Fink v. Bishop et al
Plaintiff: JOHN W. FINK
Defendant: Jonathan L. Bishop, KAYDON A. STANZIONE, JOSEPH M. TROUPE, Steven W. Davis, SUEZ WTS USA INC., Johnson Control Security Solutions LLC, Edgelink, Inc., PRAXIS TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION, J. Philip Kirchner and FLASTER/GREENBERG P.C.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00566
Filed: February 1, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2023 Filing 24 Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-10978. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 25, 2023 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Jersey. (ate)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. Plaintiff's request to stay the transfer of his complaint to another court (ECF No. 3) and his requests for the issuance of summonses (ECF Nos. 7-17) are denied. Plaintiff is warned that further duplicative litigation in this court will result in an order barring Plaintiff from filing any new actions in this court without first seeking permission of the court. See 28 U.S.C. 1651. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 1/25/2023) (ate) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing.
January 25, 2023 Filing 22 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Veolia Water Technologies Treatment Solutions USA, Inc. for Suez WTS USA, Inc.. Document filed by Steven W. Davis, Suez WTS USA, Inc...(Donlon, Thomas)
January 25, 2023 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Thomas J. Donlon to RE-FILE Document No. #20 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the corporate parent/other affiliate was not added;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
January 24, 2023 Filing 21 Objection to Personal Jurisdiction and Stay. Document filed by Steven W. Davis, Suez WTS USA, Inc...(Donlon, Thomas)
January 24, 2023 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT.. Document filed by Steven W. Davis, Suez WTS USA, Inc...(Donlon, Thomas) Modified on 1/25/2023 (lb).
January 24, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas J. Donlon on behalf of Steven W. Davis, Suez WTS USA, Inc...(Donlon, Thomas)
January 23, 2023 Filing 18 LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from J. W. Fink, dated 1/23/23 re: Please accept this letter as a letter-motion requesting this Court to issue an appropriate order which would allow the clerk to sign my summonses in this case in compliance with the rules of the Court etc. Please note that I have not reached out to the various defendants to see if they would waive any possible objection to my instant letter-motion since I have not yet been able to serve summonses on them. Document filed by John W. Fink.(sc)
January 3, 2023 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joseph M. Troupe, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John W. Fink. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SUEZ WTS, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John W. Fink. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kaydon Stanzione, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John W. Fink. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Praxis Tecnologies, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John W. Fink. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Praxis Technologies Corp. c/o Kaydon Stanzione, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John W. Fink. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to J. Philip Kirchner, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John W. Fink. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Johnson Controls Security Solutions LLC c/o CT Corp. System, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John W. Fink. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Flaster/Greenberg P.C., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John W. Fink. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EdgLink, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John W. Fink. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven W. Davis, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John W. Fink. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jonathan L. Bishop, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by John W. Fink. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #15 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #16 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #17 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #14 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #13 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #11 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
January 3, 2023 Filing 6 LETTER from J. W. Fink, dated 1/2/23 re: As you can see from the filing documents, I date-time stamped them just a few minutes after 11:00 pm on this past 12/28/22. However, as the filed documents reveal, the documents were re-date-time stamped at around 10:30 on the next days, 12/29/22 and filed as of that day. I bring this inadvertent discrepancy to your attention for correction. Document filed by John W. Fink.(sc)
December 29, 2022 Filing 4 PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: John F. Fink consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by John W. Fink..(rdz)
December 29, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of my Motion for a Stay of any Transfer of my related Complaint to another Court. Document filed by John W. Fink..(rdz) Modified on 12/30/2022 (rdz). Modified on 12/30/2022 (rdz).
December 29, 2022 Filing 2 LETTER from John W. Fink dated 12/28/22 re: I am a pro Se Litigant.. Document filed by John W. Fink..(rdz)
December 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jonathan L. Bishop, Steven W. Davis, Edgelink, Inc., Flaster/Greenberg, P.C., Johnson Control Security Solutions LLC, J. Philip Kirchner, Praxis Technologies Corporation, Kaydon A. Stanzione, Suez WTS USA, Inc., Joseph M. Troupe. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number 10490)Document filed by John W. Fink..(rdz)
December 29, 2022 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
December 29, 2022 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fink v. Bishop et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN W. FINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan L. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAYDON A. STANZIONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH M. TROUPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven W. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUEZ WTS USA INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson Control Security Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edgelink, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRAXIS TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Philip Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLASTER/GREENBERG P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?