNSON, JOHN)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss by BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE. (JOHNSON, JOHN)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #14 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 10/17/2022 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letter requesting a pre-motion conference #14 filed by John Johnson on 9/23/2022 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE letter USING the event Letter. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (kas)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tamar S. Wise. Motion set for 10/17/2022 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Tamar S. Wise by BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Affidavit of Tamar S. Wise, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - New York, #3 Exhibit - Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - PA, #4 Certificate of Service - Certificate of Service, #5 Text of Proposed Order - Proposed Order)(JOHNSON, JOHN)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice counsel, NEVILLE L. JOHNSON, ADAM M. WINOKUR and RODNEY A. SMOLLA, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (mg)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Rodney A. Smolla to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Adam M. Winokur to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Neville L. Johnson to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
August 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee: $450.00, receipt number NEW047095 for Neville L. Johnson, Adam M. Winokur and Rodney A.. Smolla. (ps)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Neville L. Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/26/2022. (jal, )
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC, LIMA JEVREMOVIC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Sherri A. Affrunti, Esq., #2 Declaration Declaration of Neville L. Johnson, Esq., #3 Declaration Declaration of Adam M. Winokur, Esq., #4 Declaration Declaration of Rodney A. Smolla, Esq., #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting request for extension of time to answer Compliant; Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 9/28/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 8/17/2022. (jal, )
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND PLEADING DEADLINE by BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE. (JOHNSON, JOHN)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN PHILIP JOHNSON, JR on behalf of BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(JOHNSON, JOHN)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC, LIMA JEVREMOVIC identifying Autonomous User Rehabilitation Agent, LLC as Corporate Parent.. (AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3), Other Affiliate AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC for AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC, LIMA JEVREMOVICfiled by AUTONOMOUS USER REHABILITATION AGENT, LLC, LIMA JEVREMOVIC. (AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (kht)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13615945) with JURY DEMAND, filed by LIMA JEVREMOVIC, Autonomous User Rehabilitation Agent, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(AFFRUNTI, SHERRI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JEVREMOVIC et al v. COURVILLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIMA JEVREMOVIC
Represented By: SHERRI A. AFFRUNTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autonomous User Rehabilitation Agent, LLC
Represented By: SHERRI A. AFFRUNTI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITTANY JEREAM COURVILLE
Represented By: JOHN PHILIP JOHNSON, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?