SAUERS v. NEC LABORATORIES AMERICA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: CHERYL SAUERS
Defendant: NEC LABORATORIES AMERICA, INC., CHRISTOPHER WHITE and ELLEN FERGUSON
Case Number: 3:2022cv06502
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Douglas E Arpert
Referring Judge: Zahid N Quraishi
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by CHRISTINE ELAINE BURKE on behalf of CHERYL SAUERS (BURKE, CHRISTINE)
December 1, 2022 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHERYL SAUERS. ELLEN FERGUSON waiver sent on 11/8/2022, answer due 1/7/2023; NEC LABORATORIES AMERICA, INC. waiver sent on 11/8/2022, answer due 1/7/2023; CHRISTOPHER WHITE waiver sent on 11/8/2022, answer due 1/7/2023. (KARPF, ARI)
November 8, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to ELLEN FERGUSON, NEC LABORATORIES AMERICA, INC., CHRISTOPHER WHITE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mlh)
November 7, 2022 Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mlh)
November 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ELLEN FERGUSON, NEC LABORATORIES AMERICA, INC., CHRISTOPHER WHITE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13812936) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CHERYL SAUERS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(KARPF, ARI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAUERS v. NEC LABORATORIES AMERICA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL SAUERS
Represented By: ARI R. KARPF
Represented By: CHRISTINE ELAINE BURKE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC LABORATORIES AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLEN FERGUSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?