GULDEN et al v. EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Plaintiff: LINDSEY GULDEN and DAMIAN BURCH
Defendant: EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2022cv07418
Filed: December 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Presiding Judge: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Referring Judge: Michael A Shipp
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 USCA Case Number 23-1859 for #27 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by DAMIAN BURCH, LINDSEY GULDEN. USCA Case Manager Tim McIntyre (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3tmm, )
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #26 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, #25 Memorandum, Opinion by DAMIAN BURCH, LINDSEY GULDEN. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANJDC-14301181. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. Appeal Record due by 6/7/2023. (HENRICHSEN, NEIL)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated. (jdg)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting Defendant's #20 Motion to Dismiss; and it is Ordered that Plaintiff's #1 Complaint is Dismissed; and Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Order to Show Cause is Denied. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/19/2023. (jdg)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 4/19/2023. (jdg)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Support filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (TORIS, JOSEPH)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by DAMIAN BURCH, LINDSEY GULDEN re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (HENRICHSEN, NEIL)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Letter from Richard J. Cino, Esq.. (CINO, RICHARD)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by DAMIAN BURCH, LINDSEY GULDEN re #2 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction Seeking Enforcement of an Order of the Secretary of Labor for Reinstatement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Law Review)(HENRICHSEN, NEIL)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint. Motion set for 2/21/2023 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION. Responses due by 2/21/2023. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Certification of Joseph Toris, Esq. w Exhibits, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(CINO, RICHARD)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiff's modification of the deadline to file a reply to 1/27/2023. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/23/2023. (kht)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 Brief in Opposition to Motion, by DAMIAN BURCH, LINDSEY GULDEN. (HENRICHSEN, NEIL)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 Brief in Opposition to Motion, . Motion set for 2/21/2023 before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 BRIEF in Opposition filed by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION re #2 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction Seeking Enforcement of an Order of the Secretary of Labor for Reinstatement (Attachments: #1 Certification of Joseph C. Toris, Esq., #2 Exhibit A-E, #3 Exhibit F-L, #4 Exhibit M-T, #5 Exhibit U-W)(CINO, RICHARD)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer Attorney JOSEPH C. TORIS for EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION added. (TORIS, JOSEPH)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION. (TORIS, JOSEPH)
January 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Clerk`s Text Order - The document #16 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/25/2023. (mlh)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines as to #2 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction Seeking Enforcement of an Order of the Secretary of Labor for Reinstatement. Responses due by 1/17/2023. Replies due by 1/24/2023. (km)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER ORDER granting extension of due date for Defendants opposition to Plaintiff's motion to show cause. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 1/4/2023. (kht)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Letter from Richard J. Cino, Esq. re request modification of current briefing schedule re #11 Motion Hearing,. (CINO, RICHARD)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that Defendants shall file any opposition to the Plaintiff's Motion #2 by 1/10/2023; Plaintiff's reply due 1/17/2023. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/22/2022. (mg)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael A. Shipp: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 12/22/2022 re #2 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction Seeking Enforcement of an Order of the Secretary of Labor for Reinstatement filed by DAMIAN BURCH, LINDSEY GULDEN. Ordered Preliminary Injunction motion briefing schedule set: opposition due 1/10/2023; and any reply due 1/17/2023. (Court Reporter: Shannan Gagliardi (609-815-2750)) (jdb)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD J. CINO on behalf of All Defendants (CINO, RICHARD)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD J. CINO on behalf of All Defendants (CINO, RICHARD)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE by DAMIAN BURCH, LINDSEY GULDEN re 6 Order,, #7 Summons Returned Executed Of Service of ECF#6 and Acknowledgment by Counsel for Defendant (HENRICHSEN, NEIL)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAMIAN BURCH, LINDSEY GULDEN. EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION served on 12/21/2022, answer due 1/11/2023. (HENRICHSEN, NEIL)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon Plaintiffs Lindsey Gulden and Damian Burch's ("Plaintiffs") emergency Motion for an Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction. (ECF No. 2.) A telephone status conference in this matter is scheduled for December 22, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. to discuss Plaintiffs' Motion. All parties shall attend. Because Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation ("Defendant") has not entered an appearance in this matter, Plaintiffs must properly serve this Text Order on Defendant by today, December 21, 2022, and file proof of service. So Ordered by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/21/2022. (FH)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by DAMIAN BURCH, LINDSEY GULDEN re #2 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction Seeking Enforcement of an Order of the Secretary of Labor for Reinstatement, #1 Complaint, of Courtesy Service on Counsel for U.S. Department of Labor and Defendant Exxon Mobil Corporation (HENRICHSEN, NEIL)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael A. Shipp for all further proceedings. Judge Georgette Castner no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/21/2022. (jjc, )
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mlh)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Georgette Castner and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (mlh)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction Seeking Enforcement of an Order of the Secretary of Labor for Reinstatement by DAMIAN BURCH, LINDSEY GULDEN. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(HENRICHSEN, NEIL)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13908733), filed by DAMIAN BURCH, LINDSEY GULDEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Finding of Secretary of Labor, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(HENRICHSEN, NEIL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GULDEN et al v. EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDSEY GULDEN
Represented By: NEIL LAWRENCE HENRICHSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAMIAN BURCH
Represented By: NEIL LAWRENCE HENRICHSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Represented By: JOSEPH C. TORIS
Represented By: RICHARD J. CINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?